Torres v. Mitchell, et al
Respondent: CAROL HIGGINS O'BRIEN, Commissioner
Respondent / Appellee: MAURA T. HEALEY, Attorney General of the State of Massachusetts and LISA A. MITCHELL, Superintendent
Petitioner / Appellant: JOSE A. TORRES
Case Number: 19-1909
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file opening forms filed by Appellant Jose A. Torres. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance due 12/27/2019. [19-1909] (KC) [Entered: 11/07/2019 04:02 PM]
November 6, 2019 ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file an appearance form and docketing statement filed by Appellant Jose A. Torres. Certificate of service dated 11/06/2019. [19-1909] (MJ) [Entered: 11/06/2019 02:39 PM]
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file opening forms filed by Appellant Jose A. Torres. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript report/order form due 11/12/2019. [19-1909] (KC) [Entered: 10/02/2019 11:12 AM]
September 26, 2019 ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file an appearance form, docketing statement and transcript report/order form filed by Appellant Jose A. Torres. Certificate of service dated 09/26/2019. [19-1909] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (MJ) [Entered: 09/26/2019 04:16 PM]
September 26, 2019 MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Jose A. Torres. Certificate of service dated 09/26/2019. [19-1909] (MJ) [Entered: 09/26/2019 04:08 PM]
September 25, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Maura T. Healey, Lisa A. Mitchell and Not Party Carol Higgins O'Brien filed by Attorney Todd M. Blume. Certificate of service dated 09/25/2019. [19-1909] (TMB) [Entered: 09/25/2019 04:11 PM]
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered. The district court granted petitioner-appellant's request for a certificate of appealability. Accordingly, pursuant to Grant-Chase v. Commissioner, 145 F.3d 431 (1st Circuit. 1998), this appeal can go forward on the issue(s) for which the district court granted the certificate. [19-1909] (KC) [Entered: 09/20/2019 09:17 AM]
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: 60 (Order entered on September 12, 2019 by Judge Talwani granting a certificate of appealability as to Ground Four: Whether his conviction for first-degree murder violated federal due process and amounted to ineffective assistance of counsel where counsel failed to object to jury instructions regarding murder and manslaughter). [19-1909] (GK) [Entered: 09/17/2019 09:32 AM]
September 13, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #57) filed by Appellant Jose A. Torres. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 09/27/2019. [19-1909] (KC) [Entered: 09/13/2019 12:17 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. Mitchell, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: MAURA T. HEALEY, Attorney General of the State of Massachusetts
Represented By: Todd Michael Blume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: LISA A. MITCHELL, Superintendent
Represented By: Todd Michael Blume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CAROL HIGGINS O'BRIEN, Commissioner
Represented By: Todd Michael Blume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JOSE A. TORRES
Represented By: Myles Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?