Lu v. Capitol Waste Services, Inc., et al
Defendant / Appellee: UNKNOWN NAMED BOSTON POLICE OFFICERS, BOSTON, MA and CAPITOL WASTE SERVICES, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: FRIEDRICH LU
Case Number: 19-2016
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. Brief and Appendix due 12/10/2019 for appellant Friedrich Lu. [19-1758, 19-2016] (GB) [Entered: 12/03/2019 11:50 AM]
December 2, 2019 MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu in 19-1758, 19-2016. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1758, 19-2016] (GB) [Entered: 12/03/2019 08:18 AM]
November 18, 2019 MOTION for open-ended caption filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu in 19-1758, 19-2016. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1758, 19-2016] (GB) [Entered: 11/19/2019 08:29 AM]
October 24, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 12/03/2019 for appellant Friedrich Lu. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1758, 19-2016] (GB) [Entered: 10/24/2019 06:38 PM]
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Upon consideration of plaintiff-appellant Friedrich Lu's motion, appeal nos. 19-1758 and 19-2016 are hereby consolidated for briefing. See Fed. R. App. P. 3(b)(2). The briefing schedule in appeal no. 19-1758 is vacated. The clerk will set a consolidated briefing schedule once the record on appeal, including all necessary transcripts, is complete. [19-1758, 19-2016] (GB) [Entered: 10/24/2019 06:33 PM]
October 9, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #45) filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. [19-2016] (GB) [Entered: 10/09/2019 01:48 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lu v. Capitol Waste Services, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN NAMED BOSTON POLICE OFFICERS
Represented By: John Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BOSTON, MA
Represented By: John Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAPITOL WASTE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Thomas M. Elcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRIEDRICH LU
Represented By: Friedrich Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?