Fusco v. Spaulding
Petitioner / Appellant: EMILIO FUSCO
Respondent / Appellee: STEPHEN SPAULDING, Warden
Case Number: 19-2023
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Appellee Stephen Spaulding's unopposed motion to stay briefing pending the court's decision on the motion for summary disposition is granted. [19-2023] (GB) [Entered: 12/26/2019 01:18 PM]
December 10, 2019 MOTION to stay briefing filed by Appellee Stephen Spaulding. Certificate of service dated 12/10/2019. [19-2023] (DCL) [Entered: 12/10/2019 04:41 PM]
December 10, 2019 MOTION for summary disposition filed by Appellee Stephen Spaulding. Certificate of service dated 12/10/2019. [19-2023] (DCL) [Entered: 12/10/2019 04:39 PM]
December 10, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Stephen Spaulding filed by Attorney Donald C. Lockhart. Certificate of service dated 12/10/2019. [19-2023] (DCL) [Entered: 12/10/2019 03:00 PM]
December 4, 2019 COURTESY COPY OF letter filed in District Court regarding appeal fee filed by Appellant Emilio Fusco. Certificate of service was not included. [19-2023] (CMP) [Entered: 12/04/2019 01:24 PM]
December 4, 2019 APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant Emilio Fusco. Number of copies: 3. Certificate of service dated 12/02/2019. Brief due 01/02/2020 for APPELLEE Stephen Spaulding. [19-2023] (LIM) [Entered: 12/04/2019 12:11 PM]
November 1, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 12/11/2019 for appellant Emilio Fusco. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-2023] (CMP) [Entered: 11/01/2019 03:14 PM]
October 30, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #8) filed by Appellant Emilio Fusco. Fee due 11/13/2019.. [19-2023] (CMP) [Entered: 10/30/2019 01:27 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fusco v. Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: EMILIO FUSCO
Represented By: Emilio Fusco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: STEPHEN SPAULDING, Warden
Represented By: Cynthia A. Young
Represented By: Emily O. Cannon
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?