Ameral v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff / Appellant: PATRICIA A. AMERAL
Defendant / Appellee: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 19-2077
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 CERTIFICATE of service for motion to prepare transcript at government expense [ # 6302042-2 ] filed by Appellant Patricia A. Ameral. Certificate of service dated 12/02/2019. [19-2077] (AL) [Entered: 12/09/2019 01:14 PM]
December 4, 2019 PLEADING tendered: Transcript Report order form filed by Appellant Patricia A. Ameral. Certificate of service was not included. [19-2077] (AL) [Entered: 12/05/2019 04:17 PM]
December 4, 2019 MOTION to prepare transcripts at government expense filed by Appellant Patricia A. Ameral. Certificate of service was not included. [19-2077] (AL) [Entered: 12/05/2019 03:58 PM]
December 2, 2019 CERTIFICATE of service for copy of motion [ # 6301526-2 ] filed by Appellant Patricia A. Ameral. [19-2077] (AL) [Entered: 12/03/2019 03:46 PM]
November 25, 2019 COPY of motion to Request Transcripts at Government's Expense filed by Appellant Patricia A. Ameral. Certificate of service was not included. [19-2077]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the file date. (AL) [Entered: 12/03/2019 02:55 PM]
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER directing appellant to file a corrected Transcript Report/Order. Accordingly, appellant is directed to either 1) file a motion for transcripts at government expense in the district court and provide this court with proof of filing or 2) make satisfactory financial arrangements with the applicable court reporter and file a compliant transcript order form in this court. Appellant's failure to comply with this order by December 4, 2019 may lead the issuance of a briefing schedule, if appropriate. In the event that the district court denies appellant's motion for transcripts at government expense, appellant is directed to refile her motion seeking transcripts at government expense in this court. See 28 U.S.C. 753(f). [19-2077] (AL) [Entered: 11/20/2019 11:10 AM]
November 15, 2019 PLEADING tendered: Transcript Order Form filed by Appellant Patricia A. Ameral. Certificate of service was not included. [19-2077] (AL) [Entered: 11/18/2019 09:07 AM]
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Jeffrey R. Howard, Chief Appellate Judge; Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge and Rogeriee Thompson: The appellant's motion for a stay pending appeal is denied, as the appellant has not established an entitlement to the relief she seeks. See Respect Maine PAC v. McKee , 622 F.3d 13, 15 (1st Cir. 2010) (setting out standard). [19-2077, 19-2158] (AL) [Entered: 11/13/2019 03:19 PM]
November 13, 2019 MOTION to stay execution filed by Appellant Patricia A. Ameral. [19-2077] (AL) [Entered: 11/13/2019 10:38 AM]
November 12, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. filed by Attorney Anne Dunne. Certificate of service dated 11/12/2019. [19-2077] (AD) [Entered: 11/12/2019 04:57 PM]
November 1, 2019 Request to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal filed by Appellant Patricia A. Ameral was granted in the district court by order dated 10/22/2019. [19-2077] (AL) [Entered: 11/01/2019 03:55 PM]
November 1, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #71) filed by Appellant Patricia A. Ameral. Transcript Report/Order form due 11/15/2019. [19-2077] (AL) [Entered: 11/01/2019 03:47 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ameral v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PATRICIA A. AMERAL
Represented By: Patricia A. Ameral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Anne Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?