McForbes v. US
Respondent / Appellee: UNITED STATES
Petitioner / Appellant: MARK ANTHONY MCFORBES, JR.
Case Number: 19-2080
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 LETTER sent to Appellant Mark Anthony McForbes, Jr. in 19-2080, 19-2132 regarding appellant's correspondence dated October 28, 2019. [19-2080, 19-2132] (DPO) [Entered: 11/26/2019 12:56 PM]
November 25, 2019 MOTION for certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Mark Anthony McForbes, Jr.. Certificate of service dated 11/20/2019. [19-2080] (DPO) [Entered: 11/26/2019 01:35 PM]
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Upon consideration of appellant's motion to consolidate appeal no. 19-2080 with appeal no. 19-2132, the motion is allowed. The appeals are hereby consolidated. If appellant is granted a certificate of appealability, the clerk will set a consolidated briefing schedule. Appellant is directed to include both case numbers on all future filings in this matter. [19-2080, 19-2132] (DPO) [Entered: 11/25/2019 11:34 AM]
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER advising petitioner the request for a certificate of appealability will be submitted to this court for a decision. Date of denial by district court: August 30, 2019 and October 23, 2019. [19-2080] (GAK) [Entered: 11/21/2019 01:06 PM]
November 20, 2019 MOTION to consolidate cases. Cases to be consolidated: 19-2080 and 19-2132 filed by Appellant Mark Anthony McForbes, Jr. in 19-2080, 19-2132. Certificate of service dated 11/20/2019. [19-2080, 19-2132] (ALW) [Entered: 11/21/2019 12:22 PM]
November 18, 2019 MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Mark Anthony McForbes, Jr. in 19-2080, 19-2132. Certificate of service was not included. [19-2080, 19-2132] (ALW) [Entered: 11/21/2019 12:27 PM]
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER directing petitioner to file a request for a certificate of appealabilty in this court by 12/16/2019. Date of denial by district court: August 30, 2019 and October 23, 2019. [19-2080] (ALW) [Entered: 11/15/2019 10:57 AM]
November 7, 2019 MOTION for certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Mark Anthony McForbes, Jr. Certificate of service dated 10/28/2019. [19-2080]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the file date. (ALW) [Entered: 11/20/2019 04:09 PM]
November 7, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #267) filed by Appellant Mark Anthony McForbes, Jr. [19-2080]. (ALW) [Entered: 11/07/2019 12:52 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McForbes v. US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Michelle L. Dineen Jerrett
Represented By: Greg A. Friedholm
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: MARK ANTHONY MCFORBES, JR.
Represented By: Mark Anthony McForbes Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?