Bauersachs, et al v. Englander, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: MARK BAUERSACHS, MARCIELI BAUERSACHS and MARK ANDREW BAUERSACHS
Defendant / Appellee: GREGORY I. MASSING, Associate Justice, Massachusetts Appeals Court, ERIC NEYMAN, Associate Justice, Massachusetts Appeals Court and JOHN C. ENGLANDER, Associate Justice, Massachusetts Appeals Court
Case Number: 19-2081
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Appellate Judge: Defendants-appellees John C. Englander, Gregory I. Massing, and Eric Neyman's opposed motion to stay pending ruling on their motion for summary disposition is allowed. Plaintiff-appellant Mark Bauersachs's counter-motion for the court to accept his brief as a response in opposition to appellees' motion for summary disposition will be addressed in due course. [19-2081, 19-2110] (GRC) [Entered: 12/30/2019 11:44 AM]
December 29, 2019 BRIEF tendered by Appellants Marcieli Bauersachs and Mark Andrew Bauersachs in 19-2081, 19-2110. [19-2081, 19-2110] (MAB) [Entered: 12/29/2019 11:03 PM]
December 23, 2019 RESPONSE to the motion for stay and MOTION for the court to accept appellants' brief as a response to the motion for summary disposition filed by Appellant Mark Andrew Bauersachs in 19-2081, 19-2110 to motion to stay [ # 6305295-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 12/23/2019. [19-2081, 19-2110] CLERK'S NOTE: The ECF filer did not select the option that best describes the document. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (MAB) [Entered: 12/23/2019 05:21 PM]
December 19, 2019 MOTION to dismiss or for summary disposition filed by Appellees John C. Englander, Gregory I. Massing and Eric Neyman in 19-2081, 19-2110. Certificate of service dated 12/19/2019. [19-2081, 19-2110] (LKL) [Entered: 12/19/2019 04:42 PM]
December 19, 2019 MOTION to stay filed by Appellees John C. Englander, Gregory I. Massing and Eric Neyman in 19-2081, 19-2110. Certificate of service dated 12/19/2019. [19-2081, 19-2110] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (LKL) [Entered: 12/19/2019 04:37 PM]
November 19, 2019 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 12/30/2019 for appellant Marcieli Bauersachs and Mark Bauersachs. Appendix due 12/30/2019 for appellant Marcieli Bauersachs and Mark Bauersachs. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-2081, 19-2110] (GRC) [Entered: 11/19/2019 01:56 PM]
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER consolidating cases for purposes of briefing and oral argument. The following case(s) are consolidated: 19-2110 (Consolidated started 11/19/2019) with 19-2081. [19-2081, 19-2110] (GRC) [Entered: 11/19/2019 01:53 PM]
November 1, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #26) filed by Appellants Marcieli Bauersachs and Mark Bauersachs. [19-2081]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (GRC) [Entered: 11/01/2019 05:00 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bauersachs, et al v. Englander, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARK BAUERSACHS
Represented By: Mark Bauersachs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARCIELI BAUERSACHS
Represented By: Marcieli Bauersachs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARK ANDREW BAUERSACHS
Represented By: Mark Andrew Bauersachs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREGORY I. MASSING, Associate Justice, Massachusetts Appeals Court
Represented By: Laronica King Lightfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERIC NEYMAN, Associate Justice, Massachusetts Appeals Court
Represented By: Laronica King Lightfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN C. ENGLANDER, Associate Justice, Massachusetts Appeals Court
Represented By: Laronica King Lightfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?