Ameral v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff / Appellant: PATRICIA A. AMERAL
Defendant / Appellee: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 19-2158
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER to Show Cause entered directing appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The failure to take either action by January 22, 2020 , may result in dismissal of this appeal for lack of diligent prosecution. See 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). The dismissal of Appeal No. 19-2158 will not impact appellant's separate appeal from the district court's order dismissing his civil action, Appeal No. 19-2077. [19-2158]. (AL) [Entered: 01/08/2020 02:00 PM]
December 2, 2019 PROOF of service filed by Appellant Patricia A. Ameral. [19-2158] (AL) [Entered: 12/03/2019 04:20 PM]
November 25, 2019 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Patricia A. Ameral indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service was not included. [19-2158] (AL) [Entered: 11/26/2019 10:12 AM]
November 15, 2019 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. filed by Attorney Anne Dunne. Certificate of service dated 11/15/2019. [19-2158] (AD) [Entered: 11/15/2019 04:30 PM]
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Jeffrey R. Howard, Chief Appellate Judge; Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge and Rogeriee Thompson: The appellant's motion for a stay pending appeal is denied, as the appellant has not established an entitlement to the relief she seeks. See Respect Maine PAC v. McKee , 622 F.3d 13, 15 (1st Cir. 2010) (setting out standard). [19-2077, 19-2158] (AL) [Entered: 11/13/2019 03:19 PM]
November 13, 2019 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #80) filed by Appellant Patricia A. Ameral. Transcript Report/Order form due 11/27/2019. [19-2158] (AL) [Entered: 11/13/2019 09:30 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ameral v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PATRICIA A. AMERAL
Represented By: Patricia A. Ameral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Matthew John Libby
Represented By: Anne Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?