Pereira Brito, et al v. Barr, et al
Respondent / Appellee: ANTONE MONIZ, Superintendent of the Plymouth County Correctional Facility, CHRISTOPHER BRACKETT, Superintendent of the Strafford County Department of Corrections, LORI STREETER, Superintendent of the Franklin County House of Corrections, YOLANDA SMITH, Superintendent of the Suffolk County House of Corrections, TIMOTHY S. ROBBINS, Acting Field Office Director, Enforcement and Removal Operations, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice, MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, STEVE SOUZA, Superintendent of the Bristol County House of Corrections, JAMES MCHENRY, Director, Executive Office of Immigration Review, U.S. Department of Justice and CHAD WOLF, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Interested Party: JOHN A. HAWKINSON
Petitioner / Appellant: JACKY CELICOURT, individually and on behalf of all those similarly situated, GILBERTO PEREIRA BRITO, individually and on behalf of all those similarly situated, FLORENTINE AVILA LUCAS, individually and on behalf of all those similarly situated and FLORENTIN AVILA LUCAS, individually and on behalf of all those similarly situated
Case Number: 20-1037
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
December 28, 2021 Summary Pereira Brito v. Garland

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Jennifer J. Mather for Gilberto Pereira Brito, Florentin Avila Lucas and Jacky Celicourt. [20-1037] (ALW) [Entered: 02/20/2020 06:23 PM]
February 14, 2020 RESPONSE filed by Appellees Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Christopher Brackett, James McHenry, Antone Moniz, Timothy S. Robbins, Yolanda Smith, Steve Souza, Lori Streeter and Chad Wolf to motion [ # 6315173-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 02/14/2020. [20-1037] (HL) [Entered: 02/14/2020 02:34 PM]
February 11, 2020 Public docket note: Timothy S. Robbins was sworn in as Acting Field Office Director, Enforcement and Removal Operations, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement on August 2019. We have substituted him for Marcos Charles, as the respondent. See Fed. R. App. P. 43(c)(2). [20-1119, 20-1037]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (ALW) [Entered: 02/11/2020 12:50 PM]
February 10, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Christopher Brackett, James McHenry, Antone Moniz, Timothy S. Robbins, Yolanda Smith, Steve Souza, Lori Streeter and Chad Wolf filed by Attorney Rayford A. Farquhar. Certificate of service dated 02/10/2020. [20-1037] (RAF) [Entered: 02/10/2020 05:15 PM]
February 5, 2020 MOTION to Jointly Schedule Related Appeals for Oral Argument filed by Appellants Jacky Celicourt, Florentine Avila Lucas and Gilberto Pereira Brito. Certificate of service dated 02/05/2020. [20-1037] (SMF) [Entered: 02/05/2020 04:29 PM]
February 5, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Gilberto Pereira Brito, Florentine Avila Lucas and Jacky Celicourt filed by Attorney Ryan Dougherty. Certificate of service dated 02/05/2020. [20-1037] (RTD) [Entered: 02/05/2020 11:46 AM]
February 3, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Christopher Brackett, Antone Moniz, Timothy S. Robbins, Yolanda Smith, Steve Souza, Lori Streeter and Chad Wolf filed by Attorney Huy M. Le. Certificate of service dated 02/03/2020. [20-1037] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should have been filed in additional case. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (HL) [Entered: 02/03/2020 03:24 PM]
January 31, 2020 NOTICE issued. After 02/14/2020, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless she registers for an appellate ECF account: Jennifer J. Mather for Gilberto Pereira Brito, Florentine Avila Lucas and Jacky Celicourt. [20-1037] (ALW) [Entered: 01/31/2020 01:51 PM]
January 13, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Jacky Celicourt, Florentine Avila Lucas and Gilberto Pereira Brito filed by Attorney Susan J. Cohen. Certificate of service dated 01/13/2020. [20-1037] (SJC) [Entered: 01/13/2020 04:04 PM]
January 10, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Jacky Celicourt, Florentine Avila Lucas and Gilberto Pereira Brito filed by Attorney Henry Klementowicz. Certificate of service dated 01/10/2020. [20-1037] (HRK) [Entered: 01/10/2020 03:48 PM]
January 10, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Jacky Celicourt, Florentine Avila Lucas and Gilberto Pereira Brito. Certificate of service dated 01/10/2020. [20-1037] (SMF) [Entered: 01/10/2020 04:05 PM]
January 10, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Jacky Celicourt, Florentine Avila Lucas and Gilberto Pereira Brito. Certificate of service dated 01/10/2020. [20-1037] (SMF) [Entered: 01/10/2020 04:39 PM]
January 10, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Jacky Celicourt, Florentine Avila Lucas and Gilberto Pereira Brito filed by Attorney SangYeob Kim. Certificate of service dated 01/10/2020. [20-1037] (SK) [Entered: 01/10/2020 03:21 PM]
January 10, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Gilberto Pereira Brito, Florentine Avila Lucas and Jacky Celicourt filed by Attorney Adriana Lafaille. Certificate of service dated 01/10/2020. [20-1037] (AL) [Entered: 01/10/2020 12:19 PM]
January 10, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Jacky Celicourt, Florentine Avila Lucas and Gilberto Pereira Brito filed by Attorney Susan M. Finegan. Certificate of service dated 01/10/2020. [20-1037] (SMF) [Entered: 01/10/2020 11:26 AM]
January 10, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Florentine Avila Lucas, Jacky Celicourt and Gilberto Pereira Brito filed by Attorney Gilles Bissonnette. Certificate of service dated 01/10/2020. [20-1037] (GRB) [Entered: 01/10/2020 10:28 AM]
January 10, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Jacky Celicourt, Florentine Avila Lucas and Gilberto Pereira Brito filed by Attorney Mathilda S. McGee-Tubb. Certificate of service dated 01/10/2020. [20-1037] (MM) [Entered: 01/10/2020 11:34 AM]
January 10, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Jacky Celicourt, Florentine Avila Lucas and Gilberto Pereira Brito filed by Attorney Andrew N. Nathanson. Certificate of service dated 01/10/2020. [20-1037] (ANN) [Entered: 01/10/2020 11:29 AM]
January 10, 2020 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Florentine Avila Lucas, Jacky Celicourt and Gilberto Pereira Brito indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 01/10/2020. [20-1037] (SMF) [Entered: 01/10/2020 11:37 AM]
January 10, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Gilberto Pereira Brito, Florentine Avila Lucas and Jacky Celicourt filed by Attorney Matthew R. Segal. Certificate of service dated 01/10/2020. [20-1037] (MRS) [Entered: 01/10/2020 12:10 PM]
January 10, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Gilberto Pereira Brito, Florentine Avila Lucas and Jacky Celicourt filed by Attorney Daniel L. McFadden. Certificate of service dated 01/10/2020. [20-1037] (DLM) [Entered: 01/10/2020 12:16 PM]
January 9, 2020 UNOPPOSED MOTION of Nonparty John A. Hawkinson, to Remove Docket Access Restrictions at the Briefing Stage filed by Not Party John A. Hawkinson. Certificate of service dated 01/09/2020. [20-1037] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (ALW) [Entered: 01/10/2020 02:19 PM]
January 8, 2020 Public docket note: Timothy S. Robbins was sworn in as Acting Field Office Director, Enforcement and Removal Operations, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement on August 2019. We have substituted him for Marcos Charles, as the respondent. See Fed. R. App. P. 43(c)(2). [20-1037] (ALW) [Entered: 01/08/2020 04:49 PM]
January 8, 2020 Public docket note: Matthew Albence was sworn in as Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement on June 27, 2019. We have substituted him for Mark Morgan, as the respondent. See Fed. R. App. P. 43(c)(2). [20-1037]. (ALW) [Entered: 01/08/2020 04:58 PM]
January 8, 2020 Public docket note: Chad Wolf was sworn in as Secretary of Homeland Security on November 13, 2019. We have substituted him for Acting Secretary, Kevin K. McAleenan, as the respondent. See Fed. R. App. P. 43(c)(2). [20-1037] (ALW) [Entered: 01/08/2020 05:00 PM]
January 8, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #97) filed by Appellants Jacky Celicourt, Florentine Avila Lucas and Gilberto Pereira Brito. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 01/22/2020. [20-1037]. (ALW) [Entered: 01/08/2020 04:33 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Pereira Brito, et al v. Barr, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: ANTONE MONIZ, Superintendent of the Plymouth County Correctional Facility
Represented By: Huy Le
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: J. Max Weintraub
Represented By: Carlton Frederick Sheffield
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: CHRISTOPHER BRACKETT, Superintendent of the Strafford County Department of Corrections
Represented By: Huy Le
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: J. Max Weintraub
Represented By: Carlton Frederick Sheffield
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: LORI STREETER, Superintendent of the Franklin County House of Corrections
Represented By: Huy Le
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: J. Max Weintraub
Represented By: Carlton Frederick Sheffield
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: YOLANDA SMITH, Superintendent of the Suffolk County House of Corrections
Represented By: Huy Le
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: J. Max Weintraub
Represented By: Carlton Frederick Sheffield
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: TIMOTHY S. ROBBINS, Acting Field Office Director, Enforcement and Removal Operations, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Huy Le
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: J. Max Weintraub
Represented By: Carlton Frederick Sheffield
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Huy Le
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: J. Max Weintraub
Represented By: Carlton Frederick Sheffield
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Huy Le
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: Carlton Frederick Sheffield
Represented By: J. Max Weintraub
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: STEVE SOUZA, Superintendent of the Bristol County House of Corrections
Represented By: Huy Le
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: J. Max Weintraub
Represented By: Carlton Frederick Sheffield
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: JAMES MCHENRY, Director, Executive Office of Immigration Review, U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Huy Le
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: J. Max Weintraub
Represented By: Carlton Frederick Sheffield
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: CHAD WOLF, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Huy Le
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: J. Max Weintraub
Represented By: Carlton Frederick Sheffield
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JOHN A. HAWKINSON
Represented By: John A. Hawkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JACKY CELICOURT, individually and on behalf of all those similarly situated
Represented By: Susan M. Finegan
Represented By: Andrew N. Nathanson
Represented By: Matthew R. Segal
Represented By: Jennifer J. Mather
Represented By: Henry R. Klementowicz
Represented By: Gilles R. Bissonnette
Represented By: Michael King Thomas Tan
Represented By: Ryan T. Dougherty
Represented By: Daniel Louis McFadden
Represented By: SangYeob Kim
Represented By: Mathilda McGee-Tubb
Represented By: Susan J. Cohen
Represented By: Adriana Lafaille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: GILBERTO PEREIRA BRITO, individually and on behalf of all those similarly situated
Represented By: Susan M. Finegan
Represented By: Andrew N. Nathanson
Represented By: Matthew R. Segal
Represented By: Jennifer J. Mather
Represented By: Henry R. Klementowicz
Represented By: Gilles R. Bissonnette
Represented By: Michael King Thomas Tan
Represented By: Ryan T. Dougherty
Represented By: Daniel Louis McFadden
Represented By: SangYeob Kim
Represented By: Mathilda McGee-Tubb
Represented By: Susan J. Cohen
Represented By: Adriana Lafaille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: FLORENTINE AVILA LUCAS, individually and on behalf of all those similarly situated
Represented By: Susan M. Finegan
Represented By: Andrew N. Nathanson
Represented By: Matthew R. Segal
Represented By: Jennifer J. Mather
Represented By: Henry R. Klementowicz
Represented By: Gilles R. Bissonnette
Represented By: Michael King Thomas Tan
Represented By: Ryan T. Dougherty
Represented By: Daniel Louis McFadden
Represented By: SangYeob Kim
Represented By: Mathilda McGee-Tubb
Represented By: Susan J. Cohen
Represented By: Adriana Lafaille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: FLORENTIN AVILA LUCAS, individually and on behalf of all those similarly situated
Represented By: Susan M. Finegan
Represented By: Andrew N. Nathanson
Represented By: Matthew R. Segal
Represented By: Jennifer J. Mather
Represented By: Henry R. Klementowicz
Represented By: Gilles R. Bissonnette
Represented By: Michael King Thomas Tan
Represented By: Ryan T. Dougherty
Represented By: Daniel Louis McFadden
Represented By: SangYeob Kim
Represented By: Mathilda McGee-Tubb
Represented By: Susan J. Cohen
Represented By: Adriana Lafaille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?