Bautista Cayman Asset Company v. Terra II MC & P, Inc., et al
Defendant / Appellant: LUIS ENRIQUE PEREZ PAGAN, MCCLOSKEY PEREZ & ASOCIADOS, INC., JOSEPH MCCLOSKEY VAZQUEZ, TERRA II MC & P, INC., STACEY SUAREZ KILEY and GLORIA VIRGINIA TANON ORTIZ
Plaintiff / Appellee: BAUTISTA CAYMAN ASSET COMPANY
Case Number: 20-1221
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Public docket note: Because of the court's March 26, 2020 general order extending deadlines due to the COVID-19 pandemic, the deadline for Attorney Alfredo F. Ramirez MacDonald to register for an ECF accout has been automatically extended to May 26, 2020. [20-1221]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (GAK) [Entered: 04/23/2020 11:32 AM]
April 23, 2020 Public docket note: Because of the court's March 26, 2020 general order extending deadlines due to the COVID-19 pandemic, the deadline for appellants to file a brief and appendix has been automatically extended. Brief and Appendix due May 13, 2020. [20-1221] (GAK) [Entered: 04/23/2020 11:18 AM]
April 21, 2020 Public docket note: Pursuant to the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, this court is temporarily suspending the requirement in Local Rule 25.0(b)(1)(c) that appendices to briefs must be filed only in paper form. For the duration of this suspension, all parties who are represented by counsel shall tender the appendix electronically, through the court's electronic filing system. After the appendix is accepted for filing, the court may set a deadline for paper copies of the appendix. No other rules, including those relating to the form or substance of an appendix, service requirements, or the handling of appendices to be filed under seal, are impacted by this suspension. (MNH) [Entered: 04/21/2020 07:15 PM]
March 19, 2020 NOTICE issued. After 04/02/2020, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Alfredo F. Ramirez MacDonald for Bautista Cayman Asset Company. [20-1221] (GAK) [Entered: 03/19/2020 10:38 AM]
March 9, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellants McCloskey Perez & Asociados, Inc., Joseph McCloskey Vazquez, Luis Enrique Perez Pagan, Stacey Suarez Kiley, Gloria Virginia Tanon Ortiz and Terra II MC & P, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 03/09/2020. [20-1221] (MLQ) [Entered: 03/09/2020 11:56 AM]
March 9, 2020 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants McCloskey Perez & Asociados, Inc., Joseph McCloskey Vazquez, Luis Enrique Perez Pagan, Stacey Suarez Kiley, Gloria Virginia Tanon Ortiz and Terra II MC & P, Inc. indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 03/09/2020. [20-1221] (MLQ) [Entered: 03/09/2020 11:51 AM]
March 9, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants McCloskey Perez & Asociados, Inc., Joseph McCloskey Vazquez, Luis Enrique Perez Pagan, Stacey Suarez Kiley, Gloria Virginia Tanon Ortiz and Terra II MC & P, Inc. filed by Attorney Marie L. Quinones Tanon. Certificate of service dated 03/09/2020. [20-1221] (MLQ) [Entered: 03/09/2020 11:34 AM]
March 9, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants McCloskey Perez & Asociados, Inc., Joseph McCloskey Vazquez, Luis Enrique Perez Pagan, Stacey Suarez Kiley, Gloria Virginia Tanon Ortiz and Terra II MC & P, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 03/09/2020. [20-1221] (MLQ) [Entered: 03/09/2020 11:30 AM]
March 3, 2020 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 04/13/2020 for appellant McCloskey Perez & Asociados, Inc., Joseph McCloskey Vazquez, Luis Enrique Perez Pagan, Stacey Suarez Kiley, Gloria Virginia Tanon Ortiz and Terra II MC & P, Inc.. Appendix due 04/13/2020 for appellant McCloskey Perez & Asociados, Inc., Joseph McCloskey Vazquez, Luis Enrique Perez Pagan, Stacey Suarez Kiley, Gloria Virginia Tanon Ortiz and Terra II MC & P, Inc.. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [20-1221] (GAK) [Entered: 03/03/2020 09:00 AM]
February 26, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Bautista Cayman Asset Company filed by Attorney Camille I. Marrero-Quinones. Certificate of service dated 02/26/2020. [20-1221] (CIM) [Entered: 02/26/2020 04:48 PM]
February 26, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Bautista Cayman Asset Company filed by Attorney Omayra Sepulveda-Vega. Certificate of service dated 02/26/2020. [20-1221] (OS) [Entered: 02/26/2020 04:45 PM]
February 24, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #70) filed by Appellants McCloskey Perez & Asociados, Inc., Joseph McCloskey Vazquez, Luis Enrique Perez Pagan, Stacey Suarez Kiley, Gloria Virginia Tanon Ortiz and Terra II MC & P, Inc.. Docketing Statement and Appearance form due 03/09/2020. [20-1221] (GAK) [Entered: 02/24/2020 01:06 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Bautista Cayman Asset Company v. Terra II MC & P, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LUIS ENRIQUE PEREZ PAGAN
Represented By: Marie L. Quinones-Tanon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MCCLOSKEY PEREZ & ASOCIADOS, INC.
Represented By: Marie L. Quinones-Tanon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOSEPH MCCLOSKEY VAZQUEZ
Represented By: Marie L. Quinones-Tanon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TERRA II MC & P, INC.
Represented By: Marie L. Quinones-Tanon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: STACEY SUAREZ KILEY
Represented By: Marie L. Quinones-Tanon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GLORIA VIRGINIA TANON ORTIZ
Represented By: Marie L. Quinones-Tanon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BAUTISTA CAYMAN ASSET COMPANY
Represented By: Alfredo F. Ramirez MacDonald
Represented By: Omayra Sepulveda-Vega
Represented By: Camille Ivette Marrero-Quinones
Represented By: Carolina Velaz-Rivero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?