Gonzalez-Acevedo v. US, et al
Plaintiff: Gonzalez-Acevedo, AG and EDMARIE MENDEZ-SALAS
Defendant: US
Defendant / Appellee: US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO, ALBERTO GONZALEZ, MANUEL OYOLA-TORRES, PUERTO RICO POLICE DEPARTMENT, JOSE PEREZ-NIEVES, LOURDES ECHEVARRIA, WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, PALO DE ROBLES, RICHARD ESCALERA, JOSE ROSARIO, CHAD WOLF, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, DENNISE NOEMI LONGO-QUINONES, Attorney General of Puerto Rico, UNITED STATES, AIDA T. SILVA, HERIBERTO MENDEZ-PEREZ, JOSE VERA, ROBERTO ESCOBAR, ELIUD ESTRADA, JULIA CORREA-HERNANDEZ, RAMON PEREZ-CREPO, US DEPT. OF HOMELAND SECURITY, (DHS), WILLIAM STEPHEN MULDROW, United States Attorney for the District of Puerto Rico and EMILIO DIAZ-COLON
Plaintiff / Appellant: MANUEL J. GONZALEZ-ACEVEDO
Case Number: 20-1261
Filed: March 15, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 REPLY filed by Appellant Manuel J. Gonzalez-Acevedo to response [ # 6336908-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 05/13/2020. [20-1261] (MJG) [Entered: 05/13/2020 10:48 PM]
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Because the court's March 26, 2020 general order extended the deadlines to file a response to May 6, 2020, appellee's responses are timely filed and the motion to extend time is moot. [20-1261] (CMP) [Entered: 05/11/2020 08:47 AM]
May 6, 2020 MOTION to extend time to file a response filed by Appellees William P. Barr, DHS, William Stephen Muldrow, US, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Chad Wolf. Certificate of service dated 05/06/2020. [20-1261] (BKD) [Entered: 05/06/2020 04:56 PM]
May 6, 2020 RESPONSE filed by Appellees Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Julia Correa-Hernandez, Emilio Diaz-Colon, Lourdes Echevarria, Alberto Gonzalez, Dennise Noemi Longo-Quinones, Ramon Perez-Crepo, Jose Perez-Nieves and Puerto Rico Police Department in 20-1032, 20-1261 to motion to consolidate cases [ # 6327298-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 05/06/2020. [20-1032, 20-1261] (CL) [Entered: 05/06/2020 04:08 PM]
May 6, 2020 RESPONSE filed by Appellees Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Julia Correa-Hernandez, Emilio Diaz-Colon, Lourdes Echevarria, Alberto Gonzalez, Dennise Noemi Longo-Quinones, Ramon Perez-Crepo, Jose Perez-Nieves and Puerto Rico Police Department to motion to amend caption [ # 6327297-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 05/06/2020. [20-1261] (CL) [Entered: 05/06/2020 04:03 PM]
May 6, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees William P. Barr, DHS, William Stephen Muldrow, US, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Chad Wolf filed by Attorney Billie K. Debrason. Certificate of service dated 05/06/2020. [20-1261] (BKD) [Entered: 05/06/2020 03:13 PM]
May 6, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees William P. Barr, DHS, William Stephen Muldrow, US, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Chad Wolf filed by Attorney Mariana E. Bauza. Certificate of service dated 05/06/2020. [20-1261] (MEB) [Entered: 05/06/2020 03:10 PM]
April 7, 2020 Public docket note: Because the court's March 26, 2020 general order extending deadlines due to the COVID-19 pandemic, the deadline for appellees to file a response to appellant's motion to amend caption has been automatically extended to May 6, 2020. [20-1261] (GB) [Entered: 04/07/2020 09:44 AM]
March 25, 2020 MOTION to amend caption filed by Appellant Manuel J. Gonzalez-Acevedo. Certificate of service dated 03/25/2020. [20-1261] (MJG) [Entered: 03/25/2020 12:27 AM]
March 25, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Manuel J. Gonzalez-Acevedo. Certificate of service dated 03/25/2020. [20-1261] (MJG) [Entered: 03/25/2020 12:19 AM]
March 25, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Manuel J. Gonzalez-Acevedo filed by Manuel de J. Gonzalez Acevedo, "Pro Se". Certificate of service dated 03/25/2020. [20-1261] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (MJG) [Entered: 03/25/2020 12:15 AM]
March 23, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Julia Correa-Hernandez, Emilio Diaz-Colon, Lourdes Echevarria, Alberto Gonzalez, Dennise Noemi Longo-Quinones, Ramon Perez-Crepo, Jose Perez-Nieves and Puerto Rico Police Department in 20-1261, 20-1032 filed by Attorney Carlos Lugo-Fiol. Certificate of service dated 03/23/2020. [20-1261, 20-1032] CLERK'S NOTE: Party selection was incorrect. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (CL) [Entered: 03/23/2020 03:41 PM]
March 16, 2020 Public docket note: William Stephen Muldrow was sworn in as the United States Attorney for Puerto Rico on October 4, 2020. We have substituted him for Acting United States Attorney, Rosa Emilia Rodirguez, as the appellee. See Fed. R. App. P. 43(c)(2). [20-1261] (GB) [Entered: 03/16/2020 12:08 PM]
March 16, 2020 Public docket note: Dennise N. Longo-Quinones was sworn in as Attorney General of Puerto Rico on August 7, 2019. We have substituted her for Guillermo Somoza as Attorney General of Puerto Rico as the appellee. See Fed. R. App. P. 43(c)(2). [20-1261] (GB) [Entered: 03/15/2020 03:21 PM]
March 16, 2020 Public docket note: William P. Barr was sworn in as Attorney General of the United States on February 14, 2019. We have substituted him for Eric Holder, as the appellee. See Fed. R. App. P. 43(c)(2). [20-1261] (GB) [Entered: 03/15/2020 03:10 PM]
March 16, 2020 Public docket note: Chad Wolf was sworn in as Secretary of Homeland Security on November 13, 2019. We have substituted him for Acting Secretary, Janet Napolitano, as the appellee. See Fed. R. App. P. 43(c)(2). [20-1261] (GB) [Entered: 03/15/2020 03:07 PM]
March 16, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #138) filed by Appellant Manuel J. Gonzalez-Acevedo. [20-1261] (GB) [Entered: 03/15/2020 02:35 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Gonzalez-Acevedo v. US, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gonzalez-Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AG
Represented By: AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDMARIE MENDEZ-SALAS
Represented By: Edmarie Mendez-Salas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Billie Kathryn Debrason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALBERTO GONZALEZ
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MANUEL OYOLA-TORRES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PUERTO RICO POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSE PEREZ-NIEVES
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LOURDES ECHEVARRIA
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Billie Kathryn Debrason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PALO DE ROBLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD ESCALERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSE ROSARIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHAD WOLF, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Billie Kathryn Debrason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENNISE NOEMI LONGO-QUINONES, Attorney General of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Agnes I. Cordero
Represented By: Isabel Munoz-Acosta
Represented By: Billie Kathryn Debrason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AIDA T. SILVA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HERIBERTO MENDEZ-PEREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSE VERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERTO ESCOBAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELIUD ESTRADA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JULIA CORREA-HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RAMON PEREZ-CREPO
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: US DEPT. OF HOMELAND SECURITY, (DHS)
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM STEPHEN MULDROW, United States Attorney for the District of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Billie Kathryn Debrason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EMILIO DIAZ-COLON
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MANUEL J. GONZALEZ-ACEVEDO
Represented By: Manuel J. Gonzalez-Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?