City of Providence, et al v. US Department of Justice, et al
Defendant / Appellant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE and WILLIAM P. BARR, in his official capacity as United States Attorney General
Plaintiff / Appellee: PROVIDENCE and CENTRAL FALLS
Case Number: 20-1296
Filed: March 17, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Daniel D. Mauler for United States Department of Justice and William P. Barr. [20-1296] (GRC) [Entered: 05/12/2020 05:41 PM]
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge, allowing motion to hold case in abeyance filed by Appellants United States Department of Justice and William P. Barr. Status; directing parties to file a status report and a proposal for further proceedings in this appeal. Status report due 08/05/2020 for William P. Barr, Central Falls, Providence and United States Department of Justice. [20-1296] (CMP) [Entered: 05/07/2020 08:35 AM]
April 23, 2020 ASSENTED TO MOTION to hold case in abeyance filed by Appellants William P. Barr and United States Department of Justice. Certificate of service dated 04/23/2020. [20-1296] (BH) [Entered: 04/23/2020 02:30 PM]
April 17, 2020 NOTICE issued. After 05/01/2020, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Daniel D. Mauler for United States Department of Justice and William P. Barr. [20-1296] (GRC) [Entered: 04/17/2020 04:28 PM]
April 3, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Providence filed by Attorney Jeffrey Dana. Certificate of service dated 04/03/2020. [20-1296] (JTD) [Entered: 04/03/2020 11:53 AM]
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge: The government's unopposed motion to place this appeal in abeyance pending the court's decision in City of Providence v. United States Department of Justice , No. 19-1802, is granted. Within thirty days after issuance of the judgment in No. 19-1802, the parties shall file motions to govern further proceedings in this appeal. [20-1296] (GRC) [Entered: 03/23/2020 10:23 AM]
March 19, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Providence filed by Attorney Megan Maciasz DiSanto. Certificate of service dated 03/19/2020. [20-1296] (MKM) [Entered: 03/19/2020 01:49 PM]
March 19, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Central Falls filed by Attorney Matthew T. Jerzyk. Certificate of service dated 03/19/2020. [20-1296] (MTJ) [Entered: 03/19/2020 12:11 PM]
March 19, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Providence filed by Attorney Etie-Lee Z. Schaub. Certificate of service dated 03/19/2020. [20-1296] (EZS) [Entered: 03/19/2020 09:56 AM]
March 18, 2020 MOTION to hold case in abeyance filed by Appellants William P. Barr and United States Department of Justice. Certificate of service dated 03/18/2020. [20-1296] (BH) [Entered: 03/18/2020 04:46 PM]
March 18, 2020 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants William P. Barr and United States Department of Justice indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 03/18/2020. [20-1296] (BH) [Entered: 03/18/2020 04:36 PM]
March 18, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants William P. Barr and United States Department of Justice. Certificate of service dated 03/18/2020. [20-1296] (BH) [Entered: 03/18/2020 04:27 PM]
March 18, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants United States Department of Justice and William P. Barr filed by Attorney Daniel Tenny. Certificate of service dated 03/18/2020. [20-1296] (DT) [Entered: 03/18/2020 04:17 PM]
March 18, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants William P. Barr and United States Department of Justice filed by Attorney Brad Hinshelwood. Certificate of service dated 03/18/2020. [20-1296] (BH) [Entered: 03/18/2020 03:56 PM]
March 18, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #49) filed by Appellants William P. Barr and United States Department of Justice. [20-1296] (GRC) [Entered: 03/18/2020 05:24 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: City of Providence, et al v. US Department of Justice, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Brian Pandya
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Represented By: Bradley Hinshelwood
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Represented By: Zachary A. Cunha
Represented By: Lauren S. Zurier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WILLIAM P. BARR, in his official capacity as United States Attorney General
Represented By: Brian Pandya
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Represented By: Bradley Hinshelwood
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Represented By: Zachary A. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PROVIDENCE
Represented By: Etie-Lee Z. Schaub
Represented By: Megan K. Maciasz DiSanto
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Dana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CENTRAL FALLS
Represented By: Etie-Lee Z. Schaub
Represented By: Matthew T. Jerzyk
Represented By: Megan K. Maciasz DiSanto
Represented By: Robert F. Weber
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Dana
Represented By: Nicholas J. Hemond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?