Common Cause Rhode Island, et al v. RI Republic Party, et al
Petitioner / Appellant: REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE and RHODE ISLAND REPUBLICAN PARTY
Defendant / Appellant: DAVID H SHOLES, in his official capacities as member of the Rhode Island Board of Elections, LOUIS A. DESIMONE, JR., in his official capacities as member of the Rhode Island Board of Elections, ISADORE S. RAMOS, in his official capacities as member of the Rhode Island Board of Elections, RICHARD H. PIERCE, in his official capacities as member of the Rhode Island Board of Elections, LOUIS A SIMONE, JR., in his official capacities as member of the Rhode Island Board of Elections, WILLIAM E. WEST, in his official capacities as member of the Rhode Island Board of Elections, DIANE L. MEDEROS, in her official capacity as member of the Rhode Island Board of Elections, NELLIE GORBEA, in her official capacity as Secretary of State of Rhode Island and JENNIFER L. JOHNSON, in her official capacities as member of the Rhode Island Board of Elections
Plaintiff / Appellee: LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF RHODE ISLAND, BARBARA MONAHAN, MIRANDA OAKLEY, COMMON CAUSE RHODE ISLAND and MARY BAKER
Case Number: 20-1753
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
August 7, 2020 Summary Common Cause Rhode Island v. Rhode Island Republican Party

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Republican National Committee and Rhode Island Republican Party filed by Attorney Cameron T. Norris. Certificate of service dated 08/01/2020. [20-1753] (CTN) [Entered: 08/01/2020 12:14 AM]
August 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge, The Emergency Motion to Expedite filed by movants is granted. Appellees shall file their responses to the Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal no later than 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday, August 4, 2020 . Any reply shall be filed no later than 12:00 p.m. on Wednesday, August 5, 2020 . [20-1753] (DPO) [Entered: 08/01/2020 02:43 PM]
July 31, 2020 EMERGENCY MOTION to expedite briefing schedule on emergency motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellants Republican National Committee and Rhode Island Republican Party. Certificate of service dated 07/31/2020. [20-1753] (TRM) [Entered: 07/31/2020 11:55 PM]
July 31, 2020 EMERGENCY MOTION to stay pending appeal filed by Appellants Republican National Committee and Rhode Island Republican Party. Certificate of service dated 07/31/2020. [20-1753] (TRM) [Entered: 07/31/2020 11:34 PM]
July 31, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Republican National Committee and Rhode Island Republican Party filed by Attorney Thomas R. McCarthy. Certificate of service dated 07/31/2020. [20-1753] (TRM) [Entered: 07/31/2020 07:18 PM]
July 31, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Republican National Committee and Rhode Island Republican Party filed by Attorney Brandon S. Bell. Certificate of service dated 07/31/2020. [20-1753] (BSB) [Entered: 07/31/2020 10:52 PM]
July 31, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #30) filed by Appellants Republican National Committee and Rhode Island Republican Party. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 08/14/2020. [20-1753] (ALW) [Entered: 07/31/2020 06:38 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Common Cause Rhode Island, et al v. RI Republic Party, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE
Represented By: Brandon Scott Bell
Represented By: Thomas R. McCarthy
Represented By: Joseph S. Larisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: RHODE ISLAND REPUBLICAN PARTY
Represented By: Brandon Scott Bell
Represented By: Thomas R. McCarthy
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Norris
Represented By: Patrick N. Strawbridge
Represented By: Joseph S. Larisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DAVID H SHOLES, in his official capacities as member of the Rhode Island Board of Elections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LOUIS A. DESIMONE, JR., in his official capacities as member of the Rhode Island Board of Elections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ISADORE S. RAMOS, in his official capacities as member of the Rhode Island Board of Elections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RICHARD H. PIERCE, in his official capacities as member of the Rhode Island Board of Elections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LOUIS A SIMONE, JR., in his official capacities as member of the Rhode Island Board of Elections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WILLIAM E. WEST, in his official capacities as member of the Rhode Island Board of Elections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DIANE L. MEDEROS, in her official capacity as member of the Rhode Island Board of Elections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: NELLIE GORBEA, in her official capacity as Secretary of State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Angel Taveras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JENNIFER L. JOHNSON, in her official capacities as member of the Rhode Island Board of Elections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF RHODE ISLAND
Represented By: Dale Ho
Represented By: Julie Ebenstein
Represented By: Jonathan Diaz
Represented By: Lynette J. Labinger
Represented By: Christopher H. Bell
Represented By: Danielle Lang
Represented By: Michael Courtney Keats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BARBARA MONAHAN
Represented By: Dale Ho
Represented By: Julie Ebenstein
Represented By: Jonathan Diaz
Represented By: Lynette J. Labinger
Represented By: Christopher H. Bell
Represented By: Danielle Lang
Represented By: Michael Courtney Keats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MIRANDA OAKLEY
Represented By: Dale Ho
Represented By: Julie Ebenstein
Represented By: Jonathan Diaz
Represented By: Lynette J. Labinger
Represented By: Christopher H. Bell
Represented By: Danielle Lang
Represented By: Michael Courtney Keats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COMMON CAUSE RHODE ISLAND
Represented By: Dale Ho
Represented By: Julie Ebenstein
Represented By: Jonathan Diaz
Represented By: Lynette J. Labinger
Represented By: Christopher H. Bell
Represented By: Danielle Lang
Represented By: Michael Courtney Keats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARY BAKER
Represented By: Dale Ho
Represented By: Julie Ebenstein
Represented By: Jonathan Diaz
Represented By: Lynette J. Labinger
Represented By: Christopher H. Bell
Represented By: Danielle Lang
Represented By: Michael Courtney Keats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?