Reyes-Caparros v. Barr
Plaintiff / Appellant: FRANCISCO J. REYES-CAPARROS
Defendant / Appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General of the United States
Case Number: 20-1792
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER directing the parties to proceed under F.R.A.P 28.1; vacating briefing schedule. [20-1792, 20-1932] (CMP) [Entered: 10/14/2020 03:31 PM]
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Francisco J. Reyes-Caparros. Brief due 11/30/2020 for appellant Francisco J. Reyes-Caparros. Appendix due 11/30/2020 for appellant Francisco J. Reyes-Caparros. We are disinclined to grant a request for further enlargement of this deadline. [20-1792] (CMP) [Entered: 09/08/2020 08:37 AM]
September 7, 2020 MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Francisco J. Reyes-Caparros. Certificate of service dated 09/07/2020. [20-1792] (BL) [Entered: 09/07/2020 05:31 PM]
August 20, 2020 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 09/29/2020 for appellant Francisco J. Reyes-Caparros. Appendix due 09/29/2020 for appellant Francisco J. Reyes-Caparros. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-1792] (CMP) [Entered: 08/20/2020 11:23 AM]
August 19, 2020 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Francisco J. Reyes-Caparros indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 08/19/2020. [20-1792] (BL) [Entered: 08/19/2020 09:01 PM]
August 19, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Francisco J. Reyes-Caparros. Certificate of service dated 08/19/2020. [20-1792] (BL) [Entered: 08/19/2020 09:00 PM]
August 19, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Francisco J. Reyes-Caparros filed by Attorney Bamily Lopez-Ortiz of LOPEZ TORO, Estudio de Derecho. Certificate of service dated 08/19/2020. [20-1792] (BL) [Entered: 08/19/2020 08:59 PM]
August 19, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #288) filed by Appellant Francisco J. Reyes-Caparros. Docketing Statement due 09/02/2020. Transcript Report/Order form due 09/02/2020. Appearance form due 09/02/2020. [20-1792] (CMP) [Entered: 08/19/2020 12:00 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Reyes-Caparros v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRANCISCO J. REYES-CAPARROS
Represented By: Bamily Lopez-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: Susan M. Poswistilo
Represented By: Jason C. Weida
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?