Assured Guaranty Corp., et al v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, et al
Plaintiff: MBIA INSURANCE CORPORATION
Defendant: APEX GENERAL CONTRACTORS, LLC
Respondent / Appellee: PUERTO RICO HIGHWAYS AND TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY and PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY
Debtor: EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE GOVERNMENT OF PUERTO RICO, PUERTO RICO ELECTRIC POWER AUTHORITY (PREPA), PUERTO RICO SALES TAX FINANCING CORPORATION, Depository Trust Company, a/k/a Cofina and PUERTO RICO PUBLIC BUILDINGS AUTHORITY
Petitioner / Appellant: AMBAC ASSURANCE CORPORATION, ASSURED GUARANTY CORPORATION, NATIONAL PUBLIC FINANCE GUARANTEE CORPORATION, FINANCIAL GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY and ASSURED GUARANTY MUNICIPAL CORPORATION
Interested Party: ASOCIACION DE CONTRATISTAS DE ENERGIA RENOVABLE DE PUERTO RICO, PUERTO RICO MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION, CAMARA DE MERCADEO, INDUSTRIA Y DISTRIBUCION DE ALIMENTOS, CANTOR-KATZ COLLATERAL MONITOR LLC, AUTOPISTAS METROPOLITANAS DE PUERTO RICO, LLC, PV PROPERTIES, INC., ASOCIACION DE RESTAURANTES DE PUERTO RICO, CENTRO UNIDO DE DETALLISTAS, CANTOR-KATZ COLLATERAL MONITOR LLC, as collateral monitor for the GCB Debt Recovery Authority and AMERINATIONAL COMMUNITY SERVICES, LLC, as servicer for the GDB Debt Recovery Authority
3Rd Party Defendant: YOLANDA I. CORREA FONSECA
3Rd Party Plaintiff: CRUZ-HERNANDEZ PLAINTIFF GROUP, NILDA AGOSTO MALDONADO PLAINTIFF GROUP, ARACELIS NAZARIO TORRES, MARIA CONSUELO FIGUEROA TORRES and CONSEJO DE SALUD DE LA COMUNIDAD DE LA PLAYA DE PONCE, INC.
Trustee: US TRUSTEE-REGION 21 and MONSITA LECAROZ-ARRIBAS
Debtor / Appellee: COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO and FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD
Case Number: 20-1847
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 REPLY filed by Appellees FOMB and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority to response [ # 6375680-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 10/27/2020. [20-1847] (TWM) [Entered: 10/27/2020 02:53 PM]
October 22, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation filed by Attorney Eric Perez-Ochoa. Certificate of service dated 10/22/2020. [20-1847] (EP) [Entered: 10/22/2020 03:59 PM]
October 22, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Assured Guaranty Corporation and Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation filed by Attorney Heriberto J. Burgos Perez. Certificate of service dated 10/22/2020. [20-1847] (HJB) [Entered: 10/22/2020 02:32 PM]
October 20, 2020 REPLY in support of motion to hold appeal in abeyance and RESPONSE in opposition to motion to dismiss [ # 6374225-2 ] filed by Appellants Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corporation, Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation, Financial Guaranty Insurance Company and National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation. Certificate of service dated 10/20/2020. [20-1847]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (NKK) [Entered: 10/20/2020 02:03 PM]
October 13, 2020 MOTION to dismiss case and RESPONSE to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 6371349-2 ] filed by Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority. Certificate of service dated 10/13/2020. [20-1847] (TWM) [Entered: 10/13/2020 09:56 PM]
October 2, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellant Ambac Assurance Corporation. Certificate of service dated 10/02/2020. [20-1847] (AM) [Entered: 10/02/2020 05:29 PM]
September 30, 2020 MOTION to hold case in abeyance filed by Appellants Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corporation, Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation, Financial Guaranty Insurance Company and National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation. Certificate of service dated 09/30/2020. [20-1847] (NKK) [Entered: 09/30/2020 06:12 PM]
September 30, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corporation, Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation, Financial Guaranty Insurance Company and National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation. Certificate of service dated 09/30/2020. [20-1847] (NKK) [Entered: 09/30/2020 06:03 PM]
September 30, 2020 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corporation, Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation, Financial Guaranty Insurance Company and National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 09/30/2020. [20-1847] (NKK) [Entered: 09/30/2020 06:00 PM]
September 30, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Ambac Assurance Corporation filed by Attorney Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes. Certificate of service dated 09/30/2020. [20-1847] (RAC) [Entered: 09/30/2020 05:52 PM]
September 30, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Assured Guaranty Corporation and Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation filed by Attorney Mark C. Ellenberg. Certificate of service dated 09/30/2020. [20-1847] (MCE) [Entered: 09/30/2020 04:37 PM]
September 30, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Ambac Assurance Corporation filed by Attorney Jonathan Ohring. Certificate of service dated 09/30/2020. [20-1847] (JO) [Entered: 09/30/2020 03:44 PM]
September 30, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Ambac Assurance Corporation filed by Attorney John J. Hughes III. Certificate of service dated 09/30/2020. [20-1847] (JJH) [Entered: 09/30/2020 03:35 PM]
September 30, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Ambac Assurance Corporation filed by Attorney Grant R. Mainland. Certificate of service dated 09/30/2020. [20-1847] (GRM) [Entered: 09/30/2020 03:28 PM]
September 30, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Ambac Assurance Corporation filed by Attorney Atara Miller. Certificate of service dated 09/30/2020. [20-1847] (AM) [Entered: 09/30/2020 03:23 PM]
September 30, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Ambac Assurance Corporation filed by Attorney Dennis F. Dunne. Certificate of service dated 09/30/2020. [20-1847] (DFD) [Entered: 09/30/2020 03:16 PM]
September 30, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellant Financial Guaranty Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 09/30/2020. [20-1847] (JWC) [Entered: 09/30/2020 03:02 PM]
September 30, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellant National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation. Certificate of service dated 09/30/2020. [20-1847] (GS) [Entered: 09/30/2020 02:54 PM]
September 30, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corporation, Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation and National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation filed by Attorney Mitchell P. Reich. Certificate of service dated 09/30/2020. [20-1847] (MR) [Entered: 09/30/2020 02:38 PM]
September 30, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corporation, Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation and National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation filed by Attorney Sean Marotta. Certificate of service dated 09/30/2020. [20-1847] (SMM) [Entered: 09/30/2020 02:15 PM]
September 30, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corporation, Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation and National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation filed by Attorney Neal Kumar Katyal. Certificate of service dated 09/30/2020. [20-1847] (NKK) [Entered: 09/30/2020 02:03 PM]
September 30, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee AAFAF filed by Attorney Ashley Pavel. Certificate of service dated 09/30/2020. [20-1847] (AMP) [Entered: 09/30/2020 02:01 PM]
September 30, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Not Party AmeriNational Community Services, LLC filed by Attorney Alejandro J. Cepeda-Diaz. Certificate of service dated 09/30/2020. [20-1847] (AJC) [Entered: 09/30/2020 01:58 PM]
September 30, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee AAFAF filed by Attorney John J. Rapisardi. Certificate of service dated 09/30/2020. [20-1847] (JJR) [Entered: 09/30/2020 01:54 PM]
September 30, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee AAFAF filed by Attorney Elizabeth L. McKeen. Certificate of service dated 09/30/2020. [20-1847] (ELM) [Entered: 09/30/2020 01:43 PM]
September 30, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee AAFAF filed by Attorney Peter Friedman. Certificate of service dated 09/30/2020. [20-1847] (PMF) [Entered: 09/30/2020 01:37 PM]
September 30, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Not Party AmeriNational Community Services, LLC filed by Attorney Arturo J. Garcia-Sola. Certificate of service dated 09/30/2020. [20-1847] (AJG) [Entered: 09/30/2020 12:27 PM]
September 30, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellants Assured Guaranty Corporation and Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation. Certificate of service dated 09/30/2020. [20-1847] (HRH) [Entered: 09/30/2020 12:11 PM]
September 30, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Assured Guaranty Corporation and Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation filed by Attorney William J. Natbony. Certificate of service dated 09/30/2020. [20-1847] (WJN) [Entered: 09/30/2020 11:53 AM]
September 30, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Assured Guaranty Corporation and Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation filed by Attorney Howard R. Hawkins Jr.. Certificate of service dated 09/30/2020. [20-1847] (HRH) [Entered: 09/30/2020 11:50 AM]
September 30, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation filed by Attorney Gregory Silbert. Certificate of service dated 09/30/2020. [20-1847] (GS) [Entered: 09/30/2020 10:52 AM]
September 29, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Financial Guaranty Insurance Company filed by Attorney Maria Emilia Pico. Certificate of service dated 09/29/2020. [20-1847] (MEP) [Entered: 09/29/2020 03:18 PM]
September 29, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Financial Guaranty Insurance Company filed by Attorney Jason W,. Callen. Certificate of service dated 09/29/2020. [20-1847] (JWC) [Entered: 09/29/2020 02:28 PM]
September 29, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Financial Guaranty Insurance Company filed by Attorney Martin A. Sosland. Certificate of service dated 09/29/2020. [20-1847] (MAS) [Entered: 09/29/2020 02:04 PM]
September 29, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Not Party AmeriNational Community Services, LLC filed by Attorney Nayuan Zouairabani. Certificate of service dated 09/29/2020. [20-1847] (NZ) [Entered: 09/29/2020 01:20 PM]
September 29, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Not Party Cantor-Katz Collateral Monitor LLC filed by Attorney Sarah Sloan. Certificate of service dated 09/29/2020. [20-1847] (SHS) [Entered: 09/29/2020 01:02 PM]
September 29, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Not Party Cantor-Katz Collateral Monitor LLC filed by Attorney Robert Loeb. Certificate of service dated 09/29/2020. [20-1847] (RML) [Entered: 09/29/2020 12:15 PM]
September 28, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney Brian S. Rosen. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2020. [20-1847] (BSR) [Entered: 09/28/2020 06:05 PM]
September 28, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney Martin J. Bienenstock. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2020. [20-1847] (MJB) [Entered: 09/28/2020 06:02 PM]
September 28, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney Margaret A. Dale. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2020. [20-1847] (MAD) [Entered: 09/28/2020 05:59 PM]
September 28, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney Mark D. Harris. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2020. [20-1847] (MDH) [Entered: 09/28/2020 05:56 PM]
September 28, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney Stephen L. Ratner. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2020. [20-1847] (SLR) [Entered: 09/28/2020 05:53 PM]
September 28, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney Julia D. Alonzo. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2020. [20-1847] (JDA) [Entered: 09/28/2020 05:51 PM]
September 28, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney Michael A. Firestein. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2020. [20-1847] (MAF) [Entered: 09/28/2020 05:47 PM]
September 28, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney William D. Dalsen. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2020. [20-1847] (WDD) [Entered: 09/28/2020 05:44 PM]
September 28, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney John E. Roberts. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2020. [20-1847] (JER) [Entered: 09/28/2020 05:41 PM]
September 28, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney Timothy W. Mungovan. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2020. [20-1847] (TWM) [Entered: 09/28/2020 05:39 PM]
September 16, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #14096) filed by Appellants Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corporation, Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation, Financial Guaranty Insurance Company and National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation. Docketing Statement due 09/30/2020. Transcript Report/Order form due 09/30/2020. Appearance form due 09/30/2020. [20-1847] (CMP) [Entered: 09/16/2020 01:40 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Assured Guaranty Corp., et al v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: PUERTO RICO HIGHWAYS AND TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Hadassa Waxman
Represented By: Carl Forbes Jr.
Represented By: Chantel L. Febus
Represented By: Lucia Chapman
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Maja Zerjal
Represented By: Emanuel Rier
Represented By: Michael Luskin
Represented By: Margaret Antinori Dale
Represented By: Ricardo Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Stephan E. Hornung
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Andres W. Lopez
Represented By: Jared D. Zajac
Represented By: Julia D. Alonzo
Represented By: Michael A. Firestein
Represented By: Chris Theodoridis
Represented By: Lary Alan Rappaport
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Bradley R. Bobroff
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Luis Francisco Del-Valle-Emmanuelli
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Stephen L. Ratner
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Kevin J. Perra
Represented By: Raul Castellanos-Malave
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Steven O. Weise
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY
Represented By: Nancy A. Mitchell
Represented By: Luis C. Marini-Biaggi
Represented By: John J. Rapisardi
Represented By: Elizabeth Lemond McKeen
Represented By: Ashley M. Pavel
Represented By: Peter M. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE GOVERNMENT OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Rachel Ehrlich Albanese
Represented By: Chantel L. Febus
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Maja Zerjal
Represented By: Jose Alberto Sosa-Llorens
Represented By: Richard A. Chesley
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Luis Francisco Del-Valle-Emmanuelli
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Stephen L. Ratner
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Steven O. Weise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: PUERTO RICO ELECTRIC POWER AUTHORITY (PREPA)
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Arturo Diaz-Angueira
Represented By: Hadassa Waxman
Represented By: Carl Forbes Jr.
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Daniel S. Shamah
Represented By: Michael Kelly Malone
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Katiuska Bolanos-Lugo
Represented By: Jared D. Zajac
Represented By: Maria J. DiConza
Represented By: Joseph P. Davis III
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: PUERTO RICO SALES TAX FINANCING CORPORATION, Depository Trust Company, a/k/a Cofina
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Carl Forbes Jr.
Represented By: Chantel L. Febus
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Ricardo Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Represented By: Jared D. Zajac
Represented By: Chris Theodoridis
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Kevin J. Perra
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: PUERTO RICO PUBLIC BUILDINGS AUTHORITY
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: AMBAC ASSURANCE CORPORATION
Represented By: Dennis F. Dunne
Represented By: Grant R. Mainland
Represented By: John Joseph Hughes III
Represented By: Atara Miller
Represented By: Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes
Represented By: Mitchell Reich
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Represented By: Jonathan Ohring
Represented By: Neal Kumar Katyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: ASSURED GUARANTY CORPORATION
Represented By: William J. Natbony
Represented By: Diana Perez-Seda
Represented By: Ricardo F. Casellas-Sanchez
Represented By: Casey J. Servais
Represented By: Heriberto J. Burgos-Perez
Represented By: Thomas J. Curtin
Represented By: Howard Robert Hawkins Jr.
Represented By: Mark C. Ellenberg
Represented By: Ellen M. Halstead
Represented By: Mitchell Reich
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Represented By: Neal Kumar Katyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: NATIONAL PUBLIC FINANCE GUARANTEE CORPORATION
Represented By: Jonathan D. Polkes
Represented By: Eric Perez-Ochoa
Represented By: Kelly Diblasi
Represented By: Robert Berezin
Represented By: Gregory Silbert
Represented By: Luis A. Oliver-Fraticelli
Represented By: Gabriel Morgan
Represented By: Mitchell Reich
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Represented By: Neal Kumar Katyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: FINANCIAL GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Martin A. Sosland
Represented By: Jason W. Callen
Represented By: Maria Emilia Pico
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Represented By: Neal Kumar Katyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: ASSURED GUARANTY MUNICIPAL CORPORATION
Represented By: William J. Natbony
Represented By: Diana Perez-Seda
Represented By: Ricardo F. Casellas-Sanchez
Represented By: Casey J. Servais
Represented By: Heriberto J. Burgos-Perez
Represented By: Thomas J. Curtin
Represented By: Howard Robert Hawkins Jr.
Represented By: Mark C. Ellenberg
Represented By: Ellen M. Halstead
Represented By: Mitchell Reich
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Represented By: Neal Kumar Katyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASOCIACION DE CONTRATISTAS DE ENERGIA RENOVABLE DE PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PUERTO RICO MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CAMARA DE MERCADEO, INDUSTRIA Y DISTRIBUCION DE ALIMENTOS
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CANTOR-KATZ COLLATERAL MONITOR LLC
Represented By: Arturo J. Garcia-Sola
Represented By: Carmen D. Conde Torres
Represented By: Nayuan Zouairabani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AUTOPISTAS METROPOLITANAS DE PUERTO RICO, LLC
Represented By: James L. Hallowell
Represented By: Matthew John Williams
Represented By: Keith R. Martorana
Represented By: Nayuan Zouairabani
Represented By: Alejandro Jose Cepeda-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PV PROPERTIES, INC.
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASOCIACION DE RESTAURANTES DE PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CENTRO UNIDO DE DETALLISTAS
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CANTOR-KATZ COLLATERAL MONITOR LLC, as collateral monitor for the GCB Debt Recovery Authority
Represented By: Arturo J. Garcia-Sola
Represented By: Carmen D. Conde Torres
Represented By: Nayuan Zouairabani
Represented By: Robert Mark Loeb
Represented By: Peter J. Amend
Represented By: David Litterine-Kaufman
Represented By: Sarah Hartman Sloan
Represented By: Douglas S. Mintz
Represented By: Monica Perrigino
Represented By: Laura Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERINATIONAL COMMUNITY SERVICES, LLC, as servicer for the GDB Debt Recovery Authority
Represented By: Arturo J. Garcia-Sola
Represented By: Carmen D. Conde Torres
Represented By: Nayuan Zouairabani
Represented By: Alejandro Jose Cepeda-Diaz
Represented By: Peter J. Amend
Represented By: David Litterine-Kaufman
Represented By: Douglas S. Mintz
Represented By: Monica Perrigino
Represented By: Laura Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APEX GENERAL CONTRACTORS, LLC
Represented By: Luis E. Pabon-Roca
Represented By: Clarisa I. Sola-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: YOLANDA I. CORREA FONSECA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: CRUZ-HERNANDEZ PLAINTIFF GROUP
Represented By: Ivonne Gonzalez-Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: NILDA AGOSTO MALDONADO PLAINTIFF GROUP
Represented By: Ivonne Gonzalez-Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: ARACELIS NAZARIO TORRES
Represented By: Carlos Alberto Ruiz Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: MARIA CONSUELO FIGUEROA TORRES
Represented By: Vanessa Hernandez Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: CONSEJO DE SALUD DE LA COMUNIDAD DE LA PLAYA DE PONCE, INC.
Represented By: Ivonne Gonzalez-Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: US TRUSTEE-REGION 21
Represented By: Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ-ARRIBAS
Represented By: Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MBIA INSURANCE CORPORATION
Represented By: Philippe Z. Selendy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor / appellee: COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Peter D. Doyle
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg
Represented By: Jennifer L. Roche
Represented By: Susana I. Penagaricano Brown
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Carl Forbes Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Hackett
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Daniel Jose Perez-Refojos
Represented By: Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera
Represented By: Lucia Chapman
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Laura E. Stafford
Represented By: Adele M. El-Khouri
Represented By: Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
Represented By: Matthew J. Morris
Represented By: Maja Zerjal
Represented By: Valerie Concepcion-Cintron
Represented By: Michael Luskin
Represented By: Chad Golder
Represented By: Margaret Antinori Dale
Represented By: Scott Rutsky
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Represented By: Ricardo Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Stephan E. Hornung
Represented By: Rachel G. Miller Ziegler
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Jared D. Zajac
Represented By: Julia D. Alonzo
Represented By: Ginger D. Anders
Represented By: Paul V. Possinger
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Michael A. Firestein
Represented By: Michel Mir-Martinez
Represented By: Juan Carlos Ramirez-Ortiz
Represented By: Chris Theodoridis
Represented By: Lary Alan Rappaport
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Bradley R. Bobroff
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Stephen L. Ratner
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Kevin J. Perra
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Steven O. Weise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor / appellee: FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD
Represented By: Peter D. Doyle
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg
Represented By: Jennifer L. Roche
Represented By: Susana I. Penagaricano Brown
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Carl Forbes Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Hackett
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Daniel Jose Perez-Refojos
Represented By: Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera
Represented By: Lucia Chapman
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Laura E. Stafford
Represented By: Adele M. El-Khouri
Represented By: Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
Represented By: Matthew J. Morris
Represented By: Maja Zerjal
Represented By: Valerie Concepcion-Cintron
Represented By: Michael Luskin
Represented By: Chad Golder
Represented By: Margaret Antinori Dale
Represented By: Scott Rutsky
Represented By: Ricardo Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Stephan E. Hornung
Represented By: Rachel G. Miller Ziegler
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Jared D. Zajac
Represented By: Julia D. Alonzo
Represented By: Josue N. Torres-Crespo
Represented By: Ginger D. Anders
Represented By: Paul V. Possinger
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Michael A. Firestein
Represented By: Michel Mir-Martinez
Represented By: Juan Carlos Ramirez-Ortiz
Represented By: Chris Theodoridis
Represented By: Lary Alan Rappaport
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Bradley R. Bobroff
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Stephen L. Ratner
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Kevin J. Perra
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Steven O. Weise
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?