Faye v. Quicken Loans, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: MOUSTAPHA FAYE
Defendant / Appellee: QUICKEN LOANS, INC.
Case Number: 20-1958
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss for failure to pay the filing fee. Fee due 12/17/2020. [20-1958] (GAK) [Entered: 12/03/2020 10:53 AM]
November 27, 2020 APPENDIX filed by Appellant Moustapha Faye. Certificate of service dated 11/26/2020. Five paper copies of the electronically filed appendix must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 12/04/2020 [20-1958] (LIM) [Entered: 11/27/2020 08:09 AM]
November 27, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellant Moustapha Faye. Certificate of service dated 11/26/2020. [20-1958] (LIM) [Entered: 11/27/2020 08:06 AM]
November 27, 2020 APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant Moustapha Faye. Certificate of service dated 11/26/2020. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 12/04/2020 . Brief due 12/28/2020 for APPELLEE Quicken Loans, Inc. [20-1958] (LIM) [Entered: 11/27/2020 08:03 AM]
November 26, 2020 BRIEF tendered by Appellant Moustapha Faye. [20-1958] (MF) [Entered: 11/26/2020 09:43 PM]
October 16, 2020 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 11/25/2020 for appellant Moustapha Faye. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-1958] (ALW) [Entered: 10/16/2020 10:33 PM]
October 13, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #15 ) filed by Appellant Moustapha Faye. Fee due 10/27/2020. [20-1958] (ALW) [Entered: 10/13/2020 05:56 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Faye v. Quicken Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MOUSTAPHA FAYE
Represented By: Moustapha Faye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: QUICKEN LOANS, INC.
Represented By: Michael P. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?