Lerner v. Colman, et al
Defendant / Appellee: KIRSTEN HUNT, DANIEL J. FLYNN, III, WILLIAM CHRISTOPHER COLMAN, LISA LABRIQUE, KAREN REIDY, ELIZABETH COLMAN, STEPHEN J. COLMAN and JAMES F. CANAVAN
Plaintiff / Appellant: SANDRA COLMAN LERNER
Case Number: 20-1984
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Sandra Colman Lerner. Brief and Appendix due 01/25/2021 for appellant Sandra Colman Lerner. [20-1984] (ALW) [Entered: 12/07/2020 02:16 PM]
December 7, 2020 ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant Sandra Colman Lerner. Certificate of service dated 12/07/2020. [20-1984] (MFC) [Entered: 12/07/2020 12:54 PM]
November 20, 2020 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: William D. Black for Sandra Colman Lerner and Janet E. Taylor for Stephen J. Colman. [20-1984] (ALW) [Entered: 11/20/2020 10:54 PM]
November 2, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Stephen J. Colman filed by Attorney Dana Curhan. Certificate of service dated 11/02/2020. [20-1984] (DAC) [Entered: 11/02/2020 09:54 AM]
October 30, 2020 NOTICE issued. After 11/13/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: William D. Black for Sandra Colman Lerner, Andrew C. Oatway for James F. Canavan and Janet E. Taylor for Stephen J. Colman. [20-1984] (ALW) [Entered: 10/30/2020 03:56 PM]
October 30, 2020 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 12/09/2020 for appellant Sandra Colman Lerner. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-1984] (ALW) [Entered: 10/30/2020 03:43 PM]
October 28, 2020 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Andrew C. Oatway for Appellee James F. Canavan. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued October 15, 2020. Forwarding address unknown. [20-1984] (ATC) [Entered: 11/03/2020 11:41 AM]
October 27, 2020 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Sandra Colman Lerner indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 10/27/2020. [20-1984] (ALW) [Entered: 10/27/2020 08:52 PM]
October 27, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Sandra Colman Lerner. Certificate of service dated 10/27/2020. [20-1984] CLERK'S NOTE: Additional attachments must be filed separately. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (MFC) [Entered: 10/27/2020 02:59 PM]
October 27, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Sandra Colman Lerner filed by Attorney Michael F. Connolly. Certificate of service dated 10/27/2020. [20-1984] (MFC) [Entered: 10/27/2020 02:55 PM]
October 15, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #52 ) filed by Appellant Sandra Colman Lerner. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 10/29/2020. [20-1984] (ALW) [Entered: 10/15/2020 11:31 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Lerner v. Colman, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIRSTEN HUNT
Represented By: Jill K. Hauff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL J. FLYNN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM CHRISTOPHER COLMAN
Represented By: Jill K. Hauff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LISA LABRIQUE
Represented By: Jill K. Hauff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAREN REIDY
Represented By: Jill K. Hauff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELIZABETH COLMAN
Represented By: Jill K. Hauff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHEN J. COLMAN
Represented By: Richard M. Gelb
Represented By: Janet E. Taylor
Represented By: Dana Alan Curhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES F. CANAVAN
Represented By: Andrew C. Oatway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SANDRA COLMAN LERNER
Represented By: Michael F. Connolly
Represented By: William D. Black
Represented By: William Durand Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?