Official Comm. of Unsecured Creditors v. FOMB
Defendant: APEX GENERAL CONTRACTORS, LLC
Respondent: PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY
Debtor: PUERTO RICO HIGHWAYS AND TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, PUERTO RICO PUBLIC BUILDINGS AUTHORITY, PUERTO RICO ELECTRIC POWER AUTHORITY (PREPA), EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE GOVERNMENT OF PUERTO RICO and PUERTO RICO SALES TAX FINANCING CORPORATION, Depository Trust Company, a/k/a Cofina
3Rd Party Plaintiff: ARACELIS NAZARIO TORRES, CRUZ-HERNANDEZ PLAINTIFF GROUP, NILDA AGOSTO MALDONADO PLAINTIFF GROUP, MARIA CONSUELO FIGUEROA TORRES and CONSEJO DE SALUD DE LA COMUNIDAD DE LA PLAYA DE PONCE, INC.
Trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ-ARRIBAS and US TRUSTEE-REGION 21
Debtor / Appellee: COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO and FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD
Interested Party: PV PROPERTIES, INC., AMBAC ASSURANCE CORPORATION, PUERTO RICO MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION, CAMARA DE MERCADEO, INDUSTRIA Y DISTRIBUCION DE ALIMENTOS, ASOCIACION DE CONTRATISTAS DE ENERGIA RENOVABLE DE PUERTO RICO, ASOCIACION DE RESTAURANTES DE PUERTO RICO, CENTRO UNIDO DE DETALLISTAS and YOLANDA I. CORREA FONSECA
Petitioner / Appellant: OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS
Case Number: 20-2014
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 REPLY filed by Appellant Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to response [ # 6387697-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 12/14/2020. [20-2014] (LAD) [Entered: 12/14/2020 11:38 PM]
December 10, 2020 RESPONSE filed by Appellees FOMB and Commonwealth of Puerto Rico to order [ # 6380510-2 ], order [ # 6380510-3 ]. Certificate of service dated 12/10/2020. [20-2014] (TWM) [Entered: 12/10/2020 03:05 PM]
December 10, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellees Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and FOMB. [20-2014] (CMP) [Entered: 12/10/2020 05:03 PM]
December 8, 2020 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Nicholas A. Bassett for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Cristina B. Fernandez-Niggerman for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Bradley R. Bobroff for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Lucia Chapman for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Valerie Concepcion-Cintron for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Peter D. Doyle for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Carl Forbes, Jr. for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, FOMB and Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation, Gregg M. Mashberg for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, FOMB and Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation, Michel Mir-Martinez for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Matthew J. Morris for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Scott Rutsky for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Chris Theodoridis for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, FOMB and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation, Josue N. Torres-Crespo for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Jared D. Zajac for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, FOMB and Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation, Charles Alfred Cuprill for Consejo De Salud De La Comunidad De La Playa De Ponce, Inc., Maria J. DiConza for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), Carl Forbes, Jr. for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation, Ivonne Gonzalez-Morales for Nilda Agosto Maldonado Plaintiff Group and Cruz-Hernandez Plaintiff Group, Vanessa Hernandez Rodriguez for Maria Consuelo Figueroa Torres, Michael Kelly Malone for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), Gregg M. Mashberg for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation, Daniel S. Shamah for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), Chris Theodoridis for Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation, Hadassa Waxman for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority and Jared D. Zajac for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation. [20-2014] (KPC) [Entered: 12/08/2020 02:15 PM]
November 23, 2020 RESPONSE filed by Appellant Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to order [ # 6380510-2 ], order notifying party of opportunity to respond [ # 6380510-3 ]. Certificate of service dated 11/23/2020. [20-2014] (LAD) [Entered: 11/23/2020 07:35 PM]
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Appellate Judge: Before this court is the motion of appellant Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (" UCC " or " appellant ") to expedite briefing and argument on its appeal from the Title III court's orders (1) denying without prejudice the urgent motion of the UCC to lift stay to allow it to pursue objection to general obligation bond claims and (2) denying the UCC's motion for reconsideration. Upon review of the record, it appears that this court may not have jurisdiction to consider this appeal as the orders being challenged may not be appealable pursuant to 48 U.S.C. 2166(e). Accordingly, the parties are directed to address the question of whether this court has jurisdiction over the appeal. Appellant shall file its response no later than November 23, 2020 ; appellees shall file their response(s) no later than December 10, 2020 . Any reply shall be filed no later than December 14, 2020 . In the interim, the motion to expedite shall be held in abeyance. [20-2014] (CMP) [Entered: 11/09/2020 02:26 PM]
November 6, 2020 NOTICE issued. After 11/20/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Cristina B. Fernandez-Niggerman for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Bradley R. Bobroff for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Lucia Chapman for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Valerie Concepcion-Cintron for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Peter D. Doyle for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Carl Forbes, Jr. for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, FOMB and Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation, Gregg M. Mashberg for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, FOMB and Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation, Michel Mir-Martinez for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Matthew J. Morris for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Scott Rutsky for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Chris Theodoridis for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, FOMB and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation, Josue N. Torres-Crespo for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Jared D. Zajac for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, FOMB and Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation, Charles Alfred Cuprill for Consejo De Salud De La Comunidad De La Playa De Ponce, Inc., Maria J. DiConza for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), Ivonne Gonzalez-Morales for Nilda Agosto Maldonado Plaintiff Group and Cruz-Hernandez Plaintiff Group, Vanessa Hernandez Rodriguez for Maria Consuelo Figueroa Torres, Michael Kelly Malone for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), Gregg M. Mashberg for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation, Daniel S. Shamah for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) and Hadassa Waxman for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority. [20-2014] (CMP) [Entered: 11/06/2020 05:16 PM]
October 29, 2020 REPLY filed by Appellant Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to response [ # 6377776-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 10/29/2020. [20-2014] (LAD) [Entered: 10/29/2020 01:27 PM]
October 28, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney Lucas Kowalczyk. Certificate of service dated 10/28/2020. [20-2014] (LK) [Entered: 10/28/2020 12:18 PM]
October 28, 2020 RESPONSE filed by Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority to motion [ # 6376114-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 10/28/2020. [20-2014] (TWM) [Entered: 10/28/2020 04:47 PM]
October 28, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellees Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, FOMB and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority. [20-2014] (CMP) [Entered: 10/29/2020 11:54 AM]
October 28, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney Brian S. Rosen. Certificate of service dated 10/28/2020. [20-2014] (BSR) [Entered: 10/28/2020 11:58 AM]
October 28, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney Mark D. Harris. Certificate of service dated 10/28/2020. [20-2014] (MDH) [Entered: 10/28/2020 11:54 AM]
October 28, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney John E. Roberts. Certificate of service dated 10/28/2020. [20-2014] (JER) [Entered: 10/28/2020 11:48 AM]
October 28, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney Timothy W. Mungovan. Certificate of service dated 10/28/2020. [20-2014] (TWM) [Entered: 10/28/2020 11:40 AM]
October 28, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney Martin J. Bienenstock. Certificate of service dated 10/28/2020. [20-2014] (MJB) [Entered: 10/28/2020 11:51 AM]
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Jeffrey R. Howard, Chief Appellate Judge: The Motion of Appellant Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to Shorten the Briefing Time and to Expedite Consideration of its Contemporaneously Filed Motion to Expedite the Appeal is resolved as follows: appellee shall file a response to the UCC's Motion to Expedite Briefing and Argument on or before 5 p.m. on October 28, 2020 . The Committee may file any reply on or before 5 p.m. on October 30, 2020 . [20-2014] (CMP) [Entered: 10/23/2020 04:17 PM]
October 21, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellant Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Certificate of service dated 10/21/2020. [20-2014] (LAD) [Entered: 10/21/2020 08:37 PM]
October 21, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors filed by Attorney Luc A. Despins. Certificate of service dated 10/21/2020. [20-2014] (LAD) [Entered: 10/21/2020 08:34 PM]
October 21, 2020 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 10/21/2020. [20-2014] (LAD) [Entered: 10/21/2020 08:39 PM]
October 21, 2020 Motion to Shorten the Briefing Time and to Expedite Consideration of Its Contemporaneously filed Motion to Expedite the Appeal filed by Appellant Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Certificate of service dated 10/21/2020. [20-2014]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (LAD) [Entered: 10/21/2020 08:51 PM]
October 21, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #14590) filed by Appellant Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Docketing Statement due 11/04/2020. Transcript Report/Order form due 11/04/2020. Appearance form due 11/04/2020. [20-2014] (CMP) [Entered: 10/21/2020 06:04 PM]
October 21, 2020 MOTION to expedite briefing and argument filed by Appellant Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Certificate of service dated 10/21/2020. [20-2014]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (LAD) [Entered: 10/21/2020 08:45 PM]
October 21, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Certificate of service dated 10/21/2020. [20-2014] (LAD) [Entered: 10/21/2020 08:41 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Official Comm. of Unsecured Creditors v. FOMB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: PUERTO RICO HIGHWAYS AND TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Daniel Jose Perez-Refojos
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Ricardo Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Kevin J. Perra
Represented By: Raul Castellanos-Malave
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Steven O. Weise
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Lucas Kowalczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: PUERTO RICO PUBLIC BUILDINGS AUTHORITY
Represented By: Daniel Jose Perez-Refojos
Represented By: Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: PUERTO RICO ELECTRIC POWER AUTHORITY (PREPA)
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Hadassa Waxman
Represented By: Carl Forbes Jr.
Represented By: Arturo Diaz-Angueira
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Daniel S. Shamah
Represented By: Michael Kelly Malone
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Katiuska Bolanos-Lugo
Represented By: Jared D. Zajac
Represented By: Maria J. DiConza
Represented By: Joseph P. Davis III
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE GOVERNMENT OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Rachel Ehrlich Albanese
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Maja Zerjal
Represented By: Jose Alberto Sosa-Llorens
Represented By: Richard A. Chesley
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Chantel L. Febus
Represented By: Luis Francisco Del-Valle-Emmanuelli
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Stephen L. Ratner
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Steven O. Weise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: PUERTO RICO SALES TAX FINANCING CORPORATION, Depository Trust Company, a/k/a Cofina
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Carl Forbes Jr.
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Ricardo Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Represented By: Jared D. Zajac
Represented By: Chris Theodoridis
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Chantel L. Febus
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Kevin J. Perra
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: ARACELIS NAZARIO TORRES
Represented By: Carlos Alberto Ruiz Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: CRUZ-HERNANDEZ PLAINTIFF GROUP
Represented By: Ivonne Gonzalez-Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: NILDA AGOSTO MALDONADO PLAINTIFF GROUP
Represented By: Ivonne Gonzalez-Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: MARIA CONSUELO FIGUEROA TORRES
Represented By: Vanessa Hernandez Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: CONSEJO DE SALUD DE LA COMUNIDAD DE LA PLAYA DE PONCE, INC.
Represented By: Charles Alfred Cuprill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ-ARRIBAS
Represented By: Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: US TRUSTEE-REGION 21
Represented By: Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY
Represented By: Nancy A. Mitchell
Represented By: Carolina Velaz-Rivero
Represented By: John J. Rapisardi
Represented By: Elizabeth Lemond McKeen
Represented By: Ashley M. Pavel
Represented By: Luis C. Marini-Biaggi
Represented By: Suzzanne Uhland
Represented By: Peter M. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor / appellee: COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Peter D. Doyle
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg
Represented By: Jennifer L. Roche
Represented By: Ginger D. Anders
Represented By: Susana I. Penagaricano Brown
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Carl Forbes Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Hackett
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Daniel Jose Perez-Refojos
Represented By: Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera
Represented By: Lucia Chapman
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Laura E. Stafford
Represented By: Adele M. El-Khouri
Represented By: Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
Represented By: Matthew J. Morris
Represented By: Valerie Concepcion-Cintron
Represented By: Michael Luskin
Represented By: Chad Golder
Represented By: Margaret Antinori Dale
Represented By: Rachel G. Miller Ziegler
Represented By: Ricardo Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Stephan E. Hornung
Represented By: Scott Rutsky
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Jared D. Zajac
Represented By: Julia D. Alonzo
Represented By: Josue N. Torres-Crespo
Represented By: Paul V. Possinger
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Michael A. Firestein
Represented By: Juan Carlos Ramirez-Ortiz
Represented By: Chris Theodoridis
Represented By: Michel Mir-Martinez
Represented By: Lary Alan Rappaport
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Bradley R. Bobroff
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Stephen L. Ratner
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Kevin J. Perra
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Steven O. Weise
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Represented By: Lucas Kowalczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor / appellee: FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD
Represented By: Peter D. Doyle
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg
Represented By: Jennifer L. Roche
Represented By: Ginger D. Anders
Represented By: Susana I. Penagaricano Brown
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Carl Forbes Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Hackett
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Daniel Jose Perez-Refojos
Represented By: Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera
Represented By: Lucia Chapman
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Laura E. Stafford
Represented By: Adele M. El-Khouri
Represented By: Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
Represented By: Matthew J. Morris
Represented By: Maja Zerjal
Represented By: Valerie Concepcion-Cintron
Represented By: Michael Luskin
Represented By: Chad Golder
Represented By: Margaret Antinori Dale
Represented By: Rachel G. Miller Ziegler
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Represented By: Ricardo Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Stephan E. Hornung
Represented By: Scott Rutsky
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Philip Abelson
Represented By: Jared D. Zajac
Represented By: Julia D. Alonzo
Represented By: Josue N. Torres-Crespo
Represented By: Paul V. Possinger
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Michael A. Firestein
Represented By: Juan Carlos Ramirez-Ortiz
Represented By: Chris Theodoridis
Represented By: Michel Mir-Martinez
Represented By: Lary Alan Rappaport
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Bradley R. Bobroff
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Stephen L. Ratner
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Kevin J. Perra
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Steven O. Weise
Represented By: Lucas Kowalczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PV PROPERTIES, INC.
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMBAC ASSURANCE CORPORATION
Represented By: Reedy Swanson
Represented By: Mitchell Reich
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Represented By: Jonathan Ohring
Represented By: Dennis F. Dunne
Represented By: Grant R. Mainland
Represented By: Neal Kumar Katyal
Represented By: John Joseph Hughes III
Represented By: Atara Miller
Represented By: Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes
Represented By: Sonia E. Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PUERTO RICO MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CAMARA DE MERCADEO, INDUSTRIA Y DISTRIBUCION DE ALIMENTOS
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASOCIACION DE CONTRATISTAS DE ENERGIA RENOVABLE DE PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASOCIACION DE RESTAURANTES DE PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CENTRO UNIDO DE DETALLISTAS
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: YOLANDA I. CORREA FONSECA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APEX GENERAL CONTRACTORS, LLC
Represented By: Luis E. Pabon-Roca
Represented By: Clarisa I. Sola-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS
Represented By: Israel Fernandez-Rodriguez
Represented By: Reedy Swanson
Represented By: Mitchell Reich
Represented By: Nicholas A. Bassett
Represented By: Georg Alexander Bongartz
Represented By: Luc A. Despins
Represented By: Cristina B. Fernandez-Niggerman
Represented By: Juan Carlos Nieves-Gonzalez
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?