Warner v. Spaulding, et al
Defendant / Appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, BERHAM YEH, STEPHEN SPAULDING, Warden, FMC Devens, BERHAN YEH and JEFFREY ROSEN, Acting Attorney General
Plaintiff / Appellant: LUKE JOSEPH WARNER
Case Number: 20-2097
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2020 Public docket note: Jeffrey Rosen was named Acting Attorney General of the United States as of December 24, 2020. We have substituted him for William P. Barr, as the appellee. See Fed. R. App. P. 43(c)(2). [20-2097] (GB) [Entered: 12/31/2020 03:43 PM]
December 21, 2020 MOTION to treat previously filed motions filed in case nos. 20-1754, 20-1755 and 20-1765 as filed in this instant appeal: motion to waive fee; motion for appointment of counsel; declaration in support of motion for appointment of counsel; memorandum in support of motion for appointment of counsel; appellant's brief; motion to file exhibits A, B and C to appellant's brief under seal; exhibits A, B and C to appellant's brief (provisionally filed under seal) , filed by Appellant Luke Joseph Warner. Certificate of service dated 12/16/2020. [20-2097]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (GB) [Entered: 12/21/2020 04:49 PM]
December 9, 2020 RESPONSE filed by Appellant Luke Joseph Warner to the court's order dated November 25, 2020 [ # 6384333-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 12/04/2020. [20-2097] (GB) [Entered: 12/09/2020 01:54 PM]
December 4, 2020 PLRA LETTER issued. IFP was granted in district court. PLRA forms sent. PLRA response due 12/18/2020. [20-2097] (GB) [Entered: 12/04/2020 12:49 PM]
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER to Show Cause entered. It is hereby ordered that appellant either move for voluntary dismissal under Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) or show cause, in writing, why this appeal should not be dismissed. The failure to take either action by December 9, 2020 will lead to dismissal of the appeal for lack of diligent prosecution. [20-2097] (GB) [Entered: 11/25/2020 02:58 PM]
November 18, 2020 Courtesy Copy of notice of appeal filed by Appellant Luke Joseph Warner. Certificate of service dated 11/12/2020. [20-2097] (GB) [Entered: 12/22/2020 01:48 PM]
November 18, 2020 PLEADING tendered: Exhibits A, B and C to appellant's brief (provisionally filed under seal) filed by Appellant Luke Joseph Warner. Certificate of service dated 10/27/2020. [20-2097] (GB) [Entered: 12/07/2020 01:46 PM]
November 18, 2020 MOTION to file exhibits A, B and C to appellant's brief under seal filed by Appellant Luke Joseph Warner. Certificate of service dated 10/27/2020. [20-2097] (GB) [Entered: 12/07/2020 01:43 PM]
November 18, 2020 PLEADING tendered: Appellant's Brief filed by Appellant Luke Joseph Warner. Certificate of service dated 10/27/2020. [20-2097] (GB) [Entered: 12/07/2020 01:41 PM]
November 18, 2020 MEMORANDUM in support of motion for appointment of counsel [ # 6386480-2 ] filed by Appellant Luke Joseph Warner. Certificate of service dated 10/27/2020. [20-2097] (GB) [Entered: 12/07/2020 01:38 PM]
November 18, 2020 DECLARATION in support of motion for appointment of counsel [ # 6386480-2 ] filed by Appellant Luke Joseph Warner. Certificate of service dated 10/27/2020. [20-2097] (GB) [Entered: 12/07/2020 01:36 PM]
November 18, 2020 MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Luke Joseph Warner. Certificate of service dated 10/27/2020. [20-2097] (GB) [Entered: 12/07/2020 01:31 PM]
November 18, 2020 MOTION to waive filing fees and IFP PLRA forms filed by Appellant Luke Joseph Warner. Certificate of service dated 10/27/2020. [20-2097] (GB) [Entered: 12/07/2020 01:29 PM]
November 18, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #83) filed by Appellant Luke Joseph Warner. Fee due 12/02/2020 . [20-2097] (GB) [Entered: 11/18/2020 08:01 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Warner v. Spaulding, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Represented By: Jason C. Weida
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BERHAM YEH
Represented By: Jason C. Weida
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHEN SPAULDING, Warden, FMC Devens
Represented By: Jason C. Weida
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BERHAN YEH
Represented By: Jason C. Weida
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY ROSEN, Acting Attorney General
Represented By: Jason C. Weida
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LUKE JOSEPH WARNER
Represented By: Luke Joseph Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?