US v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Defendant: LORENZO GONZALEZ-FELICIANO, Secretary, Department of Health, JOSE DE-LEON, Director, Mental Retardation Program and WANDA VAZQUEZ-GARCED, Governor of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Interested Party: BEATRIZ VILA-CABASSA, ALBERTO ORTIZ-RIVERA, on behalf of brother's home, CARMELO RODRIGUEZ, Second Assistant to the JCC- Dr. Sylvia Fernndez, PARENTS, RELATIVES AND FRIENDS OF THE INSTITUTO PSICOPEDAGOGICO DE PUERTO RICO, ANA DELIA MADERA-ARROYO, on behalf of her daugther Ana Elly S., PR DEPT OF JUSTICE, PROVEEDORES HOGARES COMUNITARIOS Y HOGARES SUSTITUTOS DE LA DIVISION DE SERVICIOS A LA POBLACION CON DE RETARDO MENTAL DEL DEPARTAMENTO DE SALUD, DIANA M. ALCARAZ IRIZARRY, Special Investigator and Auditor, ALFREDO ANTONIO CASTELLANOS BAYOUTH, JCC, ASOCIACION DE PADRES DEL CENTRO DE DESARROLLO HABILITATIVO DE CAYEY, BAYAMON, PONCE, AIBONITO, AND OTHERS, MARIVETTE GONZALEZ-ANTONMARCHI, on behalf of brother's home, JAVIER ACEVES, MD, JCC, C.S., (female), FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD, Oversight Board, JOHN J. MCGEE, Ph. D., VITERTO ROJAS-AGUEDA, JUAN AYALA-TANON, MARGARITA LUISA MERCADO-ECHEGARAY, Chief Legal Counsel to the Monitor (JCC), A.H., MARIA D. LONDONO, INSTITUTO PSICOPEDAGOGICO, JAVIER B. GONZALEZ, Executive Director on behalf of the Office of the Joint Compliance Coordinator (JCC), FUNDACION MODESTO GOTAY, SYLVIA M. FERNANDEZ-COLORADO, PARENTS, RELATIVES AND FRIENDS OF MENTALLY RETARDED POPULATION- FUNDACION MODESTO GOTAY and CONCEPCION TORRES
Defendant / Appellant: COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES
Case Number: 20-2115
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER entered. Upon consideration of motion, it is ordered that the time for appellee United States to file a brief be enlarged to and including March 3, 2021 . [20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115] (GB) [Entered: 01/22/2021 06:59 PM]
January 21, 2021 MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellee US in 20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115. Certificate of service dated 01/21/2021. [20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115] (YB) [Entered: 01/21/2021 05:24 PM]
January 14, 2021 NINE (9) paper copies of appellant/petitioner brief [ # 6393821-2 ] submitted by Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. [20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115] (AJ) [Entered: 01/20/2021 10:03 AM]
January 13, 2021 APPENDIX filed by Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico in 20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115. Number of copies: 5. Certificate of service dated 01/05/2021. [20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115] (AVN) [Entered: 01/13/2021 02:40 PM]
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER entered. In light of the appendix tendered on January 5, 2021 is in its compliance, appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico's motion for leave to file joint appendix in paper copies only filed on January 4, 2021 is moot. Appellant's tendered appendix is accepted for filing on this date. Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico's January 8, 2021 motion to file a supplemental appendix under seal will be addressed in due course. [20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115] (GB) [Entered: 01/13/2021 02:26 PM]
January 11, 2021 APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico in 20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115. Certificate of service dated 12/31/2020. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 01/19/2021 . Brief due 02/01/2021 for APPELLEE United States. [20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115] (LIM) [Entered: 01/11/2021 09:32 AM]
January 8, 2021 MOTION to file supplemental appendix under seal filed by Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico in 20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115. Certificate of service dated 01/07/2021. [20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115] (GB) [Entered: 01/11/2021 03:13 PM]
January 5, 2021 APPENDIX tendered by Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico in 20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115. Certificate of service dated 12/31/2020. [20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115] (IT) [Entered: 01/05/2021 01:22 PM]
January 4, 2021 PLEADING tendered: FIVE (5) Paper copies of sealed supplemental appendix filed provisionally under seal filed by Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico in 20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2021. [20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115] (LIM) [Entered: 01/06/2021 10:10 AM]
January 4, 2021 MOTION for leave to file joint appendix and sealed appendix in paper copies only filed by Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico in 20-1556, 20-2115, 20-1805. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2021. [20-1556, 20-2115, 20-1805] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (IT) [Entered: 01/04/2021 05:08 PM]
January 4, 2021 PLEADING tendered: FIVE (5) paper copies of appendix (Volumes: 3) filed by Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. [20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115] (ATC) [Entered: 01/04/2021 10:59 AM]
December 31, 2020 BRIEF tendered by Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico in 20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115. [20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115] (IT) [Entered: 12/31/2020 02:21 PM]
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Jeffrey R. Howard, Chief Appellate Judge. Defendant-appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico's third motion for leave to file an oversized consolidated brief, containing up to 26,000 words is granted. [20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115] (GB) [Entered: 12/31/2020 09:25 AM]
December 29, 2020 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Javier T. Burgos for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Esther Crespin Credi for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Wanda Vazquez-Garced, Lorenzo Gonzalez-Feliciano and Jose De-Leon, Patricia Lorenzi for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Wanda Vazquez-Garced, Lorenzo Gonzalez-Feliciano and Jose De-Leon, Richard J. Farano for US, Diana M. Alcaraz Irizarry for Diana M. Alcaraz Irizarry, Salvador M. Carrion-Fonesca for Alfredo Antonio Castellanos Bayouth, Esther Crespin Credi for Wanda Vazquez-Garced, Lorenzo Gonzalez-Feliciano and Jose De-Leon, Federico Hernandez-Denton for Javier Aceves, MD and Carmelo Rodriguez, Patricia Lorenzi for Wanda Vazquez-Garced, Lorenzo Gonzalez-Feliciano and Jose De-Leon and Hector F. Oliveras-Delgado for Instituto Psicopedagogico. [20-2115] (GB) [Entered: 12/29/2020 08:03 AM]
December 15, 2020 CORRECTED RESPONSE filed by Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico in 20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115 to order [ # 6385585-2 ], order [ # 6385585-3 ]. Certificate of service dated 12/15/2020. [20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (IT) [Entered: 12/15/2020 08:31 AM]
December 14, 2020 MOTION for leave to file oversized Opening Brief filed by Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico in 20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115. Certificate of service dated 12/14/2020. [20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115] (IT) [Entered: 12/14/2020 07:17 PM]
December 14, 2020 RESPONSE filed by Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico in 20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115 to order [ # 6385585-2 ], order to consolidate cases [ # 6385585-3 ]. Certificate of service dated 12/14/2020. [20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115] (IT) [Entered: 12/14/2020 07:02 PM]
December 14, 2020 NOTICE issued. After 12/28/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Javier T. Burgos for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Esther Crespin Credi for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Wanda Vazquez-Garced, Lorenzo Gonzalez-Feliciano and Jose De-Leon, Patricia Lorenzi for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Wanda Vazquez-Garced, Lorenzo Gonzalez-Feliciano and Jose De-Leon, Richard J. Farano for US, Diana M. Alcaraz Irizarry for Diana M. Alcaraz Irizarry, Salvador M. Carrion-Fonesca for Alfredo Antonio Castellanos Bayouth, Esther Crespin Credi for Wanda Vazquez-Garced, Lorenzo Gonzalez-Feliciano and Jose De-Leon, Federico Hernandez-Denton for Javier Aceves, MD and Carmelo Rodriguez, Patricia Lorenzi for Wanda Vazquez-Garced, Lorenzo Gonzalez-Feliciano and Jose De-Leon and Hector F. Oliveras-Delgado for Instituto Psicopedagogico. [20-2115] (GB) [Entered: 12/13/2020 09:35 AM]
December 10, 2020 SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: Fee paid in the District Court. [20-2115] (DPO) [Entered: 12/10/2020 01:16 PM]
December 9, 2020 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 12/09/2020. [20-2115] (AJG) [Entered: 12/09/2020 10:20 PM]
December 9, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Certificate of service dated 12/09/2020. [20-2115] (AJG) [Entered: 12/09/2020 10:18 PM]
December 8, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Lizzie M. Portela. Certificate of service dated 12/08/2020. [20-2115] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional cases 20-1556, 20-1805. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (LMP) [Entered: 12/08/2020 03:41 PM]
December 8, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Hector M. Laffitte. Certificate of service dated 12/08/2020. [20-2115] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional cases 20-1556, 20-1805. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (HML) [Entered: 12/08/2020 01:42 PM]
December 8, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Arturo J. Garcia-Sola. Certificate of service dated 12/08/2020. [20-2115] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional cases 20-1556, 20-1805. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (AJG) [Entered: 12/08/2020 01:36 PM]
December 8, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Isabel Torres-Sastre. Certificate of service dated 12/08/2020. [20-2115] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional cases 20-1556, 20-1805. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (IT) [Entered: 12/08/2020 01:33 PM]
December 8, 2020 Filing fee was paid in the district court by Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico on 12/04/2020. [20-1805, 20-2115]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (GAK) [Entered: 12/08/2020 12:12 PM]
December 8, 2020 NOTICE Regarding Payment of Filing Fees filed by Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico in 20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115. Certificate of service dated 12/08/2020. [20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115] (IT) [Entered: 12/08/2020 10:58 AM]
December 3, 2020 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 01/04/2021 for appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115] (GB) [Entered: 12/03/2020 07:33 AM]
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER entered. Upon consideration of Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico's motion and upon review of the record in this case, Appeal Nos. 20-1556 and 20-1805 are hereby consolidated with Appeal No. 20-2115 for briefing and oral argument. The briefing schedule in 20-1556 and 20-1805 is hereby vacated. Whereas it appears that transcripts have already been ordered and prepared in the district court, the clerk will issue a consolidated briefing schedule with appellant's consolidated brief due within thirty days of this order. Appellant shall advise the court by December 11, 2020 if additional transcripts are required in advance of briefing. [20-1556, 20-1805, 20-2115] (GB) [Entered: 12/03/2020 07:25 AM]
December 1, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee US filed by Attorney Erin H. Flynn. Certificate of service dated 12/01/2020. [20-2115] (EHF) [Entered: 12/01/2020 09:59 AM]
December 1, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee US filed by Attorney Yael Bortnick. Certificate of service dated 12/01/2020. [20-2115] (YB) [Entered: 12/01/2020 09:53 AM]
November 27, 2020 Public docket note: Wanda Vazquez-Garced is now the Governor of Puerto Rico, and Lorenzo Gonzalez-Feliciano is now the Secretary of the Puerto Rico Department of Public Health. We have substituted them for Pedro Rossello-Gonzalez and Carmen Feliciano-de Melecio, respectively, as defendants. See Fed. R. App. P. 43(c)(2). [20-2115] (GB) [Entered: 11/27/2020 10:13 AM]
November 24, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #3141) filed by Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Fee due 12/11/2020 . Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript Report/Order form due 12/11/2020 . [20-2115] (GB) [Entered: 11/27/2020 09:53 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: US v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: BEATRIZ VILA-CABASSA
Represented By: Ramon Luis Vinas-Bueso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ALBERTO ORTIZ-RIVERA, on behalf of brother's home
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CARMELO RODRIGUEZ, Second Assistant to the JCC- Dr. Sylvia Fernndez
Represented By: Federico Hernandez-Denton
Represented By: Alfredo Antonio Castellanos Bayouth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PARENTS, RELATIVES AND FRIENDS OF THE INSTITUTO PSICOPEDAGOGICO DE PUERTO RICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ANA DELIA MADERA-ARROYO, on behalf of her daugther Ana Elly S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PR DEPT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Beatriz Annexy-Guevara
Represented By: Joseph Gabriel Feldstein-Del Valle
Represented By: Carlos Antonio Del Valle Cruz
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose A. Figueroa-Santaella
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PROVEEDORES HOGARES COMUNITARIOS Y HOGARES SUSTITUTOS DE LA DIVISION DE SERVICIOS A LA POBLACION CON DE RETARDO MENTAL DEL DEPARTAMENTO DE SALUD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DIANA M. ALCARAZ IRIZARRY, Special Investigator and Auditor
Represented By: Diana M. Alcaraz Irizarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ALFREDO ANTONIO CASTELLANOS BAYOUTH, JCC
Represented By: Alfredo Antonio Castellanos Bayouth
Represented By: Margarita Luisa Mercado-Echegaray
Represented By: Salvador M. Carrion-Fonesca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASOCIACION DE PADRES DEL CENTRO DE DESARROLLO HABILITATIVO DE CAYEY, BAYAMON, PONCE, AIBONITO, AND OTHERS
Represented By: Asociacion de Padres del Centro de Desarrollo Habilitativo de Cayey, Bayamon, Ponce, Aibonito, and others
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MARIVETTE GONZALEZ-ANTONMARCHI, on behalf of brother's home
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JAVIER ACEVES, MD, JCC
Represented By: Federico Hernandez-Denton
Represented By: Alfredo Antonio Castellanos Bayouth
Represented By: Javier Aceves MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: C.S., (female)
Represented By: Miguel Oppenheimer
Represented By: Mariela Maestre Cordero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD, Oversight Board
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JOHN J. MCGEE, Ph. D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: VITERTO ROJAS-AGUEDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JUAN AYALA-TANON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MARGARITA LUISA MERCADO-ECHEGARAY, Chief Legal Counsel to the Monitor (JCC)
Represented By: Margarita Luisa Mercado-Echegaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: A.H.
Represented By: Manuel San Juan DeMartino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MARIA D. LONDONO
Represented By: Maria D. Londono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: INSTITUTO PSICOPEDAGOGICO
Represented By: Michelle Pirallo-Di Cristina
Represented By: Hector F. Oliveras-Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JAVIER B. GONZALEZ, Executive Director on behalf of the Office of the Joint Compliance Coordinator (JCC)
Represented By: Alfredo Antonio Castellanos Bayouth
Represented By: Margarita Luisa Mercado-Echegaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FUNDACION MODESTO GOTAY
Represented By: Jose Raul Cancio-Bigas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SYLVIA M. FERNANDEZ-COLORADO
Represented By: Sylvia M. Fernandez-Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PARENTS, RELATIVES AND FRIENDS OF MENTALLY RETARDED POPULATION- FUNDACION MODESTO GOTAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CONCEPCION TORRES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORENZO GONZALEZ-FELICIANO, Secretary, Department of Health
Represented By: Luis A. Rodriguez-Munoz
Represented By: Beatriz Annexy-Guevara
Represented By: Eduardo A. Vera-Ramirez
Represented By: Esther Crespin Credi
Represented By: Carlos Antonio Del Valle Cruz
Represented By: Patricia Lorenzi
Represented By: Charles S. Fax
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose A. Figueroa-Santaella
Represented By: Eileen Landron-Guardiola
Represented By: Arlene R. Perez-Borrero
Represented By: Leila Sofia Castro-Moya
Represented By: Harry Brugman-Mercado
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Michelle Davila-Montalvo
Represented By: Maria Judith Surillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSE DE-LEON, Director, Mental Retardation Program
Represented By: Luis A. Rodriguez-Munoz
Represented By: Beatriz Annexy-Guevara
Represented By: Eduardo A. Vera-Ramirez
Represented By: Esther Crespin Credi
Represented By: Carlos Antonio Del Valle Cruz
Represented By: Patricia Lorenzi
Represented By: Charles S. Fax
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose A. Figueroa-Santaella
Represented By: Eileen Landron-Guardiola
Represented By: Arlene R. Perez-Borrero
Represented By: Barron L. Stroud
Represented By: Leila Sofia Castro-Moya
Represented By: Harry Brugman-Mercado
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Michelle Davila-Montalvo
Represented By: Maria Judith Surillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WANDA VAZQUEZ-GARCED, Governor of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Luis A. Rodriguez-Munoz
Represented By: Beatriz Annexy-Guevara
Represented By: Eduardo A. Vera-Ramirez
Represented By: Esther Crespin Credi
Represented By: Carlos Antonio Del Valle Cruz
Represented By: Patricia Lorenzi
Represented By: Charles S. Fax
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Jose A. Figueroa-Santaella
Represented By: Eileen Landron-Guardiola
Represented By: Arlene R. Perez-Borrero
Represented By: Barron L. Stroud
Represented By: Leila Sofia Castro-Moya
Represented By: Harry Brugman-Mercado
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Michelle Davila-Montalvo
Represented By: Maria Judith Surillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Luis A. Rodriguez-Munoz
Represented By: Sonia Margarita Lopez Del Valle-Carrera
Represented By: Esther Crespin Credi
Represented By: Arturo J. Garcia-Sola
Represented By: Ineabelle Santiago-Camacho
Represented By: Patricia Lorenzi
Represented By: Javier T. Burgos
Represented By: Eileen Landron-Guardiola
Represented By: Lizzie M. Portela
Represented By: Hector M. Laffitte
Represented By: Isabel Torres-Sastre
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Yael Bortnick
Represented By: Erin Helene Flynn
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Richard J. Farano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?