Marinkovic v. Osborne, et al
Defendant / Appellee: MICHAEL OSBORNE, CREDIT ADJUSTMENTS, INC., LISA BLOOMFIELD and JASON OSBORNE
Plaintiff / Appellant: MELVIN M. MARINKOVIC
Case Number: 20-2141
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant Melvin M. Marinkovic. Brief due March 1, 2021 for appellant Melvin M. Marinkovic. [20-2141] (AL) [Entered: 02/05/2021 02:52 PM]
January 29, 2021 MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant Melvin M. Marinkovic. Certificate of service was not included. [20-2141] (AL) [Entered: 01/29/2021 04:24 PM]
December 21, 2020 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 02/01/2021 for appellant Melvin M. Marinkovic. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-2141] (AL) [Entered: 12/21/2020 01:00 PM]
December 8, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #15) filed by Appellant Melvin M. Marinkovic. [20-2141] (AL) [Entered: 12/08/2020 05:09 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Marinkovic v. Osborne, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL OSBORNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CREDIT ADJUSTMENTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LISA BLOOMFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JASON OSBORNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MELVIN M. MARINKOVIC
Represented By: Melvin M. Marinkovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?