Vertullo v. U.S. Bank National Association
Trustee: US TRUSTEE and LAWRENCE P. SUMSKI
Appellee: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as Trustee for Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., CSFB MortgageBacked PassThrough Certificates, Series 20058 and U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as Trustee for Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., CSFB Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-8
Appellant: DARLENE MARIE VERTULLO, a/k/a Darlene M. Marie Underwood
Case Number: 20-9004
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 NOTICE issued. After 05/11/2020, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Joshua Ryan for U.S. Bank National Association. [20-9004] (AL) [Entered: 03/27/2020 05:24 PM]
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Construing Attorney David M. Bizar's and Attorney J. Patrick Kennedy's requests for removal from service list as motions to withdraw as counsel for appellee U.S. Bank National Association, the requests are allowed. See 1st Cir. R. 12.0(b) ("No attorney who has entered an appearance in this court may withdraw without the consent of the court."). Attorney Bizar and Attorney Kennedy are hereby withdrawn as counsel of record in this appeal. Appellee will continue to be represented by its remaining counsel of record. [20-9004] (RMK) [Entered: 03/27/2020 05:14 PM]
March 24, 2020 MOTION for Attorney David Bizar to withdraw as counsel filed by Appellee U.S. Bank National Association. Certificate of service dated 03/24/2020. [20-9004] (DMB) [Entered: 03/24/2020 03:22 PM]
March 24, 2020 MOTION for Attorney J. Patrick Kennedy to withdraw as counsel filed by Appellee U.S. Bank National Association. Certificate of service dated 03/24/2020. [20-9004] (JPK) [Entered: 03/24/2020 03:25 PM]
March 19, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee U.S. Bank National Association filed by Attorney Kevin P. Polansky. Certificate of service dated 03/19/2020. [20-9004] (KPP) [Entered: 03/19/2020 05:33 PM]
March 6, 2020 NOTICE issued. After 03/20/2020, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Joshua Ryan for U.S. Bank National Association. [20-9004] (AL) [Entered: 03/06/2020 04:34 PM]
March 3, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Darlene Marie Vertullo. Certificate of service dated 03/03/2020. [20-9004] (LGD) [Entered: 03/03/2020 11:15 AM]
February 24, 2020 CERTIFICATE of service for notice of appearance [ # 6319282-2 ] filed by Appellant Darlene Marie Vertullo. Certificate of service dated 02/24/2020. [20-9004] (LGD) [Entered: 02/24/2020 01:14 PM]
February 24, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Darlene Marie Vertullo filed by Attorney Leonard G. Deming, II. Certificate of service dated 02/24/2020. [20-9004] (LGD) [Entered: 02/24/2020 12:08 PM]
February 21, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee U.S. Bank National Association filed by Attorney David Bizar. Certificate of service dated 02/21/2020. [20-9004] (DMB) [Entered: 02/21/2020 11:12 AM]
February 21, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee U.S. Bank National Association filed by Attorney J. Patrick Kennedy. Certificate of service dated 02/21/2020. [20-9004] (JPK) [Entered: 02/21/2020 11:16 AM]
February 20, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #42) filed by Appellant Darlene Marie Vertullo. Docketing Statement due 03/05/2020. Appearance form due 03/05/2020. [20-9004] (AL) [Entered: 02/20/2020 02:06 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Vertullo v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: US TRUSTEE
Represented By: US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: LAWRENCE P. SUMSKI
Represented By: Lawrence P. Sumski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as Trustee for Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., CSFB MortgageBacked PassThrough Certificates, Series 20058
Represented By: Richard Thomas Mulligan
Represented By: David Michael Bizar
Represented By: Joshua Ryan
Represented By: J. Patrick Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as Trustee for Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., CSFB Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-8
Represented By: Richard Thomas Mulligan
Represented By: Joshua Ryan
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Polansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DARLENE MARIE VERTULLO, a/k/a Darlene M. Marie Underwood
Represented By: Leonard G. Deming II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?