Centro de Periodismo Investigativo, Inc. v. FOMB
Defendant / Appellant: FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD, for Puerto Rico and FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD FOR PUERTO RICO, for Puerto Rico
Plaintiff / Appellee: CENTRO DE PERIODISMO INVESTIGATIVO, INC.
Interested Party: REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS
Case Number: 21-1301
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2021 BRIEF tendered by Appellee Centro de Periodismo Investigativo, Inc.. [21-1301] (JB) [Entered: 06/18/2021 03:08 PM]
June 10, 2021 NOTICE of unavailability of counsel from 07/20/2021 to 07/31/2021 filed by Attorney Judith Berkan for Appellee Centro de Periodismo Investigativo, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 06/10/2021. [21-1301] (JB) [Entered: 06/10/2021 04:55 PM]
May 21, 2021 NINE (9) paper copies of appellant/petitioner brief [ # 6423203-2 ] submitted by Appellant FOMB. [21-1301] (AVN) [Entered: 05/21/2021 12:25 PM]
May 21, 2021 FIVE (5) paper copies of appendix [ # 6423206-2 ] submitted by Appellant FOMB and Appellee Centro de Periodismo Investigativo, Inc. [21-1301] (AVN) [Entered: 05/21/2021 12:26 PM]
May 20, 2021 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellant FOMB. Certificate of service dated 05/19/2021. [21-1301] (LIM) [Entered: 05/20/2021 09:18 AM]
May 20, 2021 APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant FOMB. Certificate of service dated 05/19/2021. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 05/24/2021 . [21-1301] (LIM) [Entered: 05/20/2021 09:17 AM]
May 20, 2021 APPENDIX filed by Appellant FOMB and Appellee Centro de Periodismo Investigativo, Inc. Certificate of service dated 05/19/2021. Five paper copies of the electronically filed appendix must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 05/24/2021 [21-1301] (LIM) [Entered: 05/20/2021 09:19 AM]
May 19, 2021 BRIEF tendered by Appellant FOMB. [21-1301] (TWM) [Entered: 05/19/2021 07:45 PM]
May 19, 2021 APPENDIX tendered by Appellant FOMB and Appellee Centro de Periodismo Investigativo, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 05/19/2021. [21-1301] (TWM) [Entered: 05/19/2021 07:47 PM]
May 3, 2021 RESPONSE filed by Appellee Centro de Periodismo Investigativo, Inc. to motion to expedite [ # 6419155-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 05/03/2021. [21-1301] (JB) [Entered: 05/03/2021 07:37 AM]
May 3, 2021 REPLY in support of Appellant's motion to expedite filed by Appellant FOMB to response [ # 6419247-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 05/03/2021. [21-1301] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (TWM) [Entered: 05/03/2021 03:03 PM]
May 3, 2021 EXPEDITED briefing schedule set. Brief due 05/19/2021 for appellant Financial Oversight and Management Board. Brief due 06/18/2021 for appellee Centro de Periodismo Investigativo, Inc.. Reply brief due 07/09/2021 for appellant Financial Oversight and Management Board. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [21-1301] (ALW) [Entered: 05/03/2021 05:27 PM]
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Jeffrey R. Howard, Chief Appellate Judge. The motion of the Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico to expedite this appeal is granted. Appellant's opening brief shall be filed on May 19, 2021; appellee's response brief shall be filed on June 18, 2021; and appellant's reply brief shall be filed on July 9, 2021. Appellant's motion to stay the district court proceedings will be adjudicated in due course. [21-1301] (GAK) [Entered: 05/03/2021 05:00 PM]
April 30, 2021 MOTION to expedite this Appeal filed by Appellant FOMB. Certificate of service dated 04/30/2021. [21-1301] (TWM) [Entered: 04/30/2021 04:22 PM]
April 30, 2021 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant FOMB indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 04/30/2021. [21-1301] (TWM) [Entered: 04/30/2021 11:28 AM]
April 30, 2021 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant FOMB. Certificate of service dated 04/30/2021. [21-1301] (LFD) [Entered: 04/30/2021 11:08 AM]
April 30, 2021 NOTICE of counsel regarding the closing of operations of Berkan Mendez Law Office from July 15 to 30, 2021 filed by Appellee Centro de Periodismo Investigativo, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 04/30/2021. [21-1301] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (JB) [Entered: 04/30/2021 09:06 AM]
April 30, 2021 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant FOMB. Certificate of service dated 04/30/2021. [21-1301] (LFD) [Entered: 04/30/2021 09:56 AM]
April 21, 2021 RESPONSE to motion to stay [ # 6416556-2 ] filed by Appellee Centro de Periodismo Investigativo, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 04/21/2021. [21-1301] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (JB) [Entered: 04/21/2021 04:40 PM]
April 21, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Centro de Periodismo Investigativo, Inc. filed by Attorney Judith Berkan. Certificate of service dated 04/21/2021. [21-1301] (JB) [Entered: 04/21/2021 05:11 PM]
April 21, 2021 REPLY to response and motion to stay [ # 6416822-2 ] filed by Appellant FOMB. Certificate of service dated 04/21/2021. [21-1301] CLERK'S NOTE: Relief selection was incorrect. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (MJB) [Entered: 04/21/2021 11:16 PM]
April 20, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant FOMB filed by Attorney Adam L. Deming. Certificate of service dated 04/20/2021. [21-1301] (AD) [Entered: 04/20/2021 03:13 PM]
April 20, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant FOMB filed by Attorney Laura E. Stafford. Certificate of service dated 04/20/2021. [21-1301] (LES) [Entered: 04/20/2021 03:11 PM]
April 20, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant FOMB filed by Attorney Timothy W. Mungovan. Certificate of service dated 04/20/2021. [21-1301] (TWM) [Entered: 04/20/2021 03:07 PM]
April 20, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant FOMB filed by Attorney Guy Brenner. Certificate of service dated 04/20/2021. [21-1301] (GB) [Entered: 04/20/2021 03:16 PM]
April 20, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant FOMB filed by Attorney John E. Roberts. Certificate of service dated 04/20/2021. [21-1301] (JER) [Entered: 04/20/2021 03:09 PM]
April 20, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant FOMB filed by Attorney Joseph S. Hartunian. Certificate of service dated 04/20/2021. [21-1301] (JH) [Entered: 04/20/2021 03:32 PM]
April 20, 2021 EMERGENCY MOTION to stay - Appellant's Motion for an Emergency Stay and Stay Pending Appeal filed by Appellant FOMB. Certificate of service dated 04/20/2021. [21-1301] (MJB) [Entered: 04/20/2021 08:03 PM]
April 20, 2021 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #134 ) filed by Appellant FOMB. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 05/04/2021. [21-1301] (ALW) [Entered: 04/20/2021 02:47 PM]
April 20, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant FOMB filed by Attorney Mark D. Harris. Certificate of service dated 04/20/2021. [21-1301] (MDH) [Entered: 04/20/2021 03:20 PM]
April 20, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant FOMB filed by Attorney Martin J. Bienenstock. Certificate of service dated 04/20/2021. [21-1301] (MJB) [Entered: 04/20/2021 03:18 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Centro de Periodismo Investigativo, Inc. v. FOMB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD, for Puerto Rico
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Paul V. Possinger
Represented By: Adam Deming
Represented By: Joseph Hartunian
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Kevin J. Perra
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Represented By: Ricardo Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Laura E. Stafford
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Luis Francisco Del-Valle-Emmanuelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD FOR PUERTO RICO, for Puerto Rico
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Paul V. Possinger
Represented By: Adam Deming
Represented By: Joseph Hartunian
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Kevin J. Perra
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Represented By: Ricardo Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Laura E. Stafford
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Luis Francisco Del-Valle-Emmanuelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CENTRO DE PERIODISMO INVESTIGATIVO, INC.
Represented By: Rafael Enrique Rodriguez Rivera
Represented By: Steven P. Lausell-Recurt
Represented By: Judith Berkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS
Represented By: Tomas A. Roman-Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?