Silva v. Smith, et al
Defendant / Appellee: C. J. WYATT, in is Individual and Official Capacity as a U.S. Marshal Supervisor, JOHN F. MCBURNEY, III, in his Individual and Official Capacity as a RI State Magistrate Judge, US MARSHALS DANGEROUS FUGITIVES TASK FORCE, in their Individual and Official Capacity, WILLIAM E. SMITH, in his Individual and Official Capacity as a Federal Judge and C. J. WYATT, in his Individual and Official Capacity as a U.S. Marshal Supervisor
Plaintiff / Appellant: GERALD J. SILVA
Case Number: 21-1320
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 PLRA LETTER issued. IFP was granted in district court. PLRA forms sent. PLRA response due 06/29/2021 . [21-1320] (GB) [Entered: 06/15/2021 12:43 PM]
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER to Show Cause entered directing appellant Gerald J. Silva to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Appellant is ordered to either: (i) move for voluntary dismissal of this appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b); or (ii) show cause, in writing, no later than June 29, 2021 , why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The failure to take either action will lead to the dismissal of this appeal for lack of diligent prosecution. [21-1320] (GB) [Entered: 06/15/2021 12:18 PM]
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER entered. Upon consideration, the motion to withdraw Attorney Lauren S. Zurier as counsel for Appellees William E. Smith, U.S. Marshals Dangerous Fugitives Task Force, and C. J. Wyatt is allowed. Attorney Zurier is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record in this appeal. Appellees William E. Smith, U.S. Marshals Dangerous Fugitives Task Force, and C. J. Wyatt will continue to be represented by their remaining counsel of record. [21-1320] (GB) [Entered: 06/04/2021 06:55 PM]
June 4, 2021 MOTION for Attorney Lauren S. Zurier to withdraw as counsel filed by Appellees William E. Smith, US Marshals Dangerous Fugitives Task Force and C. J. Wyatt. Certificate of service dated 06/04/2021. [21-1320] (LSZ) [Entered: 06/04/2021 02:56 PM]
June 4, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees William E. Smith, US Marshals Dangerous Fugitives Task Force and C. J. Wyatt filed by Attorney Kevin L. Hubbard. Certificate of service dated 06/04/2021. [21-1320] (KLH) [Entered: 06/04/2021 12:04 PM]
May 12, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees William E. Smith, US Marshals Dangerous Fugitives Task Force and C. J. Wyatt filed by Attorney Lauren S. Zurier, AUSA. Certificate of service dated 05/12/2021. [21-1320] (LSZ) [Entered: 05/12/2021 11:26 AM]
May 11, 2021 SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: No. 26, Amended Complaint. [21-1320] (GB) [Entered: 05/12/2021 10:43 AM]
April 22, 2021 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #23) filed by Appellant Gerald J. Silva. Fee due 05/06/2021 . [21-1320] (GB) [Entered: 04/22/2021 03:57 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Silva v. Smith, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. J. WYATT, in is Individual and Official Capacity as a U.S. Marshal Supervisor
Represented By: Lauren S. Zurier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN F. MCBURNEY, III, in his Individual and Official Capacity as a RI State Magistrate Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: US MARSHALS DANGEROUS FUGITIVES TASK FORCE, in their Individual and Official Capacity
Represented By: Lauren S. Zurier
Represented By: Kevin Love Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM E. SMITH, in his Individual and Official Capacity as a Federal Judge
Represented By: Lauren S. Zurier
Represented By: Kevin Love Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. J. WYATT, in his Individual and Official Capacity as a U.S. Marshal Supervisor
Represented By: Kevin Love Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GERALD J. SILVA
Represented By: Gerald J. Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?