Levine v. Grubhub Holdings Inc., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: STEPHEN LEVINE, on behalf of himself and all other similarly situated and STEPHEN LEVINE, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Defendant / Appellee: GRUBHUB HOLDINGS INC. and GRUBHUB INC.
Case Number: 22-1131
Filed: March 3, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2022 RESPONSE filed by Appellees Grubhub Holdings Inc. and Grubhub Inc. to [ # 6489633-2 ]. Served on 04/14/2022. [22-1131] (TE) [Entered: 04/14/2022 11:12 PM]
April 14, 2022 STATUS report filed by Appellant Stephen Levine. Served on 04/14/2022. [22-1131] (SEL) [Entered: 04/14/2022 12:00 PM]
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge. The motion to consolidate is denied . This denial is without prejudice to coordination or consolidation of oral argument in these matters if deemed appropriate. [22-1131] (GB) [Entered: 03/31/2022 11:10 AM]
March 17, 2022 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellees Grubhub Holdings Inc. and Grubhub Inc.. Served on 03/10/2022. [22-1131] (GB) [Entered: 03/17/2022 07:48 AM]
March 17, 2022 MOTION to consolidate cases filed by Appellant Stephen Levine. Served on 03/17/2022. [22-1131] (SEL) [Entered: 03/17/2022 10:26 AM]
March 17, 2022 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: District Court ECF No. 39 Electronic Order. [22-1131] (GB) [Entered: 03/17/2022 11:08 AM]
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER entered. This court has docketed plaintiff-appellant Stephen Levine's notice of appeal from the order of dismissal entered on January 28, 2022 in No. 1:21-cv-11742-WGY (D. Mass.) as Appeal No. 22-1131. On February 16, 2022, plaintiff filed a motion for relief (D. 34). Pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4)(B)(i), the notice of appeal does not become effective until the district court disposes of the post-judgment motion. Therefore, appellant is directed to file a status report by April 15, 2022 and at thirty day intervals thereafter, informing this court of any action taken by the district court on the post-judgment motion. Further, the appellant is directed to inform this court whether or not he intends to file a notice of appeal or amended notice of appeal from the district court's post-judgment order. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4)(B)(ii). Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal of this appeal for lack of diligent prosecution. 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Once the district court rules on the pending motion, it is directed to forward its decision to this court forthwith. [22-1131] (GB) [Entered: 03/16/2022 07:24 PM]
March 14, 2022 MOTION to allow the appeals to proceed separately and RESPONSE to appellant's MOTION to consolidate cases [6482646-2] filed by Appellees Grubhub Holdings Inc. and Grubhub Inc.. Served on 03/14/2022. [22-1131] CLERK'S NOTE: Relief selection was incomplete. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (TE) [Entered: 03/14/2022 07:08 PM]
March 11, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Grubhub Holdings Inc. and Grubhub Inc. filed by Attorney Dhananjay S. Manthripragada. Served on 03/11/2022. [22-1131] (DSM) [Entered: 03/11/2022 12:56 PM]
March 10, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Grubhub Holdings Inc. and Grubhub Inc. filed by Attorney Allison Mather. Served on 03/10/2022. [22-1131] (AM) [Entered: 03/10/2022 08:11 PM]
March 10, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Grubhub Holdings Inc. and Grubhub Inc. filed by Attorney Samuel Eckman. Served on 03/10/2022. [22-1131] (SE) [Entered: 03/10/2022 08:08 PM]
March 10, 2022 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Stephen Levine indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Served on 03/10/2022. [22-1131] (SEL) [Entered: 03/10/2022 03:20 PM]
March 10, 2022 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Stephen Levine. Served on 03/10/2022. [22-1131] (SEL) [Entered: 03/10/2022 03:20 PM]
March 10, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Stephen Levine filed by Attorney Shannon Liss-Riordan. Served on 03/10/2022. [22-1131] (SEL) [Entered: 03/10/2022 03:19 PM]
March 10, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Stephen Levine filed by Attorney Michelle Cassorla. Served on 03/10/2022. [22-1131] (MC) [Entered: 03/10/2022 03:22 PM]
March 10, 2022 MOTION to consolidate cases filed by Appellant Stephen Levine. Served on 03/10/2022. [22-1131] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS, BY 03/18/2022 . (MC) [Entered: 03/10/2022 05:00 PM]
March 10, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Grubhub Holdings Inc. and Grubhub Inc. filed by Attorney Alexander Harris. Served on 03/10/2022. [22-1131] (ANH) [Entered: 03/10/2022 08:05 PM]
March 10, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Grubhub Holdings Inc. and Grubhub Inc. filed by Attorney Blaine Evanson. Served on 03/10/2022. [22-1131] (BE) [Entered: 03/10/2022 07:35 PM]
March 10, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Grubhub Holdings Inc. and Grubhub Inc. filed by Attorney Theane Evangelis. Served on 03/10/2022. [22-1131] CLERK'S NOTE: Additional attachments must be filed separately. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (TE) [Entered: 03/10/2022 07:32 PM]
March 3, 2022 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #36) filed by Appellant Stephen Levine. Appearance form and Docketing Statement due 03/17/2022 . [22-1131] (GB) [Entered: 03/03/2022 11:54 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Levine v. Grubhub Holdings Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEPHEN LEVINE, on behalf of himself and all other similarly situated
Represented By: Michelle Cassorla
Represented By: Shannon Erika Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEPHEN LEVINE, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Michelle Cassorla
Represented By: Shannon Erika Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GRUBHUB HOLDINGS INC.
Represented By: Samuel Eckman
Represented By: Theane Evangelis
Represented By: Joshua Seth Lipshutz
Represented By: Dhananjay S. Manthripragada
Represented By: Blaine Evanson
Represented By: Alexander N. Harris
Represented By: Allison Mather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GRUBHUB INC.
Represented By: Samuel Eckman
Represented By: Theane Evangelis
Represented By: Joshua Seth Lipshutz
Represented By: Dhananjay S. Manthripragada
Represented By: Blaine Evanson
Represented By: Alexander N. Harris
Represented By: Allison Mather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?