Foss v. Eastern States Exposition
Plaintiff / Appellant: CYNTHIA FOSS, d/b/a Hunter Foss Design and CYNTHIA FOSS, d/b/a Hunter Foss Design & Interest
Defendant / Appellee: EASTERN STATES EXPOSITION
Case Number: 22-1313
Filed: May 4, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Cynthia Foss. Brief and Appendix due August 18, 2022 for appellant Cynthia Foss. [22-1313] (AL) [Entered: 06/28/2022 08:35 AM]
June 27, 2022 MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Cynthia Foss. Served on 06/27/2022. [22-1313] (AG) [Entered: 06/27/2022 12:33 PM]
June 10, 2022 NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Rory L. Stevens for Cynthia Foss. [22-1313] (AL) [Entered: 06/10/2022 05:59 PM]
May 24, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Eastern States Exposition filed by Attorney James C. Duda. Served on 05/24/2022. [22-1313] (JCD) [Entered: 05/24/2022 02:32 PM]
May 20, 2022 NOTICE issued. After 06/06/2022, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Rory L. Stevens for Cynthia Foss and James C. Duba for Eastern States Exposition. [22-1313] (AL) [Entered: 05/20/2022 05:50 PM]
May 19, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Eastern States Exposition filed by Attorney Lauren C. Ostberg. Served on 05/19/2022. [22-1313] (LCO) [Entered: 05/19/2022 03:13 PM]
May 17, 2022 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 06/27/2022 for appellant Cynthia Foss. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [22-1313] (AL) [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:24 PM]
May 16, 2022 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Cynthia Foss. Served on 05/16/2022. [22-1313] (AG) [Entered: 05/16/2022 06:20 AM]
May 16, 2022 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Cynthia Foss indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Served on 05/16/2022. [22-1313] (AG) [Entered: 05/16/2022 06:14 AM]
May 8, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Cynthia Foss filed by Attorney Andrew Grimm. Served on 05/08/2022. [22-1313] (AG) [Entered: 05/08/2022 04:48 AM]
May 8, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Cynthia Foss filed by Attorney Gregory Keenan. Served on 05/08/2022. [22-1313] (GWK) [Entered: 05/08/2022 05:05 AM]
May 4, 2022 Request to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal filed by Appellant Cynthia Foss was granted in the district court by order dated 04/26/2022. [22-1313] (AL) [Entered: 05/04/2022 04:07 PM]
May 4, 2022 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #31) filed by Appellant Cynthia Foss. Docketing Statement due 05/18/2022. Transcript Report/Order form due 05/18/2022. Appearance form due 05/18/2022. [22-1313] (AL) [Entered: 05/04/2022 04:02 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Foss v. Eastern States Exposition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CYNTHIA FOSS, d/b/a Hunter Foss Design
Represented By: Stephen J. Gordon
Represented By: Andrew Grimm
Represented By: Rory L. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CYNTHIA FOSS, d/b/a Hunter Foss Design & Interest
Represented By: Stephen J. Gordon
Represented By: Andrew Grimm
Represented By: Gregory William Keenan
Represented By: Rory L. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EASTERN STATES EXPOSITION
Represented By: James C. Duba
Represented By: Lauren C. Ostberg
Represented By: James C. Duda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?