Vega-Bonilla, et al v. Fortaleza Equity Partners I, LLC
Plaintiff: ROOSEVELT CAYMAN ASSET COMPANY II
Plaintiff / Appellee: ROOSEVELT REO PR CORP.
Defendant / Appellant: MANUEL ANGEL VEGA-BONILLA and PAMELA IVETTE PEREZ-RIVERA
Interested Party: FORTALEZA EQUITY PARTNERS I, LLC
Case Number: 22-1805
Filed: October 27, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER denying motion to dismiss case filed by Appellee Fortaleza Equity Partners I, LLC: Appellee Fortaleza Equity Partners I, LLC has filed a motion to dismiss the appeal for lack of diligent prosecution on the grounds that appellant has failed to file a brief in violation of Rule 31(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. However, a briefing schedule has not yet been set in this appeal and there is no deadline, as of yet, for appellant's brief. 1st Cir. R. 31.0 (a)(1). Accordingly, the motion is denied as premature. [22-1805] (GRC) [Entered: 12/22/2022 03:37 PM]
December 21, 2022 RESPONSE filed by Appellants Pamela Ivette Perez-Rivera and Manuel Angel Vega-Bonilla to to dismiss case [ # 6538630-2 ]. Served on 12/21/2022. [22-1805] (VS) [Entered: 12/21/2022 05:10 PM]
December 19, 2022 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Appellee Fortaleza Equity Partners I, LLC. Served on 12/19/2022. [22-1805] (VMT) [Entered: 12/19/2022 01:01 PM]
December 12, 2022 MOTION in Compliance with Order filed by Appellants Pamela Ivette Perez-Rivera and Manuel Angel Vega-Bonilla. Served on 12/12/2022. [22-1805] (VS) [Entered: 12/12/2022 12:55 PM]
December 9, 2022 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Anibal Medina-Rios for Manuel Angel Vega-Bonilla and Pamela Ivette Perez-Rivera. [22-1805] (GRC) [Entered: 12/09/2022 11:14 AM]
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER to Show Cause entered directing appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed: It is hereby ordered that defendants-appellants show cause, in writing filed by December 13, 2022, why the appeal should include challenges to the remaining orders specified in the notice of appeal. The failure to respond will result in limiting this appeal only to review of the September 15, 2022 order. [22-1805] (GRC) [Entered: 11/29/2022 11:42 AM]
November 18, 2022 NOTICE issued. After 12/02/2022, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Anibal Medina-Rios for Manuel Angel Vega-Bonilla and Pamela Ivette Perez-Rivera. [22-1805] (GRC) [Entered: 11/18/2022 02:28 PM]
November 9, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Pamela Ivette Perez-Rivera and Manuel Angel Vega-Bonilla filed by Attorney JOSEPH GIERBOLINI BONILLA. Served on 11/09/2022. [22-1805] (JFG) [Entered: 11/09/2022 07:10 AM]
November 8, 2022 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Pamela Ivette Perez-Rivera and Manuel Angel Vega-Bonilla. Served on 11/08/2022. [22-1805] (VS) [Entered: 11/08/2022 02:48 PM]
November 8, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Pamela Ivette Perez-Rivera and Manuel Angel Vega-Bonilla filed by Attorney Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo. Served on 11/08/2022. [22-1805] (VS) [Entered: 11/08/2022 02:49 PM]
November 8, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Not Party Fortaleza Equity Partners I, LLC filed by Attorney Vanessa M. Torres Quinones. Served on 11/08/2022. [22-1805] (VMT) [Entered: 11/08/2022 04:04 PM]
November 8, 2022 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Pamela Ivette Perez-Rivera and Manuel Angel Vega-Bonilla indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Served on 11/08/2022. [22-1805] (VS) [Entered: 11/08/2022 02:51 PM]
October 27, 2022 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #79) filed by Appellants Pamela Ivette Perez-Rivera and Manuel Angel Vega-Bonilla. Appearance form due 11/10/2022. Docketing Statement due 11/10/2022. Transcript Report/Order form due 11/10/2022. [22-1805]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (GRC) [Entered: 10/27/2022 04:50 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Vega-Bonilla, et al v. Fortaleza Equity Partners I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROOSEVELT REO PR CORP.
Represented By: Francisco J. Fernandez-Chiques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROOSEVELT CAYMAN ASSET COMPANY II
Represented By: Francisco J. Fernandez-Chiques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MANUEL ANGEL VEGA-BONILLA
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Anibal Medina-Rios
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PAMELA IVETTE PEREZ-RIVERA
Represented By: Joseph F. Gierbolini-Bonilla
Represented By: Anibal Medina-Rios
Represented By: Vanessa Saxton-Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FORTALEZA EQUITY PARTNERS I, LLC
Represented By: Vanessa M. Torres Quinones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?