US Bank Trust National Association v. Thomas, et al
Plaintiff: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, not in its individual capacity but solely as owner trustee for VRMTG Asset Trust and US BANK TRUST, N.A., not in its individual capacity but solely as owner trustee for VRMTG Asset Trust
Defendant / Appellee: DONNA M. THOMAS and DAVID W. THOMAS
Interested Party: INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Case Number: 22-1840
Filed: November 8, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 MOTION to stay Appeal filed by Appellant US Bank Trust, N.A.. Served on 12/21/2022. [22-1840] (RJL) [Entered: 12/21/2022 10:39 AM]
December 8, 2022 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 01/17/2023 for appellant US Bank Trust, N.A.. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [22-1840] (AL) [Entered: 12/08/2022 12:49 PM]
November 22, 2022 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant US Bank Trust, N.A. indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Served on 11/22/2022. [22-1840] (RJL) [Entered: 11/22/2022 11:43 AM]
November 22, 2022 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant US Bank Trust, N.A.. Served on 11/22/2022. [22-1840] (RJL) [Entered: 11/22/2022 11:42 AM]
November 22, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant US Bank Trust, N.A. filed by Attorney Reneau J. Longoria, Esq.. Served on 11/22/2022. [22-1840] (RJL) [Entered: 11/22/2022 11:37 AM]
November 21, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Not Party Internal Revenue Service filed by Attorney Robert J. Wille. Served on 11/21/2022. [22-1840] (RJW) [Entered: 11/21/2022 04:57 PM]
November 10, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Not Party Internal Revenue Service filed by Attorney John G. Osborn. Served on 11/10/2022. [22-1840] (JGO) [Entered: 11/10/2022 08:10 AM]
November 9, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Donna M. Thomas filed by Attorney Thomas A. Cox. Served on 11/09/2022. [22-1840] (TAC) [Entered: 11/09/2022 11:11 AM]
November 8, 2022 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #120) filed by Appellant US Bank Trust National Association. Docketing Statement due 11/23/2022. Transcript Report/Order form due 11/23/2022. Appearance form due 11/23/2022. [22-1840] (AL) [Entered: 11/09/2022 10:14 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: US Bank Trust National Association v. Thomas, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, not in its individual capacity but solely as owner trustee for VRMTG Asset Trust
Represented By: Reneau Jean Longoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: US BANK TRUST, N.A., not in its individual capacity but solely as owner trustee for VRMTG Asset Trust
Represented By: Reneau Jean Longoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.
Represented By: Reneau Jean Longoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONNA M. THOMAS
Represented By: Thomas A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID W. THOMAS
Represented By: David W. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Represented By: Julia M. Lipez
Represented By: John G. Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?