Pacia v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Plaintiff / Appellant: RICHARD A. PACIA
Defendant / Appellee: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc. Trust 2006-NC5, Mortgage Pass Through Certificates Series 2006-NC5
Case Number: 22-1953
Filed: December 13, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Richard A. Pacia. Brief and Appendix due 03/02/2023 for appellant Richard A. Pacia. [22-1953] (JAW) [Entered: 02/01/2023 10:49 AM]
January 30, 2023 MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Richard A. Pacia. Served on 01/30/2023. [22-1953] (CJA) [Entered: 01/30/2023 10:59 AM]
January 9, 2023 NOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorneys have been removed from the service list for this case: Joseph P. Murphy for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. [22-1953] (JAW) [Entered: 01/09/2023 01:08 PM]
January 5, 2023 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Joseph P. Murphy for Appellee Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Certificate of service was not included. [22-1953] (JAW) [Entered: 01/09/2023 12:48 PM]
December 30, 2022 NOTICE issued. After 01/13/2023, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Joseph P. Murphy for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. [22-1953] (JAW) [Entered: 12/30/2022 05:04 PM]
December 27, 2022 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Richard A. Pacia. Served on 12/27/2022. [22-1953] (CJA) [Entered: 12/27/2022 12:47 PM]
December 27, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Richard A. Pacia filed by Attorney Corey J. Allard, Esq.. Served on 12/27/2022. [22-1953] (CJA) [Entered: 12/27/2022 12:47 PM]
December 19, 2022 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 01/30/2023 for appellant Richard A. Pacia. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [22-1953] (JAW) [Entered: 12/19/2022 06:58 PM]
December 15, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank National Trust Company filed by Attorney Marissa I. Delinks. Served on 12/15/2022. [22-1953] (MID) [Entered: 12/15/2022 04:38 PM]
December 15, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank National Trust Company filed by Attorney Donald W. Seeley, Jr.. Served on 12/15/2022. [22-1953] (DWS) [Entered: 12/15/2022 04:42 PM]
December 13, 2022 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #20) filed by Appellant Richard A. Pacia. Appearance form and Docketing Statement due 12/27/2022. [22-1953] (JAW) [Entered: 12/13/2022 10:27 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Pacia v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD A. PACIA
Represented By: Corey J. Allard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc. Trust 2006-NC5, Mortgage Pass Through Certificates Series 2006-NC5
Represented By: Samuel Craig Bodurtha
Represented By: Joseph P. Murphy
Represented By: Marissa I. Delinks
Represented By: Donald W. Seeley Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?