Thomas v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Defendant: NICOLE ANDERSON and KEVIN GARABEDIAN
Plaintiff / Appellant: SHAUN THOMAS
Defendant / Appellee: CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 23-1121
Filed: February 6, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2023 MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Shaun Thomas. Served on 04/05/2023. [23-1121] (TSD) [Entered: 04/05/2023 08:45 AM]
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Shaun Thomas. Brief due 05/10/2023 for appellant Shaun Thomas. Appendix due 05/10/2023 for appellant Shaun Thomas. [23-1121] (CMP) [Entered: 04/05/2023 09:01 AM]
February 27, 2023 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 04/10/2023 for appellant Shaun Thomas. Appendix due 04/10/2023 for appellant Shaun Thomas. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [23-1121] (CMP) [Entered: 02/27/2023 10:10 AM]
February 20, 2023 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Shaun Thomas. Served on 02/20/2023. [23-1121] (TSD) [Entered: 02/20/2023 02:55 PM]
February 20, 2023 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Shaun Thomas filed by Attorney Todd S Dion. Served on 02/20/2023. [23-1121] (TSD) [Entered: 02/20/2023 02:54 PM]
February 9, 2023 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC filed by Attorney Christian B.W. Stephens. Served on 02/09/2023. [23-1121] (CBS) [Entered: 02/09/2023 11:31 AM]
February 9, 2023 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellee Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. Served on 02/09/2023. [23-1121] (CBS) [Entered: 02/09/2023 11:36 AM]
February 6, 2023 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #58) filed by Appellant Shaun Thomas. Docketing Statement due 02/21/2023. Transcript Report/Order form due 02/21/2023. Appearance form due 02/21/2023. [23-1121] (CMP) [Entered: 02/06/2023 11:28 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Thomas v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHAUN THOMAS
Represented By: Todd Steven Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Carson Milley Shea
Represented By: Christian B.W. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICOLE ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN GARABEDIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?