Tamaki v. Tamaki
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE TAMAKI
Defendant: ATSUSHI TAMAKI, a/k/a Atchan Tamaki
Case Number: 24-1791
Filed: September 4, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2024 NOTICE of filing the following transcript(s) in district court by Court Reporter Lori Dostie Dunbar: 03/28/2024, Damages Hearing. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [24-1791] (JW) [Entered: 10/11/2024 10:46 AM]
October 11, 2024 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 11/20/2024 for appellant Atsushi Tamaki. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [24-1791] (JW) [Entered: 10/11/2024 10:52 AM]
October 10, 2024 TRANSCRIPT ordered: 03/28/2024, Damages Hearing. Transcript(s) due 12/09/2024 from Court Reporter Lori Dostie Dunbar [24-1791] (JW) [Entered: 10/10/2024 01:40 PM]
September 20, 2024 SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entry: 66 (Civil Bond posted by Atsushi Tamaki). [24-1791] (JW) [Entered: 10/01/2024 05:33 PM]
September 7, 2024 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Atsushi Tamaki. Served on 09/07/2024. [24-1791] (PJC) [Entered: 09/07/2024 11:17 AM]
September 7, 2024 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Atsushi Tamaki filed by Attorney Peter J. Cyr. Served on 09/07/2024. [24-1791] (PJC) [Entered: 09/07/2024 11:20 AM]
September 7, 2024 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Atsushi Tamaki indicating transcripts are being ordered. Served on 09/07/2024. [24-1791] (PJC) [Entered: 09/07/2024 11:22 AM]
September 7, 2024 CERTIFICATE of service for [ # 6665961-2 ], [ # 6665960-2 ], [ # 6665962-2 ] filed by Appellant Atsushi Tamaki. Served on 09/07/2024. [24-1791] (PJC) [Entered: 09/07/2024 11:28 AM]
September 4, 2024 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #60) filed by Appellant Atsushi Tamaki. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 09/18/2024 . [24-1791] (ATC) [Entered: 09/04/2024 12:40 PM]
September 4, 2024 SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entry: 64 - Amended Appeal Cover Sheet. [24-1791] (JW) [Entered: 09/06/2024 04:31 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Tamaki v. Tamaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATSUSHI TAMAKI, a/k/a Atchan Tamaki
Represented By: Yunchao Song
Represented By: Peter Joseph Cyr
Represented By: James J. Berdelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE TAMAKI
Represented By: Peter Earl Rodway
Represented By: Robert A. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?