Tait, et al v. Lake Region School District, et al
Plaintiff: AMY C. TAIT, Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael T. Strecker and CHRISTOPHER L. STRECKER, Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael T. Strecker
Defendant: ALAN SMITH, Superintendent, LAKE REGION SCHOOL DISTRICT, d/b/a MSAD 61 and JESSICA DAGGETT, a/k/a Jessica K. DiBiase
Case Number: 24-1811
Filed: September 16, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Amy C. Tait and Christopher L. Strecker. Brief and Appendix due December 9, 2024 for appellant Christopher L. Strecker and Amy C. Tait. [24-1811] (AL) [Entered: 10/22/2024 05:08 PM]
October 15, 2024 MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Amy C. Tait and Christopher L. Strecker. Served on 10/15/2024. [24-1811] (MTB) [Entered: 10/15/2024 02:01 PM]
October 9, 2024 AMENDED DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Christopher L. Strecker and Amy C. Tait. Served on 10/09/2024. [24-1811] (RLO) [Entered: 10/09/2024 04:20 PM]
October 7, 2024 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Christopher L. Strecker and Amy C. Tait. Served on 10/07/2024. [24-1811]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (RLO) [Entered: 10/07/2024 04:54 PM]
October 3, 2024 NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. Appellants are directed to file a docketing statement or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Docketing Statement due October 17, 2024 . [24-1811] (AL) [Entered: 10/03/2024 06:03 PM]
September 30, 2024 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Lake Region School District and Alan Smith filed by Attorney Oliver Mac Walton. Served on 09/30/2024. [24-1811] (OMW) [Entered: 09/30/2024 09:44 AM]
September 30, 2024 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Amy C. Tait filed by Attorney Mark E Dunlap, Esq.. Served on 09/30/2024. [24-1811] (MED) [Entered: 09/30/2024 01:53 PM]
September 27, 2024 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 11/06/2024 for appellants Christopher L. Strecker and Amy C. Tait. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [24-1811] (AL) [Entered: 09/27/2024 10:35 AM]
September 26, 2024 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Amy C. Tait and Christopher L. Strecker filed by Attorney Michael T. Bigos. Served on 09/26/2024. [24-1811] (MTB) [Entered: 09/26/2024 10:47 AM]
September 26, 2024 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Christopher L. Strecker and Amy C. Tait filed by Attorney Joseph G. Gousse. Served on 09/26/2024. [24-1811] (JGG) [Entered: 09/26/2024 11:02 AM]
September 26, 2024 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Lake Region School District and Alan Smith filed by Attorney Melissa A. Hewey. Served on 09/26/2024. [24-1811] (MAH) [Entered: 09/26/2024 03:13 PM]
September 24, 2024 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Christopher L. Strecker and Amy C. Tait filed by Attorney Richard L. O'Meara. Served on 09/24/2024. [24-1811] (RLO) [Entered: 09/24/2024 11:45 AM]
September 18, 2024 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Jessica Daggett filed by Attorney Elizabeth G. Stouder. Served on 09/18/2024. [24-1811] (EGS) [Entered: 09/18/2024 03:04 PM]
September 18, 2024 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Jessica Daggett filed by Attorney Kevin G. Moynihan. Served on 09/18/2024. [24-1811] (KGM) [Entered: 09/18/2024 03:06 PM]
September 16, 2024 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #37) filed by Appellants Christopher L. Strecker and Amy C. Tait. Docketing Statement and Appearance form due 09/30/2024 . [24-1811] (AL) [Entered: 09/16/2024 11:37 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Tait, et al v. Lake Region School District, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMY C. TAIT, Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael T. Strecker
Represented By: Sebastian B. Okun
Represented By: Richard L. O'Meara
Represented By: Joseph G.E. Gousse
Represented By: Mark Elliott Dunlap
Represented By: Michael T. Bigos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER L. STRECKER, Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael T. Strecker
Represented By: Sebastian B. Okun
Represented By: Richard L. O'Meara
Represented By: Joseph G.E. Gousse
Represented By: Mark Elliott Dunlap
Represented By: Michael T. Bigos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN SMITH, Superintendent
Represented By: Oliver M. Walton
Represented By: Melissa A. Hewey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAKE REGION SCHOOL DISTRICT, d/b/a MSAD 61
Represented By: Oliver M. Walton
Represented By: Melissa A. Hewey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSICA DAGGETT, a/k/a Jessica K. DiBiase
Represented By: Elizabeth G. Stouder
Represented By: Kevin Getchell Moynihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?