Montrond v. Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Plaintiff: MARCELINO MONTROND
Defendant: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, not in its personal capacity but solely as owner of Residential Mortgage Loan Trust 2020-1
Case Number: 24-1852
Filed: September 18, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2024 RESPONSE filed by Appellee Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB to motion for miscellaneous relief [ # 6680046-2 ]. Served on 11/14/2024. [24-1852] (JTP) [Entered: 11/14/2024 04:22 PM]
November 7, 2024 MOTION to include evidence filed by Appellant Marcelino Montrond. Certificate of service was not included. [24-1852] (AVN) [Entered: 11/07/2024 01:53 PM]
October 30, 2024 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellee Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Served on 10/20/2024. [24-1852] (JTP) [Entered: 10/30/2024 04:57 PM]
October 10, 2024 MOTION to stay further proceedings filed by Appellant Marcelino Montrond. Certificate of service was not included. [24-1852] (AVN) [Entered: 10/16/2024 11:24 AM]
September 20, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by David J. Barron, Chief Appellate Judge; William J. Kayatta, Jr., Appellate Judge and Gustavo A. Gelp , Jr., Appellate Judge: Plaintiff-appellant has filed a "Motion for Stay," and defendant-appellee has filed an opposition. Upon consideration of the parties' papers and relevant portions of the record, we conclude that plaintiff-appellant has failed to make a strong showing of likely success on the merits with the specific claims pressed in the stay motion and that, more generally, plaintiff-appellant has failed to demonstrate that stay relief is in order. See Nken v. Holder , 556 U.S. 418, 426 (2009) (stay standard/factors). Accordingly, the motion for stay relief is denied . So ordered. [24-1852] (AVN) [Entered: 09/20/2024 10:55 AM]
September 19, 2024 RESPONSE filed by Appellee Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB to to stay [ # 6668368-2 ]. Served on 09/19/2024. [24-1852] (JTP) [Entered: 09/19/2024 11:06 AM]
September 19, 2024 MEMORANDUM in support of [ # 6668512-2 ] filed by Appellee Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Served on 09/19/2024. [24-1852] (JTP) [Entered: 09/19/2024 11:07 AM]
September 18, 2024 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #14) filed by Appellant Marcelino Montrond. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Fee due 10/02/2024. [24-1852] (JMK) [Entered: 09/18/2024 03:58 PM]
September 18, 2024 MOTION to stay further proceedings filed by Appellant Marcelino Montrond. Certificate of service was not included. [24-1852] (JMK) [Entered: 09/18/2024 04:03 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Montrond v. Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCELINO MONTROND
Represented By: Marcelino Montrond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, not in its personal capacity but solely as owner of Residential Mortgage Loan Trust 2020-1
Represented By: John T. Precobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?