United States Department of Agriculture v. Morales Santiago, et al
Plaintiff: US DEPT OF AGRICULTURE
Defendant: ALBERTO MORALES SANTIAGO and CARMEN MARIA MEDIAVILLA RODRIGUEZ
Case Number: 24-1936
Filed: October 17, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2024 SECOND NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellants are directed to file an appearance form and docketing statement or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Appearance form and Docketing Statement due 12/11/2024 . [24-1936] (AVN) [Entered: 11/27/2024 10:18 AM]
November 26, 2024 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee USDA filed by Attorney Juan Carlos Fortuno-Fas. Served on 11/26/2024. [24-1936] (JCF) [Entered: 11/26/2024 01:57 PM]
November 18, 2024 NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Juan Carlos Fortu o Fas for USDA. [24-1936] (AVN) [Entered: 11/18/2024 09:30 AM]
November 6, 2024 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Jos Ernesto Col n-Villafa e for Appellants Alberto Morales Santiago and Carmen Maria Mediavilla Rodriguez. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued on October 17, 2024. [24-1936] (NKR) [Entered: 11/15/2024 03:07 PM]
November 1, 2024 NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellants are directed to file an appearance form and docketing statement or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Appearance form and Docketing Statement due 11/15/2024 . [24-1936] (AVN) [Entered: 11/01/2024 08:30 AM]
November 1, 2024 NOTICE issued. After 11/15/2024 , the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Jos Ernesto Col n-Villafa e for Alberto Morales Santiago and Carmen Maria Mediavilla Rodriguez and Juan Carlos Fortu o Fas for USDA. [24-1936] (AVN) [Entered: 11/01/2024 08:35 AM]
October 17, 2024 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #40) filed by Appellants Carmen Maria Mediavilla Rodriguez and Alberto Morales Santiago. Appearance form and Docketing Statement due 10/31/2024 . [24-1936] (AVN) [Entered: 10/17/2024 12:33 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: United States Department of Agriculture v. Morales Santiago, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US DEPT OF AGRICULTURE
Represented By: Juan Carlos Fortuno Fas
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBERTO MORALES SANTIAGO
Represented By: Jose Ernesto Colon-Villafane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARMEN MARIA MEDIAVILLA RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Jose Ernesto Colon-Villafane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?