Bosket v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: CLYDE R. BOSKET, II
Defendant: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC, d/b/a Mr. Cooper and HSBC BANK USA, N.A., as Trustee for Structured Adjustable Rate Mortgage Loan Trust, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-9
Case Number: 24-2051
Filed: November 19, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2024 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Clyde R. Bosket, II indicating the following transcripts are being ordered: 10/15/2024, Motion to dismiss. Transcript(s) due 02/03/2025 from Court Reporter Richard Henry Romanow. [24-2051]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (GRC) [Entered: 12/04/2024 01:25 PM]
December 3, 2024 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Clyde R. Bosket, II filed by Attorney Todd S. Dion. Served on 12/03/2024. [24-2051] (TSD) [Entered: 12/03/2024 06:18 PM]
December 3, 2024 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Clyde R. Bosket, II. Served on 12/02/2024. [24-2051] (TSD) [Entered: 12/03/2024 06:19 PM]
December 3, 2024 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Clyde R. Bosket, II indicating transcripts are being ordered. Served on 12/03/2024. [24-2051] (TSD) [Entered: 12/03/2024 06:20 PM]
November 22, 2024 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees HSBC Bank USA, N.A. and Nationstar Mortgage, LLC filed by Attorney Stephanie Sprague. Served on 11/22/2024. [24-2051] (SS) [Entered: 11/22/2024 10:42 AM]
November 19, 2024 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #16) filed by Appellant Clyde R. Bosket, II. Appearance form due 12/03/2024. Docketing Statement due 12/03/2024. Transcript Report/Order form due 12/03/2024. [24-2051] (GRC) [Entered: 11/19/2024 11:29 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Bosket v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLYDE R. BOSKET, II
Represented By: Todd Steven Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC, d/b/a Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Stephanie Sprague
Represented By: Krystle S. Guillory Tadesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC BANK USA, N.A., as Trustee for Structured Adjustable Rate Mortgage Loan Trust, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-9
Represented By: Stephanie Sprague
Represented By: Krystle S. Guillory Tadesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?