D'Esopo, et al v. Richardson, et al
Plaintiff: JAN D'ESOPO and GALLERY INN, INC.
Defendant: TERESINA RICHARDSON and FELIPE HUESO
Interested Party: BRISTOL LOPEZ
Case Number: 24-2110
Filed: December 9, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2025 APPENDIX tendered by Appellants Teresina Richardson and Felipe Hueso. Served on 01/13/2025. [24-2110] (JJH) [Entered: 01/23/2025 01:46 PM]
January 23, 2025 BRIEF tendered by Appellants Felipe Hueso and Teresina Richardson. [24-2110] (OJB) [Entered: 01/23/2025 12:30 PM]
January 16, 2025 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 02/25/2025 for appellants Felipe Hueso and Teresina Richardson. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellees' brief will be due 30 days following service of appellants' brief and appellants' reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellees' brief. [24-2110] (ATC) [Entered: 01/16/2025 09:49 AM]
January 15, 2025 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Lara E. Montecalvo, Appellate Judge; Julie Rikelman, Appellate Judge and Seth Robert Aframe, Appellate Judge: Several motions are pending in this matter. We have carefully reviewed the parties' submissions and relevant portions of the record, and resolve the pending motions as follows: The "motion to strike motion to stay" and "renewed motion to strike motion to stay," filed by plaintiffs-appellees, are denied . The "motion for stay of interlocutory order pending appeal," filed by defendants-appellants, is denied . Defendants-appellants have failed to make a strong showing that they are likely to succeed on the merits of this appeal and, more generally, have failed to demonstrate that a stay is in order. See Nken v. Holder , 556 U.S. 418, 426 (2009) (stay/injunctive relief standard); Respect Me. PAC v. McKee , 622 F.3d 13, 15 (1st Cir. 2010) (same); see also In re Power Recovery Sys., Inc. , 950 F.2d 798, 804 n.31 (1st Cir. 1991) ("Failure to meet even one of the [stay/injunction] criteria justifies denial."). All other pending requests and motions, to the extent not mooted by the foregoing, are denied . [24-2110] (ATC) [Entered: 01/15/2025 08:41 AM]
January 14, 2025 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellee Gallery Inn, Inc.. Served on 01/14/2025. [24-2110] (JAB) [Entered: 01/14/2025 09:49 AM]
January 13, 2025 BRIEF tendered by Appellants Teresina Richardson and Felipe Hueso. [24-2110] CLERK'S NOTE: Multiple documents cannot be included in a single PDF file. An appendix is a separate document which cannot be attached to the brief and must be filed in accordance with Fed. R. App. P 30(a)-(b). THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS (1/23/25). (OJB) [Entered: 01/13/2025 08:39 PM]
January 9, 2025 MOTION to strike motion to stay [ # 6689535-2 ] filed by Appellees Jan D'Esopo and Gallery Inn, Inc.. Served on 01/09/2025. [24-2110] (JAB) [Entered: 01/09/2025 08:39 PM]
January 8, 2025 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Jan D'Esopo and Gallery Inn, Inc. filed by Attorney Isabel Abislaiman. Served on 01/08/2025. [24-2110] (IA) [Entered: 01/08/2025 08:49 PM]
January 8, 2025 RESPONSE filed by Appellants Felipe Hueso and Teresina Richardson to motion to strike pleading [ # 6690578-2 ]. Served on 01/08/2025. [24-2110] (JJH) [Entered: 01/08/2025 03:47 PM]
December 31, 2024 MOTION to strike motion to stay [ # 6689535-2 ] filed by Appellees Jan D'Esopo and Gallery Inn, Inc.. Served on 12/31/2024. [24-2110] (JAB) [Entered: 12/31/2024 05:08 PM]
December 31, 2024 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Jan D'Esopo and Gallery Inn, Inc. filed by Attorney Jane Becker Whitaker. Served on 12/31/2024. [24-2110] (JAB) [Entered: 12/31/2024 04:13 PM]
December 28, 2024 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Teresina Richardson and Felipe Hueso filed by Attorney Oscar Bezares. Served on 12/28/2024. [24-2110] (OJB) [Entered: 12/28/2024 03:39 PM]
December 23, 2024 MOTION to stay Injunction disguised as Order filed by Appellants Teresina Richardson and Felipe Hueso. Served on 12/23/2024. [24-2110] (JJH) [Entered: 12/23/2024 05:28 PM]
December 16, 2024 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Felipe Hueso and Teresina Richardson. Served on 12/16/2024. [24-2110] (JJH) [Entered: 12/16/2024 04:11 PM]
December 16, 2024 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Felipe Hueso and Teresina Richardson filed by Attorney Juan J Hernandez Lopez de Victoria. Served on 12/16/2024. [24-2110] (JJH) [Entered: 12/16/2024 04:10 PM]
December 9, 2024 Filing fee was paid in the district court by Appellants Felipe Hueso and Teresina Richardson on 12/06/2024. [24-2110] (ATC) [Entered: 12/09/2024 11:11 AM]
December 9, 2024 SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Electronic notice of submission of filing fee in district court filed on December 6, 2024. [24-2110] (ATC) [Entered: 12/10/2024 09:09 AM]
December 9, 2024 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #88) filed by Appellants Felipe Hueso and Teresina Richardson. Docketing Statement and Appearance form due 12/23/2024 . [24-2110] (ATC) [Entered: 12/09/2024 08:37 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: D'Esopo, et al v. Richardson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERESINA RICHARDSON
Represented By: Juan Jose Hernandez Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Oscar J. Bezares-Lamboy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FELIPE HUESO
Represented By: Juan Jose Hernandez Lopez de Victoria
Represented By: Oscar J. Bezares-Lamboy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAN D'ESOPO
Represented By: Hector J. Figueroa-Vincenty
Represented By: Jane A. Becker Whitaker
Represented By: Isabel Abislaiman-Quilez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GALLERY INN, INC.
Represented By: Jane A. Becker Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: BRISTOL LOPEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?