U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. v. Bowden, et al
Plaintiff: U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Defendant: RICHARD I. BOWDEN, a/k/a Richard Ivan Bowden and JACKIE L. BOWDEN
Interested Party: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 25-1034
Filed: January 13, 2025
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2025 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. indicating the following transcript is being ordered: 10/23/2024, Oral Argument on Motion for Summary Judgment. Transcript(s) due 03/31/2025 from Court Reporter Cathy Ford. [25-1034] (ALW) [Entered: 01/30/2025 07:57 PM]
January 28, 2025 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. filed by Attorney Reneau J. Longoria. Served on 01/28/2025. [25-1034] (RJL) [Entered: 01/28/2025 01:10 PM]
January 28, 2025 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. Served on 01/28/2025. [25-1034] (RJL) [Entered: 01/28/2025 01:13 PM]
January 28, 2025 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. indicating transcripts are being ordered. Served on 01/28/2025. [25-1034]. CLERK'S NOTE: The ECF filer did not select the option that best describes the document. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (RJL) [Entered: 01/28/2025 01:16 PM]
January 24, 2025 NOTICE of filing the following transcript(s) in district court by Court Reporter Cathy J. Ford: 10/23/2024, Motion Hearing. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [25-1034] (ALW) [Entered: 01/24/2025 09:21 AM]
January 14, 2025 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #71) filed by Appellant U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 01/28/2025 . [25-1034] (ALW) [Entered: 01/14/2025 12:59 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. v. Bowden, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD I. BOWDEN, a/k/a Richard Ivan Bowden
Represented By: John Z. Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACKIE L. BOWDEN
Represented By: John Z. Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Reneau Jean Longoria
Represented By: John A. Doonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?