Brown v. First National Bank of Omaha
Plaintiff: DONALD L. BROWN
Defendant: WESTERN STATES BANK, FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA and FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF NEBRASKA, INC.
Case Number: 25-1049
Filed: January 14, 2025
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order ORDER directing appellant to file a corrected Transcript Report/Order Form by 03/26/2025 . [25-1049] (ATC) [Entered: 03/12/2025 01:24 PM]
March 6, 2025 MOTION to extend time to file a transcript report/order form filed by Appellant Donald L. Brown. Served on 03/04/2025. [25-1049]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to replace an attachment. (ATC) [Entered: 03/06/2025 01:10 PM]
March 6, 2025 PLEADING tendered: Transcript Report/Order Form filed by Appellant Donald L. Brown. Served on 03/04/2025. [25-1049] (ATC) [Entered: 03/06/2025 01:09 PM]
February 24, 2025 A request to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal was mistakenly filed in the wrong case in the district court as noted by clerk's note entered 1/31/2025. Fee due 03/10/2025 . [25-1049] (ATC) [Entered: 02/24/2025 08:21 AM]
February 14, 2025 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Construing Appellant Donald L. Brown's recently received letter as a request for an extension of time to file a transcript report/order form, that request is granted. The deadline to file a transcript report/order form is extended to March 7, 2025 . If transcripts are necessary for this appeal, appellant is directed to file a transcript order form by March 7, 2025 . Absent a timely response, this court will set a briefing schedule, if appropriate. [25-1049] (ATC) [Entered: 02/14/2025 09:59 AM]
February 12, 2025 LETTER filed by Appellant Donald L. Brown inquiring about transcript deadline. Certificate of service was not included. [25-1049] (ATC) [Entered: 02/13/2025 08:42 AM]
January 31, 2025 NOTICE of default issued. Appellant failed to file a transcript report/order form by the deadline. If transcripts are necessary for this appeal, appellant is directed to file a transcript order form by 02/14/2025 . Absent a timely response, this court will set a briefing schedule, if appropriate. [25-1049] (ATC) [Entered: 01/31/2025 02:55 PM]
January 14, 2025 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #17) filed by Appellant Donald L. Brown. Transcript Report/Order form due 01/28/2025 . [25-1049] (ATC) [Entered: 01/14/2025 12:09 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Brown v. First National Bank of Omaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD L. BROWN
Represented By: Donald L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTERN STATES BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA
Represented By: Michael E. Jusczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF NEBRASKA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?