Fustolo v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: STEVEN C. FUSTOLO
Defendant: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. and FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION, as Trustee of SCRT 2019-2
Case Number: 25-1053
Filed: January 20, 2025
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2025 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Steven C. Fustolo. Brief and Appendix due 04/18/2025 for appellant Steven C. Fustolo. [25-1053] (JMK) [Entered: 03/19/2025 11:21 AM]
March 18, 2025 MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Steven C. Fustolo. Served on 03/18/2025. [25-1053] (JDC) [Entered: 03/18/2025 10:30 AM]
February 14, 2025 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellee Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. Served on 02/14/2025. [25-1053] (PFC) [Entered: 02/14/2025 09:57 AM]
February 14, 2025 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellee Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. Served on 02/14/2025. [25-1053] (PFC) [Entered: 02/14/2025 09:56 AM]
February 8, 2025 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Steven C. Fustolo filed by Attorney Lane N. Goldberg. Served on 02/08/2025. [25-1053] (LNG) [Entered: 02/08/2025 05:10 PM]
February 7, 2025 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 03/19/2025 for appellant Steven C. Fustolo. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [25-1053] (JW) [Entered: 02/07/2025 06:52 PM]
February 5, 2025 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Steven C. Fustolo filed by Attorney Joe Dye Culik. Served on 02/05/2025. [25-1053] (JDC) [Entered: 02/05/2025 08:46 AM]
February 5, 2025 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Steven C. Fustolo. Served on 02/05/2025. [25-1053] (JDC) [Entered: 02/05/2025 08:48 AM]
February 5, 2025 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Steven C. Fustolo indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Served on 02/05/2025. [25-1053] (JDC) [Entered: 02/05/2025 08:49 AM]
January 27, 2025 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. filed by Attorney Peter F. Carr, II. Served on 01/27/2025. [25-1053] (PFC) [Entered: 01/27/2025 09:59 AM]
January 21, 2025 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #47) filed by Appellant Steven C. Fustolo. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 02/04/2025. [25-1053] (JW) [Entered: 01/20/2025 11:20 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Fustolo v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN C. FUSTOLO
Represented By: Lane N. Goldberg
Represented By: Joe Dye Culik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.
Represented By: Peter Francis Carr II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION, as Trustee of SCRT 2019-2
Represented By: Peter Francis Carr II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?