Wilson, et al v. Iguana Sport Services, Corp.
Plaintiff: NAKIA WILSON, on their own behalf and of their deceased husband, Ryan Fortune, KIARA A. FORTUNE, on their own behalf and of their deceased father, Ryan Fortune, and as the legal representative of the Estate of Ryan Fortune, RYQUIA WILSON, on their own behalf and of their deceased father, Ryan Fortune, and as the legal representative of the Estate of Ryan Fortune, RYAN FORTUNE, JR., on their own behalf and of their deceased father, Ryan Fortune, and as the legal representative of the Estate of Ryan Fortune, RYQUAN FORTUNE, on their own behalf and of their deceased father, Ryan Fortune, and as the legal representative of the Estate of Ryan Fortune, STEPHANIE TOWNSEND, on their own behalf and of their underage son, CT, LAJUAN JOHNSON, on behalf of their son, RF, a minor who forms part of the Estate of Rawle Fortune, KIMBERLY LUCIANO, on behalf of their daughter, KS, a minor who forms part of the Estate of Rawle Fortune, CHARRITA WILLIAMS, on behalf of their son, JW, a minor who forms part of the Estate of Rawle Fortune, ARNOLD FORTUNE, on their own behalf as parent of the decedents and LUCILLE FORTUNE, on their own behalf as parent of the decedents
Defendant: IGUANA SPORT SERVICES, CORP., COURTYARD MARRIOTT ISLA VERDE BEACH RESORT, HR PROPERTIES, INC., INTERNATIONAL HOSPITALITY ENTERPRISES, INC., CHUBB INSURANCE COMPANY OF PUERTO RICO, INSURER(S), 1-10, UNKNOWN DEFENDANT(S), 1-10 and INTERNATIONAL HOSPITALITY MANAGEMENT, INC.
Case Number: 25-1064
Filed: January 16, 2025
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2025 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Nakia Wilson, Kiara A. Fortune, Ryquia Wilson, Ryan Fortune, Jr., Ryquan Fortune, Stephanie Townsend, LaJuan Johnson, Kimberly Luciano, Arnold Fortune and Lucille Fortune and Appendix due 04/11/2025 for appellant Arnold Fortune, Kiara A. Fortune, Lucille Fortune, Ryan Fortune Jr., Ryquan Fortune, LaJuan Johnson, Kimberly Luciano, Stephanie Townsend, Charrita Williams, Nakia Wilson and Ryquia Wilson. [25-1064] (ATC) [Entered: 03/11/2025 11:36 AM]
March 10, 2025 MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Arnold Fortune, Kiara A. Fortune, Lucille Fortune, Ryan Fortune, Jr., Ryquan Fortune, LaJuan Johnson, Kimberly Luciano, Stephanie Townsend, Nakia Wilson and Ryquia Wilson. Served on 03/10/2025. [25-1064] (PRV) [Entered: 03/10/2025 03:14 PM]
February 18, 2025 NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: H ctor A. M rmol-Lantigua for Chubb Insurance Company of Puerto Rico. [25-1064] (ATC) [Entered: 02/18/2025 12:48 PM]
January 31, 2025 NOTICE issued. After 02/14/2025 , the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: H ctor A. M rmol-Lantigua for Chubb Insurance Company of Puerto Rico. [25-1064] (ATC) [Entered: 01/31/2025 10:02 AM]
January 30, 2025 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 03/11/2025 for appellant Arnold Fortune, Kiara A. Fortune, Lucille Fortune, Ryan Fortune Jr., Ryquan Fortune, LaJuan Johnson, Kimberly Luciano, Stephanie Townsend, Charrita Williams, Nakia Wilson and Ryquia Wilson. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellants' brief and appellants' reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [25-1064] (ATC) [Entered: 01/30/2025 11:36 AM]
January 27, 2025 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Iguana Sport Services, Corp. filed by Attorney Jose Manuel Martinez-Chevres. Served on 01/27/2025. [25-1064] (JMM) [Entered: 01/27/2025 12:08 PM]
January 27, 2025 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Arnold Fortune, Kiara A. Fortune, Lucille Fortune, Ryan Fortune, Jr., Ryquan Fortune, LaJuan Johnson, Kimberly Luciano, Stephanie Townsend, Nakia Wilson and Ryquia Wilson filed by Attorney Pedro R. Vazquez, III. Served on 01/27/2025. [25-1064] (PRV) [Entered: 01/27/2025 01:07 PM]
January 27, 2025 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Arnold Fortune, Kiara A. Fortune, Lucille Fortune, Ryan Fortune, Jr., Ryquan Fortune, LaJuan Johnson, Kimberly Luciano, Stephanie Townsend, Nakia Wilson and Ryquia Wilson. Served on 01/27/2025. [25-1064] (PRV) [Entered: 01/27/2025 01:08 PM]
January 16, 2025 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #212) filed by Appellants Arnold Fortune, Kiara A. Fortune, Lucille Fortune, Ryan Fortune, Jr., Ryquan Fortune, LaJuan Johnson, Kimberly Luciano, Stephanie Townsend, Charrita Williams, Nakia Wilson and Ryquia Wilson. Docketing Statement and Appearance form due 01/30/2025 . [25-1064] (ATC) [Entered: 01/16/2025 02:31 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Wilson, et al v. Iguana Sport Services, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAKIA WILSON, on their own behalf and of their deceased husband, Ryan Fortune
Represented By: Pedro R. Vazquez III
Represented By: Jorge R. Quintana-Lajara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIARA A. FORTUNE, on their own behalf and of their deceased father, Ryan Fortune, and as the legal representative of the Estate of Ryan Fortune
Represented By: Pedro R. Vazquez III
Represented By: Jorge R. Quintana-Lajara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYQUIA WILSON, on their own behalf and of their deceased father, Ryan Fortune, and as the legal representative of the Estate of Ryan Fortune
Represented By: Pedro R. Vazquez III
Represented By: Jorge R. Quintana-Lajara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN FORTUNE, JR., on their own behalf and of their deceased father, Ryan Fortune, and as the legal representative of the Estate of Ryan Fortune
Represented By: Pedro R. Vazquez III
Represented By: Jorge R. Quintana-Lajara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYQUAN FORTUNE, on their own behalf and of their deceased father, Ryan Fortune, and as the legal representative of the Estate of Ryan Fortune
Represented By: Pedro R. Vazquez III
Represented By: Jorge R. Quintana-Lajara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE TOWNSEND, on their own behalf and of their underage son, CT
Represented By: Pedro R. Vazquez III
Represented By: Jorge R. Quintana-Lajara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAJUAN JOHNSON, on behalf of their son, RF, a minor who forms part of the Estate of Rawle Fortune
Represented By: Pedro R. Vazquez III
Represented By: Jorge R. Quintana-Lajara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY LUCIANO, on behalf of their daughter, KS, a minor who forms part of the Estate of Rawle Fortune
Represented By: Pedro R. Vazquez III
Represented By: Jorge R. Quintana-Lajara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARRITA WILLIAMS, on behalf of their son, JW, a minor who forms part of the Estate of Rawle Fortune
Represented By: Pedro R. Vazquez III
Represented By: Jorge R. Quintana-Lajara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARNOLD FORTUNE, on their own behalf as parent of the decedents
Represented By: Pedro R. Vazquez III
Represented By: Jorge R. Quintana-Lajara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCILLE FORTUNE, on their own behalf as parent of the decedents
Represented By: Pedro R. Vazquez III
Represented By: Jorge R. Quintana-Lajara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IGUANA SPORT SERVICES, CORP.
Represented By: Luis Gabriel Martinez-Llorens
Represented By: Jose Manuel Martinez-Chevres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COURTYARD MARRIOTT ISLA VERDE BEACH RESORT
Represented By: Luis Gabriel Martinez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HR PROPERTIES, INC.
Represented By: Luis Gabriel Martinez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL HOSPITALITY ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: Luis Gabriel Martinez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHUBB INSURANCE COMPANY OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Luis Gabriel Martinez-Llorens
Represented By: Hector A. Marmol-Lantigua
Represented By: Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSURER(S), 1-10
Represented By: Luis Gabriel Martinez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN DEFENDANT(S), 1-10
Represented By: Luis Gabriel Martinez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL HOSPITALITY MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By: Margarita Rosado-Toledo
Represented By: Luis Gabriel Martinez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?