UMB Bank, et al v. Gauthier
Plaintiff: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, not in its individual capacity, but solely as owner trustee of BRAVO Residential Funding Trust 2021-C and UMB BANK, N.A., not in its individual capacity, but solely as Legal Title Trustee for LVS Title Trust XIII
Defendant: MARGARET L. GAUTHIER
Interested Party: ESQ BENJAMIN P. CAMPO, JR.
Case Number: 25-1088
Filed: January 24, 2025
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2025 MANDATE issued. [25-1088] (GB) [Entered: 02/21/2025 03:30 AM]
January 30, 2025 JUDGMENT entered by Lara E. Montecalvo, Appellate Judge; Julie Rikelman, Appellate Judge and Seth Robert Aframe, Appellate Judge. Dismissed . [25-1088] (AVN) [Entered: 01/30/2025 09:06 AM]
January 27, 2025 MOTION to consolidate cases filed by Appellant Margaret L. Gauthier. Served on 01/27/2025. [25-1088] (MLG) [Entered: 01/27/2025 06:04 PM]
January 27, 2025 CASE submitted. Panel: Lara E. Montecalvo, Appellate Judge; Julie Rikelman, Appellate Judge; Seth Robert Aframe, Appellate Judge. [25-1088] (SBT) [Entered: 02/18/2025 12:30 PM]
January 24, 2025 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #116) filed by Appellant Margaret L. Gauthier. Transcript Report/Order form and Fee due 02/07/2025 . [25-1088] (AVN) [Entered: 01/24/2025 11:32 AM]
January 24, 2025 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Margaret L. Gauthier indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Served on 01/24/2025. [25-1088] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional cases 24-2142, 25-8002. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (MLG) [Entered: 01/24/2025 01:52 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: UMB Bank, et al v. Gauthier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, not in its individual capacity, but solely as owner trustee of BRAVO Residential Funding Trust 2021-C
Represented By: Reneau Jean Longoria
Represented By: John A. Doonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UMB BANK, N.A., not in its individual capacity, but solely as Legal Title Trustee for LVS Title Trust XIII
Represented By: Reneau Jean Longoria
Represented By: John A. Doonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGARET L. GAUTHIER
Represented By: Margaret L. Gauthier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ESQ BENJAMIN P. CAMPO, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?