Harner v. Theriault
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY WAYNE HARNER
Defendant: OFFICER C. THERIAULT
Case Number: 25-1174
Filed: February 20, 2025
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2025 NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued directing appellant to file a brief or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 45.0(a). Brief due 04/30/2025 . [25-1174] (AVN) [Entered: 04/16/2025 04:56 PM]
March 28, 2025 MOTION to object filed by Appellant Timothy Wayne Harner. Certificate of service was not included. [25-1174] (AL) [Entered: 03/31/2025 08:26 PM]
March 19, 2025 NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. This appeal will be dismissed pursuant to Fed.R.App.P. 3(a) and 1st Cir. R. 45.0 for failure to prosecute unless the required PLRA forms are properly completed and filed with this office or the full filing fee is paid to the clerk of the district court by 04/02/2025. [25-1174] (KPC) [Entered: 03/19/2025 01:43 PM]
February 27, 2025 PLRA LETTER issued. IFP was not requested in district court. PLRA forms sent. PLRA response due 03/13/2025 . [25-1174] (AVN) [Entered: 02/27/2025 11:29 AM]
February 27, 2025 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 04/08/2025 for appellant Timothy Wayne Harner. [25-1174] (AVN) [Entered: 02/27/2025 11:37 AM]
February 20, 2025 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #10) filed by Appellant Timothy Wayne Harner. Fee due 03/06/2025 . [25-1174] (AVN) [Entered: 02/20/2025 03:18 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Harner v. Theriault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY WAYNE HARNER
Represented By: Timothy Wayne Harner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER C. THERIAULT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?