Brown, et al v. Alma, Inc., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: CRAIG W. BROWN, JAN C. BROWN, DAVID A. ARRIGHI, LYDIA REED, RONALD L. CRICHTON-REED, KATHERINE CRICHTON-REED and WALTER C. SIMMONS
Defendant / Appellee: ALMA, INC., a Kansas Corporation, THOMAS C. MOORE, JAMES W. MOORE and BRADLEY YOUNG, LLP
Case Number: 08-3013
Filed: January 17, 2008
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2009 [9662807] Case file closed. Shipment to records center due 04/24/2012. [Entered: 05/28/2009 02:52 PM]
February 18, 2009 [9634928] Mandate issued. [Entered: 02/18/2009 07:38 AM]
January 27, 2009 [9629416] Affirmed; Terminated on the merits after submissions without oral hearing; Written, signed, unpublished. Judges Tacha, Seymour (authoring), and Holmes. Mandate to issue. [Entered: 01/27/2009 10:46 AM]
January 13, 2009 [9625687] Case submitted on the briefs to Judges Tacha, Seymour and Holmes. [Entered: 01/13/2009 11:17 AM]
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order [9623879] Order filed by Judges Tacha, Seymour and Holmes submitting the case on the briefs during the January 2009 term of court. All counsel scheduled to appear are excused from attendance at oral argument on January 13, 2009 in Denver, Colorado. Served on 01/06/2009. [Entered: 01/06/2009 02:38 PM]
November 17, 2008 [9612475] Calendar notice sent to counsel. Arguments to be held Tuesday, January 13, 2009, at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom II, Byron White U.S. Courthouse, Denver, CO. Counsel is required to go to http://www.ca10.uscourts.gov under the argument calendar tab to obtain an important notice regarding calendared cases and required forms that must be completed and returned to the clerk's office within 10 days. [Entered: 11/17/2008 02:15 PM]
August 6, 2008 [9587320] Appellees' brief filed by Alma, Inc., Mr. James W. Moore and Mr. Thomas C. Moore. Original and 7 copies. Served on: 07/28/2008. Manner of service: email. Oral argument requested? y. Appellant's reply brief due 08/25/2008 by Craig W. Brown, Jan C. Brown, David A. Arrighi, Lydia Reed, Ronald L. Crichton-Reed, Katherine Crichton-Reed and Walter C. Simmons. [Entered: 08/06/2008 10:36 AM]
August 6, 2008 [9587321] Errata sheet filed by Alma, Inc., Mr. James W. Moore and Mr. Thomas C. Moore. Served on 08/06/2008. Manner of Service: US mail. [Entered: 08/06/2008 10:37 AM]
August 5, 2008 [9587039] Appellee's brief filed by Bradley Young, LLP. Original and 7 copies. Served on: 08/04/2008. Manner of service: US mail. Oral argument requested? n. [Entered: 08/05/2008 02:01 PM]
July 28, 2008 [9585503] Appellee's deficient brief filed by Alma, Inc., Mr. James W. Moore and Mr. Thomas C. Moore. Type of deficiency: no statement regarding filing of separate briefs. Appellee's amended brief now due 08/08/2008 for Alma, Inc., Thomas C. Moore and James W. Moore. [Entered: 07/29/2008 11:32 AM]
July 28, 2008 [9585256] Appellee's deficient brief filed by Bradley Young, LLP. Type of deficiency: Font of brief too small; No statement stating why seperate response brief was filed. Appellee's amended brief now due 08/07/2008 for Bradley Young, LLP. [Entered: 07/28/2008 01:22 PM]
June 24, 2008 [9578226] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Appellees' motion to extend time to file eres brief. Appellees' brief now due 07/28/2008 for Alma, Inc., Thomas C. Moore, James W. Moore. No further extensions may be granted on the clerk's authority. Served on 06/24/2008. [Entered: 06/24/2008 09:34 AM]
June 24, 2008 [9578180] Appellee's motion to extend time to file appellee's brief until 07/28/2008 filed by Alma, Inc., Mr. James W. Moore and Mr. Thomas C. Moore. Served on 06/23/2008. Manner of Service: US mail. [Entered: 06/24/2008 07:41 AM]
June 23, 2008 [9578013] Appellee's motion to extend time to file appellee's brief until 07/28/2008 filed by Bradley Young, LLP. Served on 06/23/2008. Manner of Service: US mail. [Entered: 06/23/2008 11:22 AM]
June 23, 2008 [9578076] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Appellee's motion to extend time to file eres brief. Appellee's brief now due 07/28/2008 for Bradley Young, LLP. No further extensions of time may be granted on the clerk's authority. Counsel is reminded that future motins may be denied if not in compliance with 10th Cir. R. 27.4(F). Served on 06/23/2008. [Entered: 06/23/2008 02:09 PM]
May 23, 2008 [9572113] Appellants' brief filed by Mr. David A. Arrighi, Mr. Craig W. Brown, Ms. Jan C. Brown, Ms. Katherine Crichton-Reed, Mr. Ronald L. Crichton-Reed, Ms. Lydia Reed and Ms. Walter C. Simmons. Original and 7 copies. Served on 05/23/2008 by US mail. Oral argument requested? y. Appendix filed. Original and 1 copy. Appendix pages: 149 (in 1 volume). Appellees' brief due 06/26/2008 for Bradley Young, LLP, Alma, Inc., Thomas C. Moore and James W. Moore. [Entered: 05/27/2008 03:53 PM]
May 8, 2008 Opinion or Order [9568130] Order filed by Judges Kelly and McConnell granting Appellants' third motion to extend time to file apet brief (14 additional days). Appellants' brief and appendix are due on 05/23/2008 for Craig W. Brown, Jan C. Brown, David A. Arrighi, Lydia Reed, Ronald L. Crichton-Reed, Katherine Crichton-Reed and Walter C. Simmons. No further extensions of time will be granted. [Entered: 05/08/2008 02:12 PM]
May 5, 2008 [9566894] Appellants' third motion filed by Mr. David A. Arrighi, Mr. Craig W. Brown, Ms. Jan C. Brown, Ms. Katherine Crichton-Reed, Mr. Ronald L. Crichton-Reed, Ms. Lydia Reed and Ms. Walter C. Simmons to extend time to file appellant's brief until 05/23/2008. Served on 05/04/2008. Manner of Service:. [Entered: 05/05/2008 07:58 AM]
April 14, 2008 [9562246] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellants' brief and appendix until 05/09/2008. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 05/09/2008 for Craig W. Brown, Jan C. Brown, David A. Arrighi, Lydia Reed, Ronald L. Crichton-Reed, Katherine Crichton-Reed and Walter C. Simmons. [Entered: 04/14/2008 01:39 PM]
April 11, 2008 [9561910] Appellant's motion filed by Mr. David A. Arrighi, Mr. Craig W. Brown, Ms. Jan C. Brown, Ms. Katherine Crichton-Reed, Mr. Ronald L. Crichton-Reed, Ms. Lydia Reed and Ms. Walter C. Simmons to extend time to file appellants' brief until 05/09/2008.. Original and 1 copies. Served on 04/10/2008. Manner of Service: US mail. [Entered: 04/11/2008 01:17 PM]
March 17, 2008 [9555593] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellants' brief and appendix until 04/14/2008 for Craig W. Brown, Jan C. Brown, David A. Arrighi, Lydia Reed, Ronald L. Crichton-Reed, Katherine Crichton-Reed and Walter C. Simmons. [Entered: 03/17/2008 08:01 AM]
March 11, 2008 [9554288] Appellants' motion filed by Mr. David A. Arrighi, Mr. Craig W. Brown, Ms. Jan C. Brown, Ms. Katherine Crichton-Reed, Mr. Ronald L. Crichton-Reed, Ms. Lydia Reed and Ms. Walter C. Simmons to extend time to file appellants' brief until 05/12/2008.. Original and 1 copies. Served on 03/11/2008. Manner of Service:. [Entered: 03/11/2008 12:43 PM]
February 22, 2008 [9550232] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Dennis J.C. Owens for Mr. Craig W. Brown, Ms. Jan C. Brown, Mr. David A. Arrighi, Ms. Lydia Reed, Mr. Ronald L. Crichton-Reed, Ms. Katherine Crichton-Reed and Ms. Walter C. Simmons. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 02/14/2008. Manner of Service: US mail [Entered: 02/22/2008 11:58 AM]
February 22, 2008 [9550207] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Dennis Owens for Ms. Walter C. Simmons, Ms. Lydia Reed, Mr. Ronald L. Crichton-Reed, Ms. Katherine Crichton-Reed, Ms. Jan C. Brown, Mr. Craig W. Brown and Mr. David A. Arrighi. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/14/2008. Manner of Service: US mail. [Entered: 02/22/2008 10:58 AM]
February 8, 2008 [9547388] Motion to withdraw as attorney for Mr. David A. Arrighi, Mr. Craig W. Brown, Ms. Jan C. Brown, Ms. Katherine Crichton-Reed, Mr. Ronald L. Crichton-Reed, Ms. Lydia Reed and Ms. Walter C. Simmons filed by Mr. Kenneth J. Berra. [Entered: 02/08/2008 03:00 PM]
February 8, 2008 [9547415] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Attorney Kenneth Berra's motion to withdraw as counsel for the appellants. Served on 02/08/2008. [Entered: 02/08/2008 03:56 PM]
February 4, 2008 [9545880] Case referred for mediation conferencing. Please open the document link in this notice for additional information. [Entered: 02/04/2008 01:58 PM]
January 31, 2008 [9545117] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 01/30/2008. Manner of Service: US Mail email. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 03/13/2008 for Craig W. Brown, Jan C. Brown, David A. Arrighi, Lydia Reed, Ronald L. Crichton-Reed, Katherine Crichton-Reed and Walter C. Simmons. [Entered: 01/31/2008 02:10 PM]
January 29, 2008 [9544509] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. H. Kent Desselle for Mr. Craig W. Brown, Ms. Jan C. Brown, Mr. David A. Arrighi, Ms. Lydia Reed, Mr. Ronald L. Crichton-Reed, Ms. Katherine Crichton-Reed and Ms. Walter C. Simmons. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 01/28/2008. Manner of Service: US Mail. [Entered: 01/29/2008 02:24 PM]
January 29, 2008 [9544514] Notice received from Mr. David A. Arrighi, Mr. Craig W. Brown, Ms. Jan C. Brown, Ms. Katherine Crichton-Reed, Mr. Ronald L. Crichton-Reed, Ms. Lydia Reed and Ms. Walter C. Simmons that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Notice due that record is complete by 02/25/2008 for Ingrid Campbell, District Clerk. [Entered: 01/29/2008 02:29 PM]
January 29, 2008 [9544516] Docketing statement filed by Mr. David A. Arrighi, Mr. Craig W. Brown, Ms. Jan C. Brown, Ms. Katherine Crichton-Reed, Mr. Ronald L. Crichton-Reed, Ms. Lydia Reed and Ms. Walter C. Simmons. Original and 4 copies. Served on 01/28/2008. Manner of Service: US Mail. [Entered: 01/29/2008 02:34 PM]
January 25, 2008 [9543793] Notice of appearance filed by Ms. Deborah Petrotta and Mr. Lee Thompson for Alma, Inc., Mr. Thomas C. Moore and Mr. James W. Moore. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 01/23/2008. Manner of Service: US Mail. [Entered: 01/25/2008 02:13 PM]
January 17, 2008 [9541982] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/17/2008 Docketing statement due 02/01/2008 for David A. Arrighi, Craig W. Brown, Jan C. Brown, Katherine Crichton-Reed, Ronald L. Crichton-Reed, Lydia Reed and Walter C. Simmons. Transcript order form due 02/01/2008 for H. Kent Desselle. Notice of appearance due on 02/01/2008 for Alma, Inc., David A. Arrighi, Bradley Young, LLP, Craig W. Brown, Jan C. Brown, Katherine Crichton-Reed, Ronald L. Crichton-Reed, James W. Moore, Thomas C. Moore, Lydia Reed and Walter C. Simmons. [Entered: 01/17/2008 01:17 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Brown, et al v. Alma, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CRAIG W. BROWN
Represented By: H. Kent Desselle
Represented By: Dennis J.C. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAN C. BROWN
Represented By: H. Kent Desselle
Represented By: Dennis J.C. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID A. ARRIGHI
Represented By: H. Kent Desselle
Represented By: Dennis J.C. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LYDIA REED
Represented By: H. Kent Desselle
Represented By: Dennis J.C. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RONALD L. CRICHTON-REED
Represented By: H. Kent Desselle
Represented By: Dennis J.C. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KATHERINE CRICHTON-REED
Represented By: H. Kent Desselle
Represented By: Dennis J.C. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WALTER C. SIMMONS
Represented By: H. Kent Desselle
Represented By: Dennis J.C. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALMA, INC., a Kansas Corporation
Represented By: Deborah Thompson
Represented By: M. Lee Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS C. MOORE
Represented By: Deborah Thompson
Represented By: M. Lee Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES W. MOORE
Represented By: Deborah Thompson
Represented By: M. Lee Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRADLEY YOUNG, LLP
Represented By: Deborah Thompson
Represented By: Martin J. Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?