Steeplechase II Condominium v. Travelers Indemnity Company

Plaintiff / Appellant: THE STEEPLECHASE II CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC., a Colorado non-profit corporation
Defendant / Appellee: THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY, a foreign corporation
Case Number: 19-1014
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 [10625938] Mandate issued. [19-1014] [Entered: 02/11/2019 01:49 PM]
February 11, 2019 [10625937] Frap 42 procedural termination without judicial action by the Clerk of the Court. [19-1014] [Entered: 02/11/2019 01:48 PM]
February 11, 2019 [10625932] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting appellant's motion to dismiss case as contained in the court's dismissal order. Text only entry - no attachment. [19-1014] [Entered: 02/11/2019 01:46 PM]
February 11, 2019 [10625883] Motion filed by Appellant Steeplechase II Condominium Association, Inc. to dismiss case. Served on: 02/11/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1014] DJF [Entered: 02/11/2019 12:09 PM]
February 11, 2019 [10625839] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. David J. Furtado for Steeplechase II Condominium Association, Inc. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1014] [Entered: 02/11/2019 10:37 AM]
February 11, 2019 [10625834] Entry of appearance submitted by David J. Furtado for Appellant Steeplechase II Condominium Association, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/11/2019. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 02/11/2019 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 2/11/19.] [19-1014] DJF [Entered: 02/11/2019 10:32 AM]
February 1, 2019 [10623471] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: preliminary documents not filed. Docketing statement, transcript order and notice of appearance due on 02/11/2019 for Steeplechase II Condominium Association, Inc. [19-1014] [Entered: 02/01/2019 07:44 AM]
January 28, 2019 [10622013] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Amy M. Samberg and Ms. Jeri Jean Wettestad for Travelers Indemnity Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/28/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1014] [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:08 PM]
January 28, 2019 [10622007] Entry of appearance submitted by Amy M. Samberg Jeri Jean Wettestad for Appellee Travelers Indemnity Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/28/2019. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 01/28/2019 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 1/28/19.] [19-1014] JJW [Entered: 01/28/2019 11:57 AM]
January 14, 2019 [10618609] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/14/2019. Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 01/28/2019 for Steeplechase II Condominium Association, Inc. Notice of appearance due on 01/28/2019 for Travelers Indemnity Company. [19-1014] [Entered: 01/14/2019 03:34 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steeplechase II Condominium v. Travelers Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THE STEEPLECHASE II CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC., a Colorado non-profit corporation
Represented By: Nathan Archuleta
Represented By: David J. Furtado
Represented By: Matthew Wayne Hamblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY, a foreign corporation
Represented By: Amy M. Samberg
Represented By: Jeri Jean Wettestad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?