Vianez v. Denver Court ECT.
Defendant / Appellee: DENVER COURT ECT.,
Plaintiff / Appellant: JUAN VIANEZ
Case Number: 19-1156
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 [10654177] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Vol. 1-pleadings. [19-1156] [Entered: 06/07/2019 08:14 AM]
June 6, 2019 [10653848] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief and fee or 1915 forms due 07/16/2019 for Juan Vianez. Record on appeal 10th Circuit due 06/27/2019 [19-1156] [Entered: 06/06/2019 08:36 AM]
May 8, 2019 [10647235] Entry of appearance filed by Juan Vianez. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/02/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1156] [Entered: 05/08/2019 01:56 PM]
April 29, 2019 [10644883] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 04/29/2019. Notice of appearance due on 05/29/2019 for Juan Vianez. Fee or ifp forms due 05/29/2019 for Juan Vianez. [19-1156] [Entered: 04/29/2019 04:41 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Vianez v. Denver Court ECT.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENVER COURT ECT.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JUAN VIANEZ
Represented By: Juan Vianez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?