Allman v. Barr, et al
Defendant / Appellee: MICHELLE H. KERIN, Assistant USA, District of Oregon, KENNETH S. EILER, Bankruptcy Trustee UST, District of Oregon; UNKNOWN PROFESSIONAL LIABILITY FUND AND.OR PROFESSIONA SURETY, JOSEPH LAMONICA, Investigatory for USA, District of Oregon, M. VIVIENNE POPPERL, Former Attorney of theU.S. Trustee UST, District of Oregon, PETER C. MCKITTRICK, Former Bankruptcy Trustee UST, District of Oregon, CLIFFORD J. WHITE, III, Director, Trustee Program, United States, WILLIAM P. BARR, USAG, Department of Justice, BILLY J. WILLIAMS, USAO, Department of Justice, S. AMANDA MARSHALL, Former USA, District of Oregon and ARNOT STEPHEN, USTO, Trustee Program, United States
Plaintiff / Appellant: FREDERICK L. ALLMAN
Case Number: 19-1460
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
September 11, 2020 Allman v. Barr

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 [10712151] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: not filed. Appellant's brief due on 01/30/2020 for Frederick L. Allman [19-1460] [Entered: 01/23/2020 07:27 AM]
January 6, 2020 [10707485] Entry of appearance filed by Frederick L. Allman. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/30/2019. Manner of Service: US mail [19-1460] [Entered: 01/06/2020 01:22 PM]
December 9, 2019 [10700753] Amended notice of appeal filed. [19-1460] [Entered: 12/09/2019 08:43 AM]
December 6, 2019 [10700687] Order filed by Clerk of the Court assessing costs and fees in the amount of $505.. Served on 12/06/2019. [19-1460] [Entered: 12/06/2019 03:51 PM]
December 6, 2019 [10700673] Appellant's motion filed by Frederick L. Allman for leave to proceed without prepayment of costs and fees. Served on 11/29/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1460] [Entered: 12/06/2019 03:40 PM]
December 5, 2019 [10700198] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Volume 1-pleadings. [19-1460] [Entered: 12/05/2019 10:21 AM]
December 5, 2019 [10700194] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief and fee or 1915 forms due 01/14/2020 for Frederick L. Allman. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 12/26/2019. [19-1460] [Entered: 12/05/2019 10:17 AM]
December 5, 2019 [10700144] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 12/05/2019. Notice of appearance due on 01/06/2020 for Frederick L. Allman. [19-1460] [Entered: 12/05/2019 09:09 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Allman v. Barr, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHELLE H. KERIN, Assistant USA, District of Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENNETH S. EILER, Bankruptcy Trustee UST, District of Oregon; UNKNOWN PROFESSIONAL LIABILITY FUND AND.OR PROFESSIONA SURETY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSEPH LAMONICA, Investigatory for USA, District of Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. VIVIENNE POPPERL, Former Attorney of theU.S. Trustee UST, District of Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PETER C. MCKITTRICK, Former Bankruptcy Trustee UST, District of Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLIFFORD J. WHITE, III, Director, Trustee Program, United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, USAG, Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BILLY J. WILLIAMS, USAO, Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: S. AMANDA MARSHALL, Former USA, District of Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARNOT STEPHEN, USTO, Trustee Program, United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FREDERICK L. ALLMAN
Represented By: Frederick L. Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?