Ward, et al v. City of Hobbs, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: SANDRA TODD, DENNIS HARGROVE and OCTAVIA WARD
Defendant / Appellee: TROY D. BRACKEEN, a Hobbs Police Department Officer, CITY OF HOBBS, ZAKARIAH T. DALE, a Hobbs Police Department Officer and RUBEN GASTELUM, a Hobbs Police Department Officer
Case Number: 19-2137
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 [10697893] Stipulation to dismiss case filed by Dennis Hargrove, Sandra Todd and Octavia Ward. Served on 11/25/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-2137] JPK [Entered: 11/25/2019 02:21 PM]
November 25, 2019 This entry has been removed from the docket. [lg] This is being redone due to a clerical error. [10698017] Stipulation to dismiss is granted. Procedural termination without judicial action;. Clerk of the Court. [19-2137] [Entered: 11/25/2019 03:58 PM]
November 25, 2019 [10698015] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting stipulation to dismiss case. Served on 11/25/2019. Text only entry - no attachment. [19-2137] Final order to be found in case termination entry. [Entered: 11/25/2019 03:57 PM]
November 25, 2019 [10698018] Mandate issued. [19-2137] [Entered: 11/25/2019 03:59 PM]
November 25, 2019 [10700793] Rule 33 case terminated. Stipulation to dismiss is granted. Procedural termination after other judicial action; Written, unsigned, unpublished; [19-2137] [Entered: 12/09/2019 10:02 AM]
November 18, 2019 [10695986] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting stipulation to dismiss with respect to Troy D. Brackeen, Zakariah T. Dale and Ruben Gastelum, only. Served on 11/18/2019. [19-2137] [Entered: 11/18/2019 04:00 PM]
November 15, 2019 [10695598] Stipulation to dismiss Troy D. Brackeen; Zakariah T. Dale; Ruben Gastelum as a party filed by Dennis Hargrove, Sandra Todd and Octavia Ward. Served on 11/15/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-2137] JPK [Entered: 11/15/2019 03:42 PM]
October 22, 2019 [10689140] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellants' brief and appendix until 12/02/2019 for Dennis Hargrove, Sandra Todd and Octavia Ward. [19-2137] [Entered: 10/22/2019 04:21 PM]
October 21, 2019 [10688433] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Philip W. Savrin for Officer Ruben Gastelum, Officer Zakariah T. Dale, City of Hobbs and Officer Troy D. Brackeen. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/21/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-2137] [Entered: 10/21/2019 07:49 AM]
October 21, 2019 [10688420] Entry of appearance submitted by Philip W. Savrin for Appellees City of Hobbs, Officer Troy D. Brackeen, Officer Zakariah T. Dale and Officer Ruben Gastelum for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/21/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2137]--[Edited 10/21/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 10/21/2019] PWS [Entered: 10/21/2019 06:45 AM]
October 2, 2019 [10683677] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellants' brief and appendix until 11/15/2019 for Dennis Hargrove, Sandra Todd and Octavia Ward. [19-2137] [Entered: 10/02/2019 07:57 AM]
October 1, 2019 [10683625] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 10/25/2019 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [19-2137] [Entered: 10/01/2019 04:44 PM]
September 12, 2019 [10678002] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Luis E. Robles for City of Hobbs, Officer Troy D. Brackeen, Officer Zakariah T. Dale and Officer Ruben Gastelum. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/12/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-2137] [Entered: 09/12/2019 01:46 PM]
September 12, 2019 [10677996] Entry of appearance submitted by Luis Robles for Appellees City of Hobbs, Officer Troy D. Brackeen, Officer Zakariah T. Dale and Officer Ruben Gastelum for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2137] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 09/12/2019 by NA] LER [Entered: 09/12/2019 01:42 PM]
September 12, 2019 [10678043] Docketing statement filed by Dennis Hargrove, Sandra Todd and Octavia Ward. Served on 09/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2137] JPK [Entered: 09/12/2019 02:46 PM]
September 6, 2019 [10676539] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 09/06/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 10/16/2019 for Dennis Hargrove, Sandra Todd, and Octavia Ward. [19-2137] [Entered: 09/06/2019 10:27 AM]
September 5, 2019 [10676327] Entry of appearance submitted by Joseph P. Kennedy, Shannon L. Kennedy for Appellants Dennis Hargrove, Sandra Todd and Octavia Ward for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/05/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2137]--[Edited 09/05/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 9/5/2019.] JPK [Entered: 09/05/2019 01:18 PM]
September 5, 2019 [10676329] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Dennis Hargrove, Sandra Todd and Octavia Ward. Transcript ordered: Served on: 09/05/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2137] JPK [Entered: 09/05/2019 01:21 PM]
September 5, 2019 [10676340] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 09/12/2019 for Mitchell R. Elfers, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-2137] [Entered: 09/05/2019 01:39 PM]
September 5, 2019 [10676334] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Joseph P. Kennedy and Ms. Shannon L. Kennedy for Octavia Ward, Dennis Hargrove and, Sandra Todd. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/05/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2137] [Entered: 09/05/2019 01:33 PM]
August 30, 2019 [10674926] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 08/30/2019. Docketing statement due 09/13/2019 for Dennis Hargrove, Sandra Todd and Octavia Ward. Transcript order form due 09/13/2019 for Dennis Hargrove, Sandra Todd and Octavia Ward. Notice of appearance due on 09/13/2019 for Troy D. Brackeen, City of Hobbs, Zakariah T. Dale, Ruben Gastelum, Dennis Hargrove, Sandra Todd and Octavia Ward [19-2137]--[Edited 08/30/2019 by LG to attach correct preliminary record] [Entered: 08/30/2019 11:30 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ward, et al v. City of Hobbs, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SANDRA TODD
Represented By: Shannon L. Kennedy
Represented By: Joseph P. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DENNIS HARGROVE
Represented By: Shannon L. Kennedy
Represented By: Joseph P. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: OCTAVIA WARD
Represented By: Shannon L. Kennedy
Represented By: Joseph P. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TROY D. BRACKEEN, a Hobbs Police Department Officer
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Represented By: Philip W. Savrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF HOBBS
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Represented By: Philip W. Savrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ZAKARIAH T. DALE, a Hobbs Police Department Officer
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Represented By: Philip W. Savrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RUBEN GASTELUM, a Hobbs Police Department Officer
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Represented By: Philip W. Savrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?