Sullivan v. University of Kansas Hospital, et al
Defendant / Appellee: KEVIN BROWN, BOB PAGE, TIFFANY WILLIAMS, BRANDON WELSH, UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, MOHSEN TAHANI, ELLEN KAY CARPENTER, MISSION FAMILY HEALTH CARE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JUDSON BERTSCH, JOHN LEEVER, PHILLIP HYLTON, NEUROSURGERY OF SOUTH KANSAS CITY, MARK O. SCOTT, LARRY CORDELL, JOHN CLOUGH, MD - Doctor of Medicine, BRADLEY S. JACKSON and UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS PHYSICIANS
Plaintiff / Appellant: SCOTT B. SULLIVAN
Case Number: 19-3213
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 [10693607] Entry of appearance filed by Scott B. Sullivan. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/23/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-3213] [Entered: 11/08/2019 02:31 PM]
November 5, 2019 [10692314] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Vol I - Pleadings. [19-3213] [Entered: 11/05/2019 08:06 AM]
November 1, 2019 [10691533] Jurisdictional review complete. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 11/22/2019. Appellant's entry of appearance and opening brief due on 12/11/2019 for Scott B. Sullivan. [19-3213] [Entered: 11/01/2019 10:32 AM]
November 1, 2019 [10691529] Order filed by Clerk of the Court lifting the abatement of this appeal. (See the attachment for the order.) Served on 11/01/2019. [19-3213] [Entered: 11/01/2019 10:29 AM]
October 31, 2019 [10691388] Supplemental preliminary record filed. Contents: Memorandum and order denying Docket No.114, Motion to Alter Judgment. [19-3213] [Entered: 10/31/2019 03:22 PM]
October 11, 2019 [10686518] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. John Wesley Smith and Mr. Trevin Erik Wray for University of Kansas Hospital Authority, Mission Family Health Care and Bob Page. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/11/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-3213] [Entered: 10/11/2019 08:31 AM]
October 11, 2019 [10686502] Entry of appearance submitted by Trevin E. Wray, J. Wesley Smith for Appellees Mission Family Health Care, Bob Page and University of Kansas Hospital Authority for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/11/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-3213]--[Edited 10/11/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] TEW [Entered: 10/11/2019 07:57 AM]
October 10, 2019 [10686419] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Bruce Keplinger for Mark O. Scott. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3213] [Entered: 10/10/2019 04:00 PM]
October 10, 2019 [10686392] Entry of appearance submitted by Bruce Keplinger for Appellee Mark O. Scott for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/10/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-3213]--[Edited 10/10/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] BK [Entered: 10/10/2019 03:30 PM]
October 10, 2019 [10686358] Entry of appearance filed by John F. Logan, Scott K. Logan and David M. Tyrrell for Kevin Brown, University of Kansas Physicians, Judson Bertsch, Larry Cordell, Phillip Hylton, Tiffany Williams, Mohsen Tahani, Bradley S. Jackson, Brandon Welsh and John Leever. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/10/2019. Manner of Service: US mail, email. [19-3213] [Entered: 10/10/2019 02:52 PM]
October 10, 2019 [10686350] Entry of appearance submitted by Scott K. Logan, David M. Tyrrell, and John F. Logan for Appellees Judson Bertsch, Kevin Brown, Larry Cordell, Phillip Hylton, Bradley S. Jackson, John Leever, Mohsen Tahani, University of Kansas Physicians, Brandon Welsh and Tiffany Williams for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/10/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-3213] --[Edited 10/10/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] JFL [Entered: 10/10/2019 02:34 PM]
October 10, 2019 [10686132] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Mark Andrew Lynch and Casey L. Walker for Mr. John Clough, Neurosurgery of South Kansas City and Ellen Kay Carpenter. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/10/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-3213] [Entered: 10/10/2019 09:25 AM]
October 10, 2019 [10686129] Entry of appearance submitted by Mark A. Lynch, Casey L. Walker for Appellees Ellen Kay Carpenter, Mr. John Clough and Neurosurgery of South Kansas City for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/10/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-3213]--[Edited 10/10/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] CLW [Entered: 10/10/2019 09:16 AM]
October 8, 2019 [10685275] Entry of appearance filed by Wendy Anne Lynn for United States Department of Justice. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/08/2019. Manner of Service: US mail [19-3213] [Entered: 10/08/2019 09:26 AM]
October 8, 2019 [10685253] Entry of appearance submitted by Wendy Anne Lynn for Appellee United States Department of Justice for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/08/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. --[Edited 10/08/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 10/08/19][19-3213] WAL [Entered: 10/08/2019 08:55 AM]
October 4, 2019 [10684429] Order filed by Clerk of the Court abating appeal. Appellant is directed to file a status report due by 11/04/2019 or within 10 days of the date the district court enters an order disposing of the pending motion. Served on 10/04/2019. [19-3213] [Entered: 10/04/2019 07:18 AM]
October 2, 2019 [10683874] District court order granting leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Text only entry on 10/2/19 on the distrct court docket. [19-3213] [Entered: 10/02/2019 12:33 PM]
September 27, 2019 [10682607] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/26/2019 Notice of appearance due on 10/11/2019 for Judson Bertsch, Kevin Brown, Ellen Kay Carpenter, John Clough, MD - Doctor of Medicine, Larry Cordell, Phillip Hylton, Bradley S. Jackson, John Leever, Mission Family Health Care, Neurosurgery of South Kansas City, Bob Page, Mark O. Scott, Mohsen Tahani, United States Department of Justice, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kansas Physicians, Brandon Welsh and Tiffany Williams, and Notice of appearance due on 10/28/2019 for Scott B. Sullivan. [19-3213] [Entered: 09/27/2019 02:20 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. University of Kansas Hospital, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEVIN BROWN
Represented By: David M. Tyrrell
Represented By: Christopher Hurst Logan
Represented By: Scott K. Logan
Represented By: John F. Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BOB PAGE
Represented By: Trevin Erik Wray
Represented By: John Wesley Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIFFANY WILLIAMS
Represented By: David M. Tyrrell
Represented By: Christopher Hurst Logan
Represented By: Scott K. Logan
Represented By: John F. Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRANDON WELSH
Represented By: David M. Tyrrell
Represented By: Christopher Hurst Logan
Represented By: Scott K. Logan
Represented By: John F. Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY
Represented By: Trevin Erik Wray
Represented By: John Wesley Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MOHSEN TAHANI
Represented By: David M. Tyrrell
Represented By: Christopher Hurst Logan
Represented By: Scott K. Logan
Represented By: John F. Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELLEN KAY CARPENTER
Represented By: Mark Andrew Lynch
Represented By: Casey L. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MISSION FAMILY HEALTH CARE
Represented By: Trevin Erik Wray
Represented By: John Wesley Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Wendy Anne Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUDSON BERTSCH
Represented By: David M. Tyrrell
Represented By: Christopher Hurst Logan
Represented By: Scott K. Logan
Represented By: John F. Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN LEEVER
Represented By: David M. Tyrrell
Represented By: Christopher Hurst Logan
Represented By: Scott K. Logan
Represented By: John F. Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILLIP HYLTON
Represented By: David M. Tyrrell
Represented By: Christopher Hurst Logan
Represented By: Scott K. Logan
Represented By: John F. Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEUROSURGERY OF SOUTH KANSAS CITY
Represented By: Mark Andrew Lynch
Represented By: Casey L. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK O. SCOTT
Represented By: Bruce Keplinger
Represented By: Paul A. Breer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LARRY CORDELL
Represented By: David M. Tyrrell
Represented By: Christopher Hurst Logan
Represented By: Scott K. Logan
Represented By: John F. Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN CLOUGH, MD - Doctor of Medicine
Represented By: Mark Andrew Lynch
Represented By: Casey L. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRADLEY S. JACKSON
Represented By: David M. Tyrrell
Represented By: Christopher Hurst Logan
Represented By: Scott K. Logan
Represented By: John F. Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS PHYSICIANS
Represented By: David M. Tyrrell
Represented By: Christopher Hurst Logan
Represented By: Scott K. Logan
Represented By: John F. Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SCOTT B. SULLIVAN
Represented By: Scott B. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?