In re: Gardner
Defendant / Appellee: DEFENDANT PLACEHOLDER
Plaintiff / Appellant: EDSON G. GARDNER
Case Number: 19-4122
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 [10685267] Appellant's motion filed by Mr. Edson G. Gardner Motion for Leave to File Notice of Appeal. Served on 10/03/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-4122] [Entered: 10/08/2019 09:09 AM]
September 20, 2019 [10680243] "Appellant's Notice for Leave to File Removal of Civil Action" filed by Mr. Edson G. Gardner. Served on 09/17/2019 by US mail. [19-4122] [Entered: 09/20/2019 02:04 PM]
September 16, 2019 [10678831] Appellant's emergency motion for leave to file to enjoin the Duchesne County Court proceeding until it has complied with the Tenth Circuit order's filed by Mr. Edson G. Gardner. Served on 09/13/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-4122] [Entered: 09/16/2019 04:17 PM]
September 3, 2019 [10675605] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Edson G. Gardner. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. [19-4122] [Entered: 09/03/2019 05:10 PM]
September 3, 2019 [10675553] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Volume 1 pleadings. [19-4122]--[Edited 09/11/2019 by JM to edit roa volume.] [Entered: 09/03/2019 04:00 PM]
September 3, 2019 [10675539] Appellant's opening brief filed by Mr. Edson G. Gardner. Original and 3 copies. Served on 08/30/2019 by US Mail. Required 10th Cir. R. 28.2 Attachments Included? n. [19-4122] [Entered: 09/03/2019 03:36 PM]
September 3, 2019 [10675530] Appellant's motion filed by Edson G. Gardner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Served on 08/30/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-4122] [Entered: 09/03/2019 03:31 PM]
August 22, 2019 [10672752] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 08/22/2019 Notice of appearance due on 09/23/2019 for Edson G. Gardner. Fee or ifp forms due 09/23/2019 for Edson G. Gardner. [19-4122] [Entered: 08/22/2019 11:17 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEFENDANT PLACEHOLDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDSON G. GARDNER
Represented By: Edson G. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?