Carlile v. Reliance Standard Life Ins., et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: DAVID G. CARLILE
Defendant / Appellant: RELIANCE STANDARD LIFE INSURANCE and RELIANCE STANDARD LIFE INSURANCE POLICY NUMBER LTD 123420
Case Number: 19-4123
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 [10687453] Entry of appearance filed by Christopher S. Hill for David G. Carlile. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/16/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4123] [Entered: 10/16/2019 11:42 AM]
October 16, 2019 [10687439] Entry of appearance submitted by Christopher S. Hill for Not Party Christopher S. HillDavid G. Carlile, Appellee for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 10/16/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 10/16/19][19-4123] CSH [Entered: 10/16/2019 11:12 AM]
October 15, 2019 [10687290] Entry of appearance filed by Jackie Wang for David G. Carlile. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/15/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4123] [Entered: 10/15/2019 05:11 PM]
October 15, 2019 [10687283] Entry of appearance submitted by Jackie Bosshardt Wang for Appellee David G. Carlile for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/15/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4123]--[Edited 10/15/2019 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 10/15/19.] JW [Entered: 10/15/2019 04:51 PM]
October 3, 2019 [10684310] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellants' opening brief and appendix to 11/21/2019 for Reliance Standard Life Insurance and Reliance Standard Life Insurance Policy Number LTD 123420 [19-4123] [Entered: 10/03/2019 03:01 PM]
September 27, 2019 [10682663] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 10/10/2019 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [19-4123] [Entered: 09/27/2019 03:25 PM]
September 19, 2019 [10679793] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Justin W. Starr and Mr. Alexander Dushku for David G. Carlile. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (some parties previously disclosed). Served on 09/19/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4123] [Entered: 09/19/2019 11:46 AM]
September 19, 2019 [10679776] Entry of appearance submitted by Alexander Dushku; Justin W Starr for Appellee David G. Carlile for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 09/19/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 09/19/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 9/19/19][19-4123] AD [Entered: 09/19/2019 11:26 AM]
September 12, 2019 [10677908] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 09/12/2019. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 10/22/2019 for Reliance Standard Life Insurance and Reliance Standard Life Insurance Policy Number LTD 123420. [19-4123] [Entered: 09/12/2019 11:13 AM]
September 12, 2019 [10677865] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 09/19/2019 for D. Mark Jones, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-4123] [Entered: 09/12/2019 10:20 AM]
September 12, 2019 [10677860] Notice received from Reliance Standard Life Insurance and Reliance Standard Life Insurance Policy Number LTD 123420 that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 09/12/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4123] JB [Entered: 09/12/2019 10:13 AM]
September 12, 2019 [10677859] Docketing statement filed by Reliance Standard Life Insurance and Reliance Standard Life Insurance Policy Number LTD 123420. Served on 09/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4123] JB [Entered: 09/12/2019 10:10 AM]
September 12, 2019 [10677814] Entry of appearance filed by. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (previously reported). Served on 09/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4123] [Entered: 09/12/2019 08:25 AM]
September 11, 2019 [10677757] Entry of appearance submitted by Scott M. Petersen and Clint Hansen for Appellants Reliance Standard Life Insurance and Reliance Standard Life Insurance Policy Number LTD 123420 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 09/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4123]--[Edited 09/12/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] SMP [Entered: 09/11/2019 05:12 PM]
September 9, 2019 [10677110] Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance now due on 09/19/2019 for David G. Carlile. [19-4123] [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:54 PM]
September 9, 2019 [10677103] Deficiency notice issued. Transcript order form and docketing statement due 09/19/2019 for Reliance Standard Life Insurance and Reliance Standard Life Insurance Policy Number LTD 123420. [19-4123] [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:45 PM]
August 23, 2019 [10673043] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Joshua Bachrach, Esq. for Reliance Standard Life Insurance Policy Number LTD 123420 and Reliance Standard Life Insurance. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 08/23/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4123] [Entered: 08/23/2019 10:26 AM]
August 23, 2019 [10673018] Entry of appearance submitted by Joshua Bachrach for Appellants Reliance Standard Life Insurance and Reliance Standard Life Insurance Policy Number LTD 123420 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/23/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4123]--[Edited 08/23/2019 by JM to remove PDF filed by the court on 8/23/19.] JB [Entered: 08/23/2019 09:31 AM]
August 22, 2019 [10672768] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 08/22/2019 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 09/05/2019 for Reliance Standard Life Insurance and Reliance Standard Life Insurance Policy Number LTD 123420. Notice of appearance due on 09/05/2019 for David G. Carlile [19-4123] [Entered: 08/22/2019 11:40 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlile v. Reliance Standard Life Ins., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID G. CARLILE
Represented By: Christopher S. Hill
Represented By: Jackie Bosshardt
Represented By: Alexander Dushku
Represented By: Justin W. Starr
Represented By: Jackie Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RELIANCE STANDARD LIFE INSURANCE
Represented By: Scott M. Petersen
Represented By: Joshua Bachrach Esq.
Represented By: Clint R. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RELIANCE STANDARD LIFE INSURANCE POLICY NUMBER LTD 123420
Represented By: Scott M. Petersen
Represented By: Joshua Bachrach Esq.
Represented By: Clint R. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?