United States v. Grant
Defendant / Appellant: WESLEY TAVION GRANT and WESLEY TAVION GRANT, AKA Olajawan Armond Bush
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 19-6140
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 9, 2020 United States v. Grant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 [10689739] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 4, Comments: Volume 1 pleadings 16-6228, Volume 2 SEALED pleadings 16-6228, Volume 3 transcripts 16-6228, Volume 4 pleadings 19-6140. [19-6140] [Entered: 10/24/2019 02:11 PM]
October 18, 2019 [10688148] Jurisdictional review complete Appellant's Combined opening brief/COA and fee or ifp forms due by 11/27/2019 for Wesley Tavion Grant. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 11/08/2019 [19-6140] [Entered: 10/18/2019 10:13 AM]
October 18, 2019 [10688141] District court order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. [19-6140] [Entered: 10/18/2019 10:04 AM]
October 18, 2019 [10688136] Order filed by Clerk of the Court referring the jurisdictional issue identified in the 9/18/19 order [ # 10679469-2 ] and Appellant's response [ # 10687714-2 ] to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time). This appeal will proceed to briefing. Further instructions will be provided in due course. Served on 10/18/2019. [19-6140] [Entered: 10/18/2019 09:59 AM]
October 9, 2019 [10687714] Appellant's response to SCO filed by Wesley Tavion Grant. Original only. Served on 09/30/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-6140] [Entered: 10/17/2019 08:31 AM]
October 9, 2019 [10685807] District court motion and affidavit for leave to appeal in forma pauperis received from Mr. Wesley Tavion Grant but not filed. (Document sent to district court.) [19-6140] [Entered: 10/09/2019 12:19 PM]
October 9, 2019 [10685805] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Wesley Tavion Grant. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/30/2019 on court only. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-6140] [Entered: 10/09/2019 12:17 PM]
October 3, 2019 [10684224] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. David McCrary for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-6140] [Entered: 10/03/2019 12:23 PM]
October 3, 2019 [10684213] Entry of appearance submitted by David McCrary for Appellee United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/03/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-6140]--[Edited 10/03/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] DM [Entered: 10/03/2019 12:15 PM]
October 3, 2019 [10684174] Entry of appearance filed by Nicholas Jacob Patterson for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/03/2019. Manner of Service: US mail [19-6140] [Entered: 10/03/2019 11:07 AM]
October 3, 2019 [10684123] Entry of appearance submitted by Nicholas J. Patterson for Appellee United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-6140] --[Edited 10/03/2019 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 10/03/19] NJP [Entered: 10/03/2019 10:04 AM]
October 3, 2019 [10684111] Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance past due. Notice of appearance due on 10/15/2019 for United States of America [19-6140] [Entered: 10/03/2019 09:25 AM]
September 18, 2019 [10679469] Order filed by Clerk of the Court considering this case for summary disposition under 10 Cir. R. 27. Within 21 days from the date of this order the Appellant shall respond in writing why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of appellate jurisdiction due to the untimely filing of the notice of appeal. Appellant's memorandum brief due on 10/09/2019 for Wesley Tavion Grant. Failure to timely respond to this order may result in the dismissal of this appeal without further notice. Briefing on the merits is suspended pending further order of the court. Served on 09/18/2019. [19-6140] [Entered: 09/18/2019 02:03 PM]
September 17, 2019 [10678949] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/16/2019. Fee or ifp forms due 10/17/2019 for Wesley Tavion Grant. Notice of appearance due on 10/17/2019 for Wesley Tavion Grant, and Notice of appearance due on 10/01/2019 for United States of America. [19-6140] [Entered: 09/17/2019 09:21 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WESLEY TAVION GRANT
Represented By: Wesley Tavion Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WESLEY TAVION GRANT, AKA Olajawan Armond Bush
Represented By: Wesley Tavion Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: David McCrary
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?